ZAFTR INC. v. LAWRENCE et al
Plaintiff: ZAFTR INC.
Defendant: JOHN ALEXANDER KIRK, KIRK LAW PLLC, KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE, BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC and JOHN KIRK
Case Number: 2:2021cv02177
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC, KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE.(CELII, GABRIEL)
July 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by GABRIEL V. CELII on behalf of BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC, KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE with Certificate of Service(CELII, GABRIEL)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), (Contested) filed by ZAFTR INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHLOSSBERG, LEWIS)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE AND BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME BY 7/9/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/6/21. 7/8/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC; KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED AND THEY MAY PLEAD OR MOVE IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY 7/9/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/7/21. 7/7/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), (Contested) filed by BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC, KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE.Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Jameson Lawrence, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ARMSTRONG, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/7/2021 (afm, ).
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH M. ARMSTRONG on behalf of BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC, KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE with Certificate of Service(ARMSTRONG, JOSEPH)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Default ZAFTR INC. against BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC, KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavits of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Lewis W. Schlossberg)(SCHLOSSBERG, LEWIS)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Svella Technologies Ltd. with Certificate of Service by ZAFTR INC..(SCHLOSSBERG, LEWIS)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Deputy Ryan Baer #9156 re: served Summons and Complaint upon Defendant BVFR & Associates, LLC by Personal Service on June 2, 2021 (SCHLOSSBERG, LEWIS)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Deputy Ryan Baer #9156 re: served Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Kevin Jameson Lawrence by Personal Service on June 2, 2021 (SCHLOSSBERG, LEWIS)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTEN J. COLEMAN on behalf of JOHN KIRK, KIRK LAW PLLC (COLEMAN, KRISTEN)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH L. LAVER on behalf of JOHN KIRK, KIRK LAW PLLC with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(LAVER, SETH)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Travis County Constable Andres Sosa, Jr., Sr. Deputy #513 re: served Summons and Complaint upon John Kirk by Personal Service on June 1, 2021 (SCHLOSSBERG, LEWIS)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Travis County Constable Andres Sosa, Jr., Sr. Deputy #513 re: served Summons and Complaint upon Kirk Law PLLC by Personal Service on June 1, 2021 (SCHLOSSBERG, LEWIS)
May 13, 2021 Summons Issued as to BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC, JOHN KIRK, KIRK LAW PLLC, KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/13/21 (bw, )
May 12, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ZAFTR INC.. (fb)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC, JOHN KIRK, KIRK LAW PLLC, KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15117853.), filed by ZAFTR INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SCHLOSSBERG, LEWIS) Modified on 5/13/2021 (fb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZAFTR INC. v. LAWRENCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAFTR INC.
Represented By: LEWIS WAYNE SCHLOSSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ALEXANDER KIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRK LAW PLLC
Represented By: SETH L. LAVER
Represented By: KRISTEN J. COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN JAMESON LAWRENCE
Represented By: GABRIEL V. CELII
Represented By: JOSEPH M. ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BVFR & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: GABRIEL V. CELII
Represented By: JOSEPH M. ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KIRK
Represented By: SETH L. LAVER
Represented By: KRISTEN J. COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?