COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al v. SCALIA et al
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF ILLINOIS, DANA NESSEL, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF DELAWARE and STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and EUGENE SCALIA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00258
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE MATTER IS PLACED IN SUSPENSE. DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF LABOR IS REQUIRED TO SUBMIT A STATUS REPORT IN 60 DAYS AND EVERY 60 DAYS THEREAFTER UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/19/21. 3/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 23 Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Deadline to Answer the Complaint filed by EUGENE SCALIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCOTT, OLIVIA)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ESTELLE BRONSTEIN, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #15 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/2/21.2/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF LYDIA COLUNGA-MERCHANT, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #20 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/2/21.2/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Lydia Colunga-Merchant (IL) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14883486.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ALVAR AYALA, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #17 ) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/29/21.2/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JEFFREY P. DUNLAP, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #16 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/29/21.2/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Alvar Ayala (Illinois) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14880405.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER)
January 29, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Dunlap (Maryland) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14879418.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Estelle Bronstein (New Jersey) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14877068.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ZACHARY A. RISK, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #12 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/26/21.1/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/26/21. 1/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Zachary Risk (Michigan) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14869253.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF AMANDA I. MOREJON, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/25/21.1/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOSEPH J. WARDENSKI, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #7 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/25/21.1/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KATHLEEN KONOPKA, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/25/21.1/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Amanda Morejn (Massachusetts) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14866447.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Joseph Wardenski (New York) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14865674.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Kathleen Konopka (Washington DC) ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14865189.) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.(HALLOCK, CHRISTOPHER)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, DANA NESSEL, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW YORK re #1 Complaint (Attorney), by certified mail (SMITH, RYAN)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by VANESSA L. KASSAB on behalf of STATE OF DELAWARE (KASSAB, VANESSA)
January 20, 2021 Summons Issued as to EUGENE SCALIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/20/21. SUMMONS E-MAILED TO AUSA ON 1/20/2021. (bw, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN BLAKE SMITH on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(SMITH, RYAN)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14852289.), filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, DANA NESSEL, STATE OF MARYLAND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(WALKER, NANCY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al v. SCALIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: NANCY A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: NANCY A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: NANCY A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA NESSEL
Represented By: NANCY A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: NANCY A. WALKER
Represented By: RYAN BLAKE SMITH
Represented By: LYDIA COLUNGA-MERCHANT
Represented By: AMANDA MOREJON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. HALLOCK
Represented By: JOSEPH WARDENSKI
Represented By: JEFFREY PAUL DUNLAP
Represented By: ZACHARY A. RISK
Represented By: ESTELLE BRONSTEIN
Represented By: KATHLEEN M. KONOPKA
Represented By: ALVAR AYALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: NANCY A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: NANCY A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: NANCY A. WALKER
Represented By: VANESSA L. KASSAB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: NANCY A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: OLIVIA R. HUSSEY SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: OLIVIA R. HUSSEY SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENE SCALIA
Represented By: OLIVIA R. HUSSEY SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?