ROGALSKI v. WHITE et al
Plaintiff: SHEENA ROGALSKI
Defendant: HUAGUANG QU, M.D., GREGORY T. WHITE, JR., CAMI Z. WHITE, HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C., David Qu, M.D., CHRISTIAN ACHARTE, M.D., HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C. doing business as Pennsylvania Pain & Spine Institute and MARGARET W. MUNGAI, CRNP
Case Number: 2:2021cv03103
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against HUAGUANG QU, M.D. by HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C., GREGORY T. WHITE, JR, MARGARET W. MUNGAI, CRNP, CAMI Z. WHITE. Affirmative Defenses. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FARMAKIS, GEORGIOS) Modified on 9/9/2021 (tjd).
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike filed by SHEENA ROGALSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(JOKELSON, DEREK)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike filed by CHRISTIAN ACHARTE, M.D., HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C., HUAGUANG QU, M.D..Brief, Certificate of Service.(PLYTER, MARIE)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS GREGORY T. WHITE, JR., CAMI Z. WHITE, MARGARET W. MUNGAIR, CRNP AND HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/29/21. 8/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MARIE C. PLYTER on behalf of CHRISTIAN ACHARTE, M.D., HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C., HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C., HUAGUANG QU, M.D., HUAGUANG QU, M.D. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(PLYTER, MARIE)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGIOS FARMAKIS on behalf of HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C., MARGARET W. MUNGAI, CRNP, CAMI Z. WHITE, GREGORY T. WHITE, JR with Jury Demand(FARMAKIS, GEORGIOS)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH GOLDBERG