TALBERT v. EVERS et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES TALBERT
Defendant: JOSEPH H. EVERS, JACQUELINE F. ALLEN and IDEE E. FOX
Case Number: 2:2021cv02505
Filed: May 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT WE DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE AS FRIVOLOUS, FAILING TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF MAY BE GRANTED. WE DENY THE INCARCERATED PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER BASED ENTIRELY UPON HIS INCORPORATED COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/4/21. 6/4/21 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL )
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/4/21. 6/4/21 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL )
June 3, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE228100 (rf, )
June 3, 2021 PRO SE GUIDELINES MAILED TO TALBERT (rf, )
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by CHARLES TALBERT..(bw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2021: #1 Rule to Show Cause Order) (tjd, ). Modified on 6/3/2021 (tjd).
May 28, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
May 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JACQUELINE F. ALLEN, JOSEPH H. EVERS, IDEE E. FOX (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by CHARLES TALBERT. Modified on 6/3/2021 (bw, ). Modified on 6/3/2021 (tjd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TALBERT v. EVERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH H. EVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE F. ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDEE E. FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?