Rajan v. Crawford
Plaintiff: Raja Rajan
Defendant: Alastair Crawford, ASAF GOLA, SHADRON STASTNEY and KEVIN GOLLOP
Case Number: 2:2021cv01150
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by WE SERVE LAW LLC re: served AMENDED COMPLAINT, SUMMONS upon SHADRON STASTNEY by Personal Service on or about 5/5/21. (Attachments: #1 Email)(fdc)
May 5, 2021 Filing 19 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's #17 Second Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Raja Rajan, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Email)(fdc)
April 30, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raja Rajan re: Raja Rajan served Summons and Complaint upon ASAF GOLA by Certified Mail. ASAF GOLA served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Email)(fdc, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Alastair Crawford.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MOL, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Text of Proposed Order Order, #13 Certificate of Service COS)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ALASTAIR CRAWFORD'S #11 MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/14/21.4/14/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
April 8, 2021 Summons Issued as to ASAF GOLA, KEVIN GOLLOP, SHADRON STASTNEY. Forwarded To: Raja Rajan on 4/8/21. (fdc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alastair Crawford, SHADRON STASTNEY, ASAF GOLA, KEVIN GOLLOP, filed by Raja Rajan. (Attachments: #1 Email)(fdc)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 3/30/21 IS POSTPONED PENDING DISPOSITION OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/25/21. 3/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Alastair Crawford Notice Regarding Rule 26(f) Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service COS)(OWENS, ALEXANDER)
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL )
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Alastair Crawford.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION FOR EBEN P.COLBY, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b)(DOC. NO. 8), IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND EBEN P. COLBY, ESQUIREIS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THE DEFENDANT ALASTAIRCRAWFORD FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/16/2021.3/17/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION FOR MARLEYANN BRUMME, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE83.5.2(b) (DOC. NO. 7), IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND MARLEY ANNBRUMME, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT THEDEFENDANT ALASTAIR CRAWFORD FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/16/2021.3/17/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Eben P. Colby, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14987141.) filed by Alastair Crawford.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration Colby, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration Rosenblum, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order, #4 Certificate of Service COS)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Marley Ann Brumme, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14987054.) filed by Alastair Crawford.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration Brumme, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration Rosenblum, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order, #4 Certificate of Service COS)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR TUESDAY, 3/30/21 AT 8:30 AM IN ROOM 9614 BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 3/12/21. 3/15/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HON. HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 3/12/21. 3/12/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC S. RASPANTI on behalf of Alastair Crawford with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS)(RASPANTI, MARC)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER M. OWENS on behalf of Alastair Crawford with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS)(OWENS, ALEXANDER)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS KEITH ROSENBLUM on behalf of Alastair Crawford with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alastair Crawford (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14974703), filed by Alastair Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Federal -Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Federal - Designation Form, #6 Certificate of Service COS)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rajan v. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alastair Crawford
Represented By: DOUGLAS KEITH ROSENBLUM
Represented By: MARC S. RASPANTI
Represented By: ALEXANDER M. OWENS
Represented By: EBEN P. COLBY
Represented By: MARLEY ANN BRUMME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASAF GOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHADRON STASTNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN GOLLOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raja Rajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?