GENOMIND, INC. v. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC. et al
Plaintiff: GENOMIND, INC.
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., OPTUM, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH and UMR, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00373
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Pretrial Conference held on 3/4/21 (jaa, )
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/19/2021. MOTIONS DUE BY 1/28/2022. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 1/28/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/4/21. 3/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jaa, ) Modified on 3/4/2021 (jaa, ).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 03/03/2021.03/03/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 21 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Andrew Goldfarb ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14950715.) filed by GENOMIND, INC..Motion.(MARTIN, JASON)
February 25, 2021 Filing 20 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by GENOMIND, INC.. (HUFFORD, D.)
February 24, 2021 PLEADING #19 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
February 24, 2021 PLEADING #17,#18 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF WILLIAM BORNSTEIN, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/23/21. 2/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTY AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SAMIA S. YOUNG, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/23/21. 2/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JEFFREY S. GLEASON, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/23/21. 2/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 02/23/2021.02/23/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
February 23, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by OPTUM, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, UMR, INC., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC.. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14933983). (VOSHELL, GREGORY)
February 22, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samia S. Young by OPTUM, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, UMR, INC., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14932762.). (VOSHELL, GREGORY)
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey S. Gleason by OPTUM, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, UMR, INC., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14932756.). (VOSHELL, GREGORY)
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Bornstein by OPTUM, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, UMR, INC., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14932675.). (VOSHELL, GREGORY)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jamie R. Kurtz filed by OPTUM, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, UMR, INC., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC...(VOSHELL, GREGORY)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 02/22/2021.02/22/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 02/22/2021.02/22/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 02/22/2021.02/22/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM VIDEO: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/4/2021 12:00 PM COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE DIAL IN INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov (Attachments: # 1 Electronic Discovery Order, # 2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GENOMIND, INC..(MARTIN, JASON)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Nicholas DiCarlo ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14927242.) filed by GENOMIND, INC..Motion. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment A)(MARTIN, JASON)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jason Cowart ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14927150.) filed by GENOMIND, INC..Motion.(MARTIN, JASON)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Brian Hufford ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14927038.) filed by GENOMIND, INC..Motion.(MARTIN, JASON)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT UNITEDS REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION IS GRANTED AND THAT UNITED SHALL HAVE UNTIL APRIL 26, 2021 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/18/21. 2/18/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY S. VOSHELL on behalf of OPTUM, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, UMR, INC., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC. (VOSHELL, GREGORY)
January 28, 2021 Summons Issued as to OPTUM, INC., OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC, UMR, INC., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/28/21 (jaa, )
January 27, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GENOMIND, INC.. (JL )
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14874042.), filed by GENOMIND, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form Case Management Form, #3 Designation Form Designation Form)(MARTIN, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENOMIND, INC. v. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC.
Represented By: JAMIE R. KURTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM BORNSTEIN
Represented By: GREGORY S. VOSHELL
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GLEASON
Represented By: SAMIA S. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JAMIE R. KURTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM BORNSTEIN
Represented By: GREGORY S. VOSHELL
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GLEASON
Represented By: SAMIA S. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM, INC.
Represented By: JAMIE R. KURTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM BORNSTEIN
Represented By: GREGORY S. VOSHELL
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GLEASON
Represented By: SAMIA S. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JAMIE R. KURTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM BORNSTEIN
Represented By: GREGORY S. VOSHELL
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GLEASON
Represented By: SAMIA S. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC
Represented By: JAMIE R. KURTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM BORNSTEIN
Represented By: GREGORY S. VOSHELL
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GLEASON
Represented By: SAMIA S. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICE LLC
Represented By: JAMIE R. KURTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM BORNSTEIN
Represented By: GREGORY S. VOSHELL
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GLEASON
Represented By: SAMIA S. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
Represented By: JAMIE R. KURTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM BORNSTEIN
Represented By: GREGORY S. VOSHELL
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GLEASON
Represented By: SAMIA S. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, INC.
Represented By: JAMIE R. KURTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM BORNSTEIN
Represented By: GREGORY S. VOSHELL
Represented By: JEFFREY S. GLEASON
Represented By: SAMIA S. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENOMIND, INC.
Represented By: JASON BRETT MARTIN
Represented By: D. BRIAN HUFFORD
Represented By: ANDREW N. GOLDFARB
Represented By: JASON COWART
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. DICARLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?