GONZALEZ et al v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Plaintiff: ILONKA GONZALEZ and JUAN GONZALEZ, JR.
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2021cv02272
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (va, )
June 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. Emailed To: Plaintiffs on 7/2/21. (va, ) (FILED IN ERROR. RE-FILED WITH CORRECT EVENT.) Modified on 7/2/2021 (va, ).
June 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, with Acceptance of Service. Emailed To: AUSA & Pro Se Plaintiffs on 7/2/21. (va, ) Modified on 7/2/2021 (va, ).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/30/21. 7/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
June 29, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE229123 (sbt, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF PLAINTIFFS SEEK TO PROCEED THEY MUST, NO LATER THAN JUNE 28, 2021, EITHER (1) PAY $402 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $52 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) MOVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE PLAINTIFFS WITH TWO (2) APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/27/21. 5/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
May 27, 2021 IFP FORM E-MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS ON 5/27/21. (va, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, filed by ILONKA GONZALEZ, JUAN GONZALEZ, JR. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 E-MAIL)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GONZALEZ et al v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILONKA GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN GONZALEZ, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?