J Morita MFG v. Dental Imaging Technologies
Plaintiff: J Morita MFG
Defendant: Kavo Kerr Group and Dental Imaging Technologies
Case Number: 2:2021cv00663
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 61 HAS BEEN MAILED TO COUNSEL. (bw, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDERED THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON JULY 29, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M., BEFORE THE HONORABLE MARILYN HEFFLEY, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, VIA TELEPHONE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MAGISTRATE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 4/1/21. 4/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, ) Modified on 4/1/2021 (jaa, ).
April 1, 2021 DOC. 60 MAILED TO COUNSEL WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESS. (sg, )
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDERED AS FOLLOWS THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE UNDER RULE 12(B)(3) AND TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) (DOC. NO. 23) AND PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 43), IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT; UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING VENUE DISCOVERY (DOC. NO. 31), PLAINTIFFS PROVISIONAL MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (DOC. NO. 32), THE PARTIES STIPULATED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA (DOC. NO. 41), AND THE COURTS FEBRUARY 11, 2021 ORDER GRANTING THE STIPULATED MOTION TO TRANSFER (DOC. NO. 42), IT IS ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR VENUE DISCOVERY (DOC. NO. 31) AND PROVISION MOTION TO TRANSFER (DOC. NO. 32) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. J MORITA MFG CORP., PLAINTIFF, V. DENTAL IMAGINING TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, DEFENDANT AND UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION FOR TIME EXTENSION WITH RESPECT TO RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE AND REPORT AND RULE 16 CONFERENCE (DOC. NO. 53), IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/31/21.4/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.
March 31, 2021 PAPER #59 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/25/2021 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/14/2022. MOTIONS DUE BY 8/11/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/30/21. 3/31/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE by Dental Imaging Technologies of Withdrawal of Amy F. Sorenson as Counsel (FISHER, MICHAEL)
March 30, 2021 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Pretrial Conference held on 3/30/21 (jaa, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 56 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by J Morita MFG.(BUTLER, DENNIS)
March 17, 2021 Filing 55 ANSWER to #50 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim - Answer and Defenses to the Counterclaims with Certificate of Service by J Morita MFG.(SIMMONS, JOHN)
March 2, 2021 Filing 54 AMENDED ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/30/21 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/2/21. 3/2/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL )
March 2, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 54 HAS BEEN MAILED TO COUNSEL, SORENSON AND NICHOLS. (bw, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Respect to Rule 26(f) Conference and Report and Rule 16 Conference filed by Dental Imaging Technologies.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FISHER, MICHAEL)
March 1, 2021 Document #52 mailed to attorneys. (kw, )
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDERED THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, MARCH 9, 2021, AT 10:00 A.M. AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/26/21. 2/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 2/26/2021 (jaa, ). *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.
February 26, 2021 Filing 51 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Envista Holdings Corporation with Certificate of Service by Dental Imaging Technologies.(FISHER, MICHAEL)
February 26, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to #43 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against J Morita MFG by Dental Imaging Technologies.(FISHER, MICHAEL)
February 24, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN D. SIMMONS on behalf of J Morita MFG (SIMMONS, JOHN)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #46 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DAMIAN C. SMITH, ESQ. IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S #47 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF TERRENCE J. EDWARDS, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/24/21.2/24/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 23, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Terrence J. Edwards ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14934875.) filed by J Morita MFG. Affidavit, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BUTLER, DENNIS)
February 23, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Damian C. Smith ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14934813.) filed by J Morita MFG.Affidavit, and Certificate of Service.(BUTLER, DENNIS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (tjd, ).
