WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Plaintiff: WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. and BI-LO HOLDING, LLC
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PLIVA, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, KEVIN GREEN, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Konstantin Ostaficiuk, UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, JAMES BROWN, Marc Falkin, HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Maureen Cavanaugh, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., ALVOGEN, INC., MYLAN N.V, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Richard Rogerson, G&W LABORATORIES, INC., David Berthold, EPIC PHARMA LLC, GREENSTONE, LLC,, Armando Kellum, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., ROBIN HATOSY, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, APOTEX CORP., ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, MYLAN INC., TELIGENT, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, KAVOD PHARMACEUTICALS LLC (F/K/A. RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, F/K/A RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.), PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ARA APRAHAMIAN, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, NISHA PATEL, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., MALLINCKRODT, INC., Jill Nailor, STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,, James Grauso, AKORN, INC., VERSAPHARM, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., David Reckenthaler, Tracy Sullivan Divalerio, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., James Nesta and PFIZER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06290
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Strides Pharma Science Limited with Certificate of Service by STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,.(TWEEN, DOUGLAS)
February 8, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS M. TWEEN on behalf of STRIDES PHARMA, INC., with Certificate of Service(TWEEN, DOUGLAS)
February 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID)
February 4, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH)
February 4, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH)
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR)
February 4, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KASOWITZ, MARC)
February 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON)
February 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
February 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN)
February 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN DANIEL GANT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(GANT, BRYAN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER K. MCDEVITT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCDEVITT, HEATHER)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DONAHUE, LAUREN)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J SMITH on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, BRIAN)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE B. BELL on behalf of BI-LO HOLDING, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. (BELL, THEODORE)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. AHERN on behalf of BI-LO HOLDING, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. (AHERN, PATRICK)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(FOUSE, LINDSAY)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS APPROVED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/19/2021. 1/19/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO CIVIL ACTION 20-6290)(kp, )
December 15, 2020 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., ALVOGEN, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., ARA APRAHAMIAN, AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., JAMES BROWN, David Berthold, CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, Maureen Cavanaugh, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., Tracy Sullivan Divalerio, EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, EPIC PHARMA LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Marc Falkin, G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, KEVIN GREEN, GREENSTONE, LLC,, James Grauso, ROBIN HATOSY, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., KAVOD PHARMACEUTICALS LLC (F/K/A. RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, F/K/A RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.), Armando Kellum, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MALLINCKRODT, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Jill Nailor, James Nesta, OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Konstantin Ostaficiuk, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., NISHA PATEL, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER, INC., PLIVA, INC., David Reckenthaler, Richard Rogerson, SANDOZ, INC., STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. Forwarded To: Patrick J. Ahern on 12/15/20 (fdc, )
December 14, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BI-LO HOLDING, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.. (fb)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF WINN-DIXIE STORES, LLC and BI-LO HOLDING, LLC against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., ALVOGEN, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., ARA APRAHAMIAN, AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., JAMES BROWN, David Berthold, CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, Maureen Cavanaugh, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., Tracy Sullivan Divalerio, EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, EPIC PHARMA LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Marc Falkin, G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, KEVIN GREEN, GREENSTONE, LLC,, James Grauso, ROBIN HATOSY, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., KAVOD PHARMACEUTICALS LLC (F/K/A. RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, F/K/A RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.), Armando Kellum, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MALLINCKRODT, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Jill Nailor, James Nesta, OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Konstantin Ostaficiuk, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., NISHA PATEL, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER, INC., PLIVA, INC., David Reckenthaler, Richard Rogerson, SANDOZ, INC., STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14780472.), filed by BI-LO HOLDING, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(AHERN, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Represented By: LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konstantin Ostaficiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Falkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVOGEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rogerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Berthold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC PHARMA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSTONE, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Kellum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN HATOSY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT, INC.
Represented By: HEATHER K. MCDEVITT
Represented By: BRYAN DANIEL GANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAVOD PHARMACEUTICALS LLC (F/K/A. RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, F/K/A RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARA APRAHAMIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Nailor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,
Represented By: DOUGLAS M. TWEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Grauso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERSAPHARM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: NATHAN M. BUCHTER
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC.
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Reckenthaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Sullivan Divalerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.
Represented By: PATRICK J. AHERN
Represented By: THEODORE B. BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BI-LO HOLDING, LLC
Represented By: PATRICK J. AHERN
Represented By: THEODORE B. BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?