HIDALGO VILLAFANE et al v. AGUSTAWESTLAND PHILDELPHIA CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: LOURDES FRANCISCA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ, MARTHA JULIA HIDALGO VILLAFANE and MA. GUADALUPE NANCY CANALES ELIZALDE
Defendant: AGUSTAWESTLAND PHILDELPHIA CORPORATION, LEONARDO S.p.A. and AGUSTAWESTLAND PHILADELPHIA CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv06393
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND CASE CAPTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/16/21. 2/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/11/21. 2/12/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF ANTHONY TARRICONE, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TOO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2 (B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/10/21.2/11/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF VINCENT C. LESCH III, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TOO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2 (B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/10/21.2/11/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Vincent Lesch, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14907992.) filed by GUADALUPE NANCY CANALES ELIZALDE, MARTHA JULIA HIDALGO VILLAFANE, LOURDES FRANCISCA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ..(STOLL, BRADLEY)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Anthony Tarricone, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14907961.) filed by GUADALUPE NANCY CANALES ELIZALDE, MARTHA JULIA HIDALGO VILLAFANE, LOURDES FRANCISCA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ..(STOLL, BRADLEY)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT JOHN M. SOCOLOW'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/8/2021.2/9/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14900340.), MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by AGUSTAWESTLAND PHILDELPHIA CORPORATION, LEONARDO S.p.A..Declaration, Certificate of Service.(BALLARD, ZACHARY)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY JOSEPH BALLARD on behalf of AGUSTAWESTLAND PHILDELPHIA CORPORATION, LEONARDO S.p.A. with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(BALLARD, ZACHARY)
December 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to AGUSTAWESTLAND PHILDELPHIA CORPORATION, LEONARDO S.p.A.. E-Mailed To: counsel on 12/22/20. (kw, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14796395.), filed by MARTHA JULIA HIDALGO VILLAFANE, LOURDES FRANCISCA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ, GUADALUPE NANCY CANALES ELIZALDE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form)(STOLL, BRADLEY)
December 21, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GUADALUPE NANCY CANALES ELIZALDE, MARTHA JULIA HIDALGO VILLAFANE, LOURDES FRANCISCA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ. (tjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIDALGO VILLAFANE et al v. AGUSTAWESTLAND PHILDELPHIA CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGUSTAWESTLAND PHILDELPHIA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONARDO S.p.A.
Represented By: ZACHARY JOSEPH BALLARD
Represented By: JOHN M. SOCOLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGUSTAWESTLAND PHILADELPHIA CORPORATION
Represented By: ZACHARY JOSEPH BALLARD
Represented By: JOHN M. SOCOLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOURDES FRANCISCA MENDOZA HERNANDEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY J. STOLL
Represented By: ANTHONY TARRICONE
Represented By: VINCENT LESCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA JULIA HIDALGO VILLAFANE
Represented By: BRADLEY J. STOLL
Represented By: ANTHONY TARRICONE
Represented By: VINCENT LESCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MA. GUADALUPE NANCY CANALES ELIZALDE
Represented By: BRADLEY J. STOLL
Represented By: ANTHONY TARRICONE
Represented By: VINCENT LESCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?