February 23, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS JAMES BUTLER on behalf of J Morita MFG (BUTLER, DENNIS)
February 17, 2021 Filing 44 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:20-cv-00475. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 12, 2021 Filing 43 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dental Imaging Technologies with Jury Demand. filed by J Morita MFG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue to Eastern District of Pennsylvania: 1. Leave for Plaintiff J Morita Mfg. Corp. to file its Second Amended Complaint, #29 -1, is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its Second Amended Complaint within one business day of entry of this Order. 2. Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies Corp. shall preserve all of its defenses to this lawsuit. 3. This case shall be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (E.D. Pa.) two business days after entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/11/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 41 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Katherine R. Nichols filed by Amy F. Sorenson on behalf of Dental Imaging Technologies (Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support for Venue Discovery filed by Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hales Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pensa Declaration)(Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support or Transfer Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hales Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pensa Declaration)(Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Marc Pensa, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hatfield, PA Map)(Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. (Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/30/20. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 34 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for DITC to Respond to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (ECF 29), Motion for Discovery (ECF 31) and Motion to Change Venue (ECF 32), and to Reply to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (ECF 23)) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Nichols, Katherine) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 19, 2020 Filing 33 Motions No Longer Referred: #29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and #32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Change Venue will be addressed by the District Court. [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff J Morita MFG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Smith, Damian) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support for Venue Discovery filed by Plaintiff J Morita MFG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bard Decision) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Smith, Damian) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 30 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support or Transfer Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff J Morita MFG. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Damian C. Smith)(Smith, Damian) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff J Morita MFG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint (Clean), #2 Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit F to Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 2 - Second Amended Complaint (redlined)) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Smith, Damian) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED #24 . Plaintiff shall have until December 18, 2020 within which to file a response. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's request for amendment should be filed as a separate and distinct motion consistent with the requirements of local rule DUCivR 15-1. See DUCivR 15-1(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/7/2020. No attached document. [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Related Case by Dental Imaging Technologies (Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support or Transfer Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Amended Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. (Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Defendant to file a response or notice of non-opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Time #24 no later than December 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/1/2020. (amn) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support or Transfer Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support , Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Amended Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff J Morita MFG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Edwards, Terrence) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support or Transfer Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Marc Pensa)(Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 9/14/2020. (lnp) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 21 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to District Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies identifying Envista Holdings Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to file answer to #15 First Amended Complaint. Defendant's answer due 11/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/21/20. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Dental Imaging Technologies. Form due by 9/8/2020. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 21, 2020 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Dental Imaging Technologies to 11/5/2020 per Order #17 . (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Time to A filed by Plaintiff J Morita MFG. (Smith, Damian) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Dental Imaging Technologies Corporation. Removed Defendants: Kavokerr Group. filed by J Morita MFG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Edwards, Terrence) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #8 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Kavo Kerr Group. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael A. Fisher for Kavo Kerr Group.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/6/20. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Martin J. Black for Kavo Kerr Group.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/6/20. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Fisher , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3673901,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Kavo Kerr Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Martin J. Black , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3673867,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Kavo Kerr Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff J Morita MFG, Defendant Kavo Kerr Group. Form due by 8/12/2020. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R. Nichols on behalf of Kavo Kerr Group (Nichols, Katherine) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy F. Sorenson on behalf of Kavo Kerr Group (Sorenson, Amy) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kavo Kerr Group. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant within (7) days after the filing of the first answer. Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.2, the parties shall hold their conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than thirty-five (35) days after the filing of the first answer to discuss and address those matters found in the form scheduling order located on the court's website. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/1/20. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jl) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kavo Kerr Group (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3634554) filed by J Morita MFG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Edwards, Terrence) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff J Morita MFG is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl) [Transferred from Utah on 2/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J Morita MFG v. Dental Imaging Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kavo Kerr Group
Represented By: MARTIN J. BLACK
Represented By: Katherine R. Nichols
Represented By: MICHAEL A. FISHER
Represented By: AMY F. SORENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Imaging Technologies
Represented By: MARTIN J. BLACK
Represented By: Katherine R. Nichols
Represented By: MICHAEL A. FISHER
Represented By: AMY F. SORENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Morita MFG
Represented By: DAMIAN C. SMITH
Represented By: TERRENCE J. EDWARDS
Represented By: JOHN D. SIMMONS
Represented By: DENNIS JAMES BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?