STALMACH et al v. ABB, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F. STALMACH and KIMBERLY S. STALMACH
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., CBS CORPORATION, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., VIACOM INC., ABB, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, INC., SQUARE D COMPANY, GRINNELL LLC, PFIZER, INC., CRANE CO., ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., THE GAGE COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., DANA COMPANIES LLC, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, ARROW CASTING COMPANY, ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, ITT CORPORATION, CARBORUNDUM, ASBEKA INDUSTRIES OF NY, INC., FLOWSERVE US, INC., GARFIELD MOLDING CO., MCCORD CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, FMC CORPORATION, SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY, CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, MERIDEN MOLDED PLASTICS, INC., EATON CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, WABTEC CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. and FEDERAL MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST
Case Number: 2:2021cv01705
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 87 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN) Modified on 6/2/2021 (tjd).
May 25, 2021 Filing 86 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with Certificate of Service by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION.(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
May 25, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY on behalf of INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
May 24, 2021 Filing 84 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(LOCKETT, MARK)
May 21, 2021 Filing 83 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sarco International Corporation by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
May 21, 2021 Filing 82 Initial Disclosures by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) Modified on 5/25/2021 (tjd).
May 21, 2021 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint (AMENDED), AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by SPIRAX SARCO, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
May 21, 2021 Filing 80 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including subsidiary of Electrolux Holdings, Inc. by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
May 21, 2021 Filing 79 Initial Disclosures by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) Modified on 5/25/2021 (tjd).
May 21, 2021 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY)
May 20, 2021 Filing 77 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures with Certificate of Service by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC..(BLOCK, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/24/2021 (tjd).
May 20, 2021 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint certificate of service, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, Answers to Cross-Claims by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC..(BLOCK, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/24/2021 (tjd).
May 20, 2021 Filing 75 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Saint-Gobain Group with Certificate of Service by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC..(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
May 20, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BLOCK on behalf of SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC. with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
May 20, 2021 Filing 73 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures with Certificate of Service by DANA COMPANIES LLC.(BLOCK, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/24/2021 (tjd).
May 20, 2021 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint certificate of service, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, Answer to All Crossclaims by DANA COMPANIES LLC. Affirmative Defenses.(BLOCK, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/24/2021 (tjd).
May 20, 2021 Filing 71 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Enstar Holding (US) LLC with Certificate of Service by DANA COMPANIES LLC.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
May 20, 2021 Filing 70 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
May 20, 2021 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants and Answers to All Crossclaims by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Affirmative Defenses.(LOCKETT, MARK) Modified on 5/24/2021 (tjd).
May 20, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK ALLEN LOCKETT on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (LOCKETT, MARK)
May 17, 2021 Filing 67 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cleaver-Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
May 17, 2021 Filing 66 Amended ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM and REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
May 17, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(VALINIS, SUSAN)
May 17, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH A. LEWIS on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(LEWIS, LEAH)
May 14, 2021 Filing 63 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including John Wood Group plc (Scotland) with Certificate of Service by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
May 14, 2021 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM and REPLY TO CROSSCLAIMS against All Defendants by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
May 14, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSEY E. LUNNEY on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(LUNNEY, LINDSEY)
May 14, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(VALINIS, SUSAN)
May 13, 2021 Filing 59 Eaton Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EATON CORPORATION. Affirmative Defenses.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY) Modified on 5/16/2021 (tjd).
May 11, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint , Reply to All Crossclaims by ASBEKA INDUSTRIES OF NY, INC. Affirmative Defenses.(CORCORAN, BRIAN) Modified on 5/12/2021 (tjd).
May 11, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. CORCORAN on behalf of ASBEKA INDUSTRIES OF NY, INC. with Certificate of Service(CORCORAN, BRIAN)
May 10, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY on behalf of MCCORD CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(BAILEY, MEGAN)
May 7, 2021 Filing 55 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PFIZER, INC..(HANNA, THOMAS)
May 7, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. HANNA on behalf of PFIZER, INC. with Certificate of Service(HANNA, THOMAS)
May 7, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
May 6, 2021 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, Answer to all Crossclaims by WABTEC CORPORATION. Affirmative Defenses.(LOCKETT, MARK) Modified on 5/7/2021 (tjd).
May 5, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM & Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by ITT CORPORATION(INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BELL & GOSSLETT).(ARTHUR, AARON)
May 5, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM & Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by ITT CORPORATION(INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BELL & GOSSLETT).(ARTHUR, AARON)
May 5, 2021 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM & Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by GRINNELL LLC.(ARTHUR, AARON)
May 5, 2021 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM & Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by GRINNELL LLC.(ARTHUR, AARON)
May 5, 2021 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended), Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM & Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by GOULDS PUMPS, INC..(ARTHUR, AARON)
May 5, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM & Answer to Cross Claims against All Defendants by GOULDS PUMPS, INC..(ARTHUR, AARON)
May 5, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE US, INC..(SMITH, ZACHARY)
April 30, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross-Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC CORPORATION.(REBER, W.)
