CURRAN v. NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CURRAN
Defendant: JOHN DOE DEFENDANT and NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06373
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 7 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (rf, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STRAUSKULAGE, MATTHEW)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE J. RUCCIA on behalf of NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC (RUCCIA, DIANE)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. GILLIN on behalf of NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC (GILLIN, DANIEL)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STRAUSKULAGE, MATTHEW)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC , Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia, case number 201101667, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14794507), filed by NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit A-Complaint)(STRAUSKULAGE, MATTHEW) Modified on 12/21/2020 (tjd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/21/2020) (tjd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CURRAN v. NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE DEFENDANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL EXPRESS, LLC
Represented By: DIANE J. RUCCIA
Represented By: DANIEL J. GILLIN
Represented By: MATTHEW P. STRAUSKULAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CURRAN
Represented By: GREG PROSMUSHKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?