IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC v. TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO et al
Plaintiff: IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC
Defendant: HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO and TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO
Case Number: 2:2021cv01793
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO, TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO.**(REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT, SEE DOCUMENT #13 FOR ORIGINAL FILING AND PDF)**(tjd)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF PATRICK M. MCCARTHY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/1/21. 6/1/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO, TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (BORGER, MATTHEW)
June 1, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC by HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO, TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(BORGER, MATTHEW)
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Patrick M. McCarthy ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15154015.) filed by HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO, TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO.Certificate of Service.(BORGER, MATTHEW)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE APPICATION OF JOSEPH W. BARBER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/25/21. 5/25/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
May 5, 2021 Filing fee: $ 40, receipt number PPE227196 (sbt, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID H. SIEGEL, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/5/21. 5/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF DANIELLE M. DEFILIPPIS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/5/21. 5/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David H. Siegel, Esquire by IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BERGER, DAVID)
May 4, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-15097647). (BERGER, DAVID)
May 4, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-15097622). (BERGER, DAVID)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joseph W. Barber filed by HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO, TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO.Certificate of Service.(BORGER, MATTHEW)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle M. DeFilippis, Esquire by IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BERGER, DAVID)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. BORGER on behalf of HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO, TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO with Certificate of Service(BORGER, MATTHEW)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC. HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021; TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (BERGER, DAVID)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration by IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC. (BERGER, DAVID)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15061029.), filed by IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Designation Form)(BERGER, DAVID)
April 16, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC. (md, )
April 16, 2021 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC.(SEE PAPER #2 FOR PDF)(md, )
April 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO, TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/16/21 (jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC v. TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMES BREWERY LLC D/B/A TROOBADO
Represented By: PATRICK M. MCCARTHY
Represented By: MATTHEW J. BORGER
Represented By: JOSEPH W. BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK BRANDS, LLC D/B/A TROOBADO
Represented By: PATRICK M. MCCARTHY
Represented By: MATTHEW J. BORGER
Represented By: JOSEPH W. BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMPRINT BEER CO. LLC
Represented By: DAVID C. BERGER
Represented By: DAVID H. SIEGEL
Represented By: DANIELLE M. DEFILIPPIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?