April 29, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BLOCK on behalf of DANA COMPANIES LLC with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
April 29, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(RIDEOUT, CHRISTINA)
April 29, 2021 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants and Answer to Crossclaims by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(REBER, W.) Modified on 4/30/2021 (tjd).
April 29, 2021 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..(REBER, W.)
April 29, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
April 29, 2021 Filing 38 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL )
April 28, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY F. TURNER on behalf of SPIRAX SARCO, INC. (TURNER, TIFFANY)
April 28, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY F. TURNER on behalf of ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. (TURNER, TIFFANY)
April 27, 2021 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
April 27, 2021 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and Imo Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
April 27, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
April 22, 2021 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SINGER, STEWART)
April 22, 2021 Filing 31 Initial Disclosures with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SINGER, STEWART) Modified on 4/26/2021 (tjd).
April 22, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint together with Answer to Crossclaims to Amended Complaint by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SINGER, STEWART) Modified on 4/26/2021 (tjd).
April 22, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Crossclaims by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SINGER, STEWART) Modified on 4/26/2021 (tjd).
April 22, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
April 21, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants and Reply to All Crossclaims by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY. Affirmative Defenses.(DISIPIO, BASIL) Modified on 4/26/2021 (tjd).
April 21, 2021 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
April 21, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY with Jury Demand & Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
April 20, 2021 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT Inc. with Certificate of Service by ITT CORPORATION.(ARTHUR, AARON)
April 20, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of ITT CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
April 20, 2021 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Johnson Controls International plc f/k/a Tyco International plc with Certificate of Service by GRINNELL LLC.(ARTHUR, AARON)
April 20, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of GRINNELL LLC with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
April 20, 2021 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT Inc. with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS, INC..(ARTHUR, AARON)
April 20, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
April 20, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #18 TO COUNSEL ON 4/20/21. (jaa, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' #13 MOTION FOR THE RO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DANIEL J. WASSERBERG, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/19/21.4/19/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO NON-ECF ATTY. (fdc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY.(RYAN, DANIEL)
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY (RYAN, DANIEL)
April 16, 2021 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Rexnord LLC by ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC.(RYAN, DANIEL)
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC (RYAN, DANIEL)
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. Wasserberg ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15060206.) filed by JOSEPH F. STALMACH, KIMBERLY S. STALMACH..(EGNER, JENNA)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY SMITH on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(SMITH, ZACHARY)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Flowserve Corporation with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE US, INC..(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WABTEC CORPORATION.(LOCKETT, MARK)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. NEESON on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(NEESON, PETER)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FMC CORPORATION.(REBER, W.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of FMC CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by INGRID H. GRAFF on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GRAFF, INGRID)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Entry of Appearance of Jenna Kristal Egner filed by JOSEPH F. STALMACH, KIMBERLY S. STALMACH. (EGNER, JENNA) Modified on 4/14/2021 (tjd).
April 9, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE226288 (sbt, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WABTEC CORPORATION from PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 201001352. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, ) Modified on 4/12/2021 (bw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STALMACH et al v. ABB, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: PETER J. NEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM INC.
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTINA M. RIDEOUT
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS P. HANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GAGE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: MARK ALLEN LOCKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA COMPANIES LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY F. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARROW CASTING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT CORPORATION
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARBORUNDUM
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBEKA INDUSTRIES OF NY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC.
Represented By: BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL
Represented By: ZACHARY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARFIELD MOLDING CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCORD CORPORATION
Represented By: MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEWART R. SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: LINDSEY E. LUNNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: W. MATTHEW REBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: LEAH A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED SIGNAL, INC.
Represented By: PETER J. NEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERIDEN MOLDED PLASTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: INGRID H. GRAFF
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABTEC CORPORATION
Represented By: MARK ALLEN LOCKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F. STALMACH
Represented By: SAMUEL MEIROWITZ
Represented By: JENNA KRISTAL EGNER
Represented By: SAMUEL MILES MEIROWITZ
Represented By: DANIEL J. WASSERBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY S. STALMACH
Represented By: SAMUEL MEIROWITZ
Represented By: JENNA KRISTAL EGNER
Represented By: SAMUEL MILES MEIROWITZ
Represented By: DANIEL J. WASSERBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?