OLDE YANKEE, INC. v. MID-ATLANTIC BARGE SERVICE, LLC
Plaintiff: OLDE YANKEE, INC.
Defendant: MID-ATLANTIC BARGE SERVICE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00153
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON WEDNESDAY, MARCH 24, 2021 AT 11:00 AM. COUNSEL SHOULD USE THE FOLLOWING CALL-IN CONFERENCE NUMBER IN ORDER TO BE CONNECTED TO THE CONFERENCE: 571-353-2300, PASSCODE: 035-477- 300# AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/10/21. 3/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, with Affirmative Defenses by OLDE YANKEE, INC..(ZIMOLONG, WALTER)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OLDE YANKEE, INC. by MID-ATLANTIC BARGE SERVICE, LLC. Affirmative Defenses, Certifcate of Service.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(DEGIULIO, FRANK) Modified on 2/18/2021 (tjd).
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OLDE YANKEE, INC.. MID-ATLANTIC BARGE SERVICE, LLC waiver sent on 1/13/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (ZIMOLONG, WALTER) Modified on 1/19/2021 (tjd).
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Hearing of Declaratory Judgment Under Fed.R.Civ. 57 and for Expediated Discovery filed by OLDE YANKEE, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(ZIMOLONG, WALTER)
January 13, 2021 Summons Issued as to MID-ATLANTIC BARGE SERVICE, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/13/21 (bw, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MID-ATLANTIC BARGE SERVICE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14838347.), filed by OLDE YANKEE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Charter MSJ102, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Charter Agreement for Barge 107, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Barge 102 Interim Report, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Barge 102 Preliminary Off-Hire Report, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Barge 102 Preliminary Off-Hire Report, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Barge 102 Preliminary Off-Hire Report, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G - Barge 107 Interim Survey, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H - Barge 107 Preliminary Off-Hire Report, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I - Barge 107 Preliminary Off-Hire Report)(ZIMOLONG, WALTER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLDE YANKEE, INC. v. MID-ATLANTIC BARGE SERVICE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLDE YANKEE, INC.
Represented By: WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MID-ATLANTIC BARGE SERVICE, LLC
Represented By: FRANK P. DEGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?