RAJAN et al v. Crawford et al
Plaintiff: MATHU RAJAN and Raja Rajan
Defendant: PATRICK MILES, Alastair Crawford, KRISTOFF KABACINSKI, SHADRON STASTNEY, ASAF GOLA and KEVIN GOLLOP
Case Number: 2:2021cv01456
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Mailed doc. 19 and 20 to counsel along with ECF forms. (er, )
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF GABRIEL M. HARTSELL, ESQ IS GRANTED AND GABRIEL M. HARTSELL IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT DEFENDANT SHADRON STASTNEY FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ECF SYSTEM AND FOLLOW JUDGE SAVAGE'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/20/21.5/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF BRITTANY OGDEN, ESQ IS GRANTED AND BRITTANY OGDEN IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT TO REPRESENT DEFENDANT SHADRON STASTNEY FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY. IT IS FURTHER ORDEREDE THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE ALL PLEADINGS ELECTRONICALLY USING THE ECF SYSTEM AND FOLLOW JUDGE SAVAGE'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/20/21.5/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Amended Complaint filed by SHADRON STASTNEY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(GRUGAN, TERENCE)
May 19, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel Hartsell ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15135224.) filed by SHADRON STASTNEY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(GRUGAN, TERENCE)
May 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brittany Ogden ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15135219.) filed by SHADRON STASTNEY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(GRUGAN, TERENCE)
May 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILIA L. MCKEE VASSALLO on behalf of SHADRON STASTNEY with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCKEE VASSALLO, EMILIA)
May 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE GRUGAN on behalf of SHADRON STASTNEY with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GRUGAN, TERENCE)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT IT REQUESTS AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE OUTSTANDING MOTION TO DISMISS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 6/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/14/21.5/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Email)(mbh, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by MATHU RAJAN re: served Summons and Amended Complaint upon Shadron Stastney by Personal Service on 5/5/21 (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Alastair Crawford, PATRICK MILES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MOL, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order, #6 Certificate of Service COS)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
April 20, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #9 TO PRO SE PARTY ON 4/20/21. (jaa, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ALASTAIR CRAWFORD AND PATRICK MILES'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/19/21.4/19/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL )
April 19, 2021 (4) Summons on Amended Complaint mailed to pro se plff on 4/19/21. (kw, )
April 16, 2021 Summons Issued (per chambers) as to ASAF GOLA, KEVIN GOLLOP, KRISTOFF KABACINSKI and SHADRON STASTNEY. Forwarded to pro se plaintiff on 4/16/21 (mbh, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 First Amended Complaint against ALASTAIR CRAWFORD, PATRICK MILES, KEVIN GOLLOP, KRISTOFF KABACINSKI, ASAF GOLA and SHADRON STASTNEY filed by MATHU RAJAN. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
April 5, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #5 AND #6 TO PRO SE PARTIES ON 4/5/21. (jaa, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alastair Crawford, PATRICK MILES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR EBEN P. COLBY, ESQ TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/2/21.4/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR MARLEY ANN BRUMME, ESQ TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/2/21.4/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Eben P. Cobly ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15027164.) filed by Alastair Crawford, PATRICK MILES.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration Cobly, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration Rosenblum, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order, #4 Certificate of Service COS)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Marley Ann Brumme, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15027094.) filed by Alastair Crawford, PATRICK MILES.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration Brumme, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration Rosenblum, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order, #4 Certificate of Service COS)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alastair Crawford, PATRICK MILES (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15013988), filed by Alastair Crawford, PATRICK MILES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service on Patrick Miles, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service on Alastair Crawford, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Motion and Brief to Amend Complaint, #6 Exhibit F -- State Court Case Management Order, #7 Exhibit G - Designation Form, #8 Exhibit H - Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAJAN et al v. Crawford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK MILES
Represented By: DOUGLAS KEITH ROSENBLUM
Represented By: ALEXANDER M. OWENS
Represented By: MARC S. RASPANTI
Represented By: MARLEY ANN BRUMME
Represented By: EBEN P. COLBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alastair Crawford
Represented By: DOUGLAS KEITH ROSENBLUM
Represented By: ALEXANDER M. OWENS
Represented By: MARC S. RASPANTI
Represented By: MARLEY ANN BRUMME
Represented By: EBEN P. COLBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTOFF KABACINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHADRON STASTNEY
Represented By: BRITTANY OGDEN
Represented By: TERENCE GRUGAN
Represented By: GABRIEL M. HARTSELL
Represented By: EMILIA L. MCKEE VASSALLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASAF GOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN GOLLOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATHU RAJAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raja Rajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?