HOLCZER et al v. A.O. SMITH CORP. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN D. HOLCZER and WANDA HOLCZER
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, HARDIE TYNES, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, SID HARVEY MID ATLANTIC, INC., CRANE CO., ATWOOD & MORRILL, POWELL VALVES, WARREN PUMPS LLC, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC, MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., STOCKHAM VALVES AND FITTINGS, WALWORTH COMPANY, CARRIER CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS INC., A.O. SMITH CORP., ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, SPENCE VALVES, GTE PRODUCTS OF CONNECTICUT CORPORATION, VIAD CORPORATION, NORTHERN PUMP, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, CRANE COCHRANE, KUNKLE VALVE, TIMKEN POWER SYSTEMS, J.A. SEXAUER, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, GARDNER-DENVER-NASH, EMERSON ELECTRIC, BW/IP INC., A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., TUTHILL PUMPS, FLOWSERVE, YORK INTERNATIONAL, THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION and IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00420
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Referring Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
2 Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 79 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE COCHRANE.(BRUCH, G.)
March 29, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE COCHRANE with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL CONFER WITH OPPOSING COUNSEL WITHIN THE NEXT TEN DAYS AND SUBMIT A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE UNDERSIGNED FOR HER CONSIDERATION.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 3/26/2021. 3/26/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR PRETRIALDISCOVERY, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL PREPARATION AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/26/2021. 3/26/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER THAT THE #61 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 4/2/2021 AMENDING THE CAPTION AND PROPERLY IDENTIFYING THE DEFENDANTS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL AMEND THE DOCKET TO CONFORM WITH THE CAPTION OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/25/2021.3/25/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 74 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Flowserve Corporation by BW/IP INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
March 15, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
March 15, 2021 Filing 72 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by A.W. CHESTERTON, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
March 15, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
March 10, 2021 Filing 70 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
March 10, 2021 Filing 69 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
March 5, 2021 Filing 68 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by KUNKLE VALVE.(KADISH, ERIC)
March 5, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of KUNKLE VALVE with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
March 5, 2021 Filing 66 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EMERSON ELECTRIC.(KADISH, ERIC)
March 5, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of EMERSON ELECTRIC with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
March 5, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER, LLC (VALINIS, SUSAN)
March 5, 2021 Filing 63 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by YORK INTERNATIONAL.(ARTHUR, AARON)
March 5, 2021 Filing 62 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GOULDS PUMPS INC..(ARTHUR, AARON)
March 5, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended and Amend Caption filed by JOHN D. HOLCZER..(PAUL, ROBERT)
March 4, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER on behalf of GARDNER-DENVER-NASH (SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
March 1, 2021 Filing 59 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
March 1, 2021 Filing 58 ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ALLEN-BRADLEY CO.S ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
March 1, 2021 Filing 57 CARRIER CORPORATION'S ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint AND JURY DEMAND; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; CROSS-CLAIMS; AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
February 26, 2021 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOHN D. HOLCZER.(PAUL, ROBERT)
February 25, 2021 DOC # 55 ALONG WITH ECF NOTIFICATION/REGISTRATION PACKET SENT TO COUNSEL ON 2/25/21 (rf, )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF CHRISTOPHER J. HEGA IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/24/2021.2/24/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO C. HEGA. (kp, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 54 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL )
February 24, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY F. TURNER on behalf of SPIRAX SARCO (TURNER, TIFFANY)
February 23, 2021 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
February 23, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(STOKES, GREGORY)
February 23, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of TUTHILL PUMPS with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service, for TUTHILL CORPORATION, improperly named as Tuthill Pumps(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
February 23, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
February 23, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of FLOWSERVE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service, for Anchor Darling Valve Company only, improperly named as Flowserve successor to Anchor Darling(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
February 22, 2021 Filing 47 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Belden 1993 LLC with Certificate of Service by BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC.(DEZII, DAWN)
February 22, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
February 22, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of BF GOODRICH COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
February 22, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID C. WEINBERG on behalf of GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC. with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(WEINBERG, DAVID)
February 22, 2021 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC..(WEINBERG, DAVID)
February 22, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Hega, Esq. filed by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL.Affidavit and Certificate of Service.(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
February 22, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Hega, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14931092.) filed by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL.Affidavit and Certificate of Service.(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
February 22, 2021 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL.(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
February 22, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM R. ADAMS on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL with Jury Demand(ADAMS, WILLIAM)
February 18, 2021 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 18, 2021 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Johnson Controls International plc with Certificate of Service by YORK INTERNATIONAL.(ARTHUR, AARON)
February 18, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of YORK INTERNATIONAL with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
February 18, 2021 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT Inc. with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS INC..(ARTHUR, AARON)
February 18, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
February 17, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE by JOHN D. HOLCZER Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Disclosure (PAUL, ROBERT)
February 17, 2021 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by J.A. SEXAUER.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
February 17, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of J.A. SEXAUER (RAU, TIMOTHY)
February 17, 2021 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
February 17, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (RAU, TIMOTHY)
February 17, 2021 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NORTHERN PUMP.(REBER, W.)
February 17, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of NORTHERN PUMP with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 26 Disclosure with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VIAD CORPORATION.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
February 16, 2021 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VIAD CORPORATION.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
February 16, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by VIAD CORPORATION.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
February 16, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN O'BRIEN on behalf of VIAD CORPORATION (O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
February 16, 2021 Filing 22 Entry of Appearance with ANSWER to Complaint by POWELL VALVES.(MUELLER, WILLIAM)
February 16, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by INGRID H. GRAFF on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GRAFF, INGRID)
February 16, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE #5 MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 3/15/2021.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/16/2021.2/16/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Filed by General Electric and) filed by JOHN D. HOLCZER. (PAUL, ROBERT)
February 11, 2021 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A.O. SMITH CORP..(KADISH, ERIC)
February 11, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORP. (KADISH, ERIC)
February 10, 2021 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ALLEN-BRADLEY CO.S ANSWER to Complaint AND JURY DEMAND; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; CROSS-CLAIMS; AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY (BRUCH, G.)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING with Jury Demand/Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss (Filed by General Electric and) filed by CBS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. MCSHEA on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14879320.), filed by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(MCSHEA, JOHN) Modified on 2/1/2021 (lvj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLCZER et al v. A.O. SMITH CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARDIE TYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: WILLIAM R. ADAMS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. HEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SID HARVEY MID ATLANTIC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATWOOD & MORRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWELL VALVES
Represented By: WILLIAM F. MUELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO.
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.
Represented By: DAVID C. WEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STOCKHAM VALVES AND FITTINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALWORTH COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: GREGORY M. STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS INC.
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORP.
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPENCE VALVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE PRODUCTS OF CONNECTICUT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORPORATION
Represented By: KEVIN O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN PUMP
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF GOODRICH COMPANY
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COCHRANE
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUNKLE VALVE
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMKEN POWER SYSTEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. SEXAUER
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDDAWAY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER-DENVER-NASH
Represented By: CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON ELECTRIC
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUTHILL PUMPS
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: INGRID H. GRAFF
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN D. HOLCZER
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA HOLCZER
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?