TRASK v. OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP.
Plaintiff: ADA C. TRASK
Defendant: EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC., CELOTEX CORPORATION, OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP., ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES, FIBREBOARD CORP, GAF CORP., H.K. PORTER CO., INC., PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP, THE SOUTHERN ASBESTOS CO., SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORP, CAREY CANADA, INC. and KEENE CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv60016
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CORRECT A CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a) (D0C NO. 9025) IS GRANTED. ANY VIABLE NON-BANKRUPT DEFENDANTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; THE CASES ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE "BANKRUPTCY-ONLY" DOCKET; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THESE CASES CLOSED FOR ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/27/2020 8/27/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE DOC 9027 IN 01-MD-875)(kp, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRIES FROM ORIGINATING DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS (kp, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a) filed by PLAINTIFFS. (kp, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 1252 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF THE HEREIN LISTED MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/5/2020. 8/10/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (SEE DOCKET NO. 9024 IN 01-MD-875)(kp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRASK v. OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELOTEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIBREBOARD CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAF CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.K. PORTER CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH CORNING CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SOUTHERN ASBESTOS CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN TEXTILE CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREY CANADA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEENE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADA C. TRASK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?