BP AMERICA INC. et al v. DIWAN PETROL INC.
Plaintiff: BP AMERICA INC. and BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC.
Defendant: DIWAN PETROL INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02437
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Default Entered (JL )
July 7, 2021 DEFAULT BY DIWAN PETROL INC. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (JL )
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Default Against Defendant Diwan Petrol Inc. by BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC., BP AMERICA INC. against DIWAN PETROL INC., DIWAN PETROL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Request to Enter Default, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit in Support, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Entry of Default, #5 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, BARRY)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael Doyle re: served Summons and Complaint Against Diwant Petrol, Inc. served upon Rohan Rana, Managing Agent by Personal on 06/01/2021 (COHEN, BARRY)
June 17, 2021 DOC.S 8 AND 9 MAILED TO UNREP. (sg, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF PHILLIP BARENGOLTS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/16/21. 6/17/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP.(JL )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF NOVAIRA PAUL TO APPEAR IN THIS ACTION PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFFS IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/16/21. 6/17/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(JL )
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Phillip Barengolts, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15194622.) filed by BP AMERICA INC., BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC..Declaration, Certificate of Service.(COHEN, BARRY)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Novaira Paul, Esq. filed by BP AMERICA INC., BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC..Declaration, Certificate of Service.(COHEN, BARRY)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Phillp Barengolts by BP AMERICA INC., BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC... (COHEN, BARRY)
June 16, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by BP AMERICA INC., BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC.. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-15194795). (COHEN, BARRY)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including bp p.l.c. by BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC..(COHEN, BARRY)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including bp p.l.c. by BP AMERICA INC..(COHEN, BARRY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael Doyle re: served Summons and Complaint Against Diwant Petrol, Inc. served upon Rohan Rana by Personal on 06/01/2021 (COHEN, BARRY)
May 28, 2021 Summons Issued as to DIWAN PETROL INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 5/28/21 (JL )
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIWAN PETROL INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15155054.), filed by BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC., BP AMERICA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(COHEN, BARRY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BP AMERICA INC. et al v. DIWAN PETROL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BP AMERICA INC.
Represented By: JULIE M. LATSKO
Represented By: BARRY L. COHEN
Represented By: NOVAIRA T. PAUL
Represented By: PHILLIP BARENGOLTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC.
Represented By: JULIE M. LATSKO
Represented By: BARRY L. COHEN
Represented By: NOVAIRA T. PAUL
Represented By: PHILLIP BARENGOLTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIWAN PETROL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?