United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Sandoz, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN N.V, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, Actavis Holdco US, Inc., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., MYLAN INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA, BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK INC., SANDOZ INC, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., TELIGENT, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. and Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06557
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
February 3, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN)
February 3, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
February 1, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN DANIEL GANT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(GANT, BRYAN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER K. MCDEVITT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCDEVITT, HEATHER)
February 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER K. MCDEVITT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCDEVITT, HEATHER)
February 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
February 1, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
January 28, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
January 28, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
January 25, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (TALADAY, JOHN)
January 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(FOUSE, LINDSAY)
January 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS APPROVED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/19/2021. 1/19/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO CIVIL ACTION 20-6557)(kp, )
January 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ABBY L. DENNIS on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(DENNIS, ABBY)
January 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by HAMISH P.M. HUME on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(HUME, HAMISH)
January 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER DUNCAN HACKETT on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(HACKETT, JENNIFER)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES R. MARTIN on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTIN, JAMES)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC W. BUETZOW on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUETZOW, ERIC)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JUDITH A. ZAHID on behalf of UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(ZAHID, JUDITH)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-02543. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) transferring case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Cynthia M. Rufe. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2020.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hamish P.M. Hume, Abby L. Dennis, Duane L. Loft, Judith A. Zahid, Eric W. Buetzow, James R. Martin, Jennifer Duncan Hackett as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2020.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Teligent, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2020.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to G&W Laboratories, Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Lannett Company, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Perrigo New York, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2020.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Holdco US, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Bausch Health US, LLC, Fougera Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz, Inc. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2020.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-2543 DSD/DTS. (CLK)[Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2020.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff United HealthCare Services, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2020.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Holdco US, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Bausch Health US, LLC, Fougera Pharmaceuticals Inc., G&W Laboratories, Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Lannett Company, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Perrigo New York, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teligent, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8312130) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (Part 2 of 2), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kniffen, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Minnesota on 12/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Sandoz, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Holdco US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: NATHAN M. BUCHTER
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT, INC.
Represented By: HEATHER K. MCDEVITT
Represented By: BRYAN DANIEL GANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: ELIZABETH V KNIFFEN
Represented By: HAMISH P.M. HUME
Represented By: ERIC W. BUETZOW
Represented By: ABBY L. DENNIS
Represented By: JUDITH A. ZAHID
Represented By: JENNIFER DUNCAN HACKETT
Represented By: JAMES R. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?