SCHAFFER et al v. PARKER et al
Plaintiff: RAYMOND SCHAFFER, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC, ROODLY AIME and AIME ENTERPRISES LLC
Defendant: REHAB QUEEN OHIO LLC, PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC, G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC, MAYBACH CONSTRUCTION LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, PARKER UNLIMITED PROPERTIES LLC, GREG PARKER doing business as G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC doing business as PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC doing business as PARKER UNLIMITED PROPERTIES LLC doing business as REHAB QUEEN OHIO LLC and DANIELLE MORRIS-PARKER doing business as G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC doing business as PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC doing business as PARKER UNLIMITED PROPERTIES LLC doing business as REHAB QUEEN OHIO LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02171
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC. REHAB QUEEN OHIO LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 15, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC. PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC. MAYBACH CONSTRUCTION LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC. GREG PARKER waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC. G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC. DANIELLE MORRIS-PARKER waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC as to PARKER UNLIMITED PROPERTIES LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC as to PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC as to MAYBACH CONSTRUCTION LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC as to GREG PARKER. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC as to G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC as to DANIELLE MORRIS-PARKER. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 Statement RICO CASE STATEMENT by ROODLY AIME, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/20/21. 5/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT PLAINITFFS SHALL FILE A RICO CASE STATEMENT WHICH SHALL INCLUDE FACTS UPON WHICH THE PLAINTIFFS RELIED TO INITIATE THEIR RICO CLAIMS AS A RESULT OF THE "REASONABLE INQUIRY" REQUIRED BY FRCP 11 NO LATER THAN 5/21/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/13/21. 5/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-10, G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC, MAYBACH CONSTRUCTION LLC, DANIELLE MORRIS-PARKER, GREG PARKER, PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC, PARKER UNLIMITED PROPERTIES LLC, REHAB QUEEN OHIO LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15116823.), filed by ROODLY AIME, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY) Modified on 5/12/2021 (md, ).
May 12, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROODLY AIME, AIME ENTERPRISES LLC, RAYMOND SCHAFFER, SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC. (md, )
May 12, 2021 Summons Issued as to G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC, MAYBACH CONSTRUCTION LLC, DANIELLE MORRIS-PARKER, GREG PARKER, PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC, PARKER UNLIMITED PROPERTIES LLC, REHAB QUEEN OHIO LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/12/21 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHAFFER et al v. PARKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND SCHAFFER
Represented By: GARY SCHAFKOPF
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Represented By: L. ANTHONY DIJIACOMO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCHAFFER ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: GARY SCHAFKOPF
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Represented By: L. ANTHONY DIJIACOMO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROODLY AIME
Represented By: GARY SCHAFKOPF
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Represented By: L. ANTHONY DIJIACOMO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIME ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: GARY SCHAFKOPF
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Represented By: L. ANTHONY DIJIACOMO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REHAB QUEEN OHIO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYBACH CONSTRUCTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER UNLIMITED PROPERTIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG PARKER doing business as G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC doing business as PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC doing business as PARKER UNLIMITED PROPERTIES LLC doing business as REHAB QUEEN OHIO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE MORRIS-PARKER doing business as G PARKER UNLIMITED LLC doing business as PARKER PROPERTIES UNLIMITED LLC doing business as PARKER UNLIMITED PROPERTIES LLC doing business as REHAB QUEEN OHIO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?