MODERN PORTABLE REFRIGERATION, LLC v. TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS
Plaintiff: MODERN PORTABLE REFRIGERATION, LLC
Defendant: TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS and NORDIC ICE
Case Number: 2:2021cv02423
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED THAT THE ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) SCHEDULED FOR FRIDAY, JULY 30, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M. (ECF NO. 9) IS NOW SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 AT 8:30 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 6A, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/27/21. 7/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 17 Copy re: RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Compel Filed in State Court Before Removal filed by TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS. (SHANNON, DAVID) Modified on 7/28/2021 (tjd).
July 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Filed in State Court Before Removal filed by MODERN PORTABLE REFRIGERATION, LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum State Law Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to State Law Motion to Compel, #3 Declaration Certification of Opposition)(GAGLIANO, JOHN)
July 26, 2021 Filing 15 Letter dated 07/26/2021 by TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS. (SHANNON, DAVID)
July 26, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct The Complaint filed by MODERN PORTABLE REFRIGERATION, LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, Proposed Amended Compl)(GAGLIANO, JOHN)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 Report Of Rule 26(f) Conference by MODERN PORTABLE REFRIGERATION, LLC. (GAGLIANO, JOHN)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERD THAT THE PARTIES MUST THOROUGHLY PREPARE FOR THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE AND MEET AND CONFER AND FULLY COMPLY WITH RULE 26 INCLUDING THE FILING OF THE 26 (F) REPORT PURSUANT TO THE COURTS GUIDELINES. THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO COPY AND REVIEW THE GUIDELINES; THE PARTIES SHALL PRODUCE AT THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE A DOCUMENT SHOWING THE DISCOVERY THAT HAS BEEN DONE AND TIMELINE WITH EXACT DATES OF THE PROPOSED DISCOVERY LEFT TO BE COMPLETED AND THE DEPOSITIONS TO BE TAKEN, THE DATES OF WHICH MUST BE WITHIN THE PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER ATTACHED HERETO; THE PARTIES SHALL FILE OF RECORD THE OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY MOTION AND RESPONSES FILED IN STATE COURT MONDAY, JULY 26, 2021 CREATE A DOCUMENT WITH A JOINT PROCEDURAL TIMELINE OF THE COMMERCE COURT CASE AND THE SYNOPSIS OF ANY RULINGS TO DATE AND FILE THE TIMELINE OF RECORD BY MONDAY, JULY 26, 2121 AND ATTACHED IS A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/21/21. 7/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND (ECF NO. 8) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/21/21.7/21/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS. (SHANNON, DAVID)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT THE ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS NOW SCHEDULED FOR FRIDAY, JULY 30, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 8B, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/7/21. 7/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 7/9/2021 (tjd). (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/9/2021) (jaa, ).
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand filed by MODERN PORTABLE REFRIGERATION, LLC.Memorandum Of Law. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C)(GAGLIANO, JOHN)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/15/21. 6/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL )
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT AN ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, JULY 28, 2021 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 8B, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/3/21. 6/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/3/21. 6/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) with Affirmative Defenses by TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS.(SHANNON, DAVID)
May 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 191200181., filed by TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS. (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # 0313-15154144) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, Docket and Prior Pleadings, #6 Exhibit A - Part 1, #7 Exhibit A - Part 2, #8 Exhibit A - Part 3, #9 Exhibit A - Part 4, #10 Exhibit A - Part 5)(SHANNON, DAVID) Modified on 5/28/2021 (md, ).
May 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE by TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint; Docket and Prior Pleadings from State Court, #6 Exhibit A - Part 1, #7 Exhibit A - Part 2, #8 Exhibit A - Part 3, #9 Exhibit A - Part 4, #10 Exhibit A - Part 5)(SHANNON, DAVID) (FILED IN ERROR; ATTY HAS REFILED AT PAPER #2) Modified on 5/28/2021 (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MODERN PORTABLE REFRIGERATION, LLC v. TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPERATSURE LLC d/b/a NORDIC COLD CHAIN SOLUTIONS
Represented By: DAVID J. SHANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORDIC ICE
Represented By: DAVID J. SHANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MODERN PORTABLE REFRIGERATION, LLC
Represented By: JOHN JOSEPH GAGLIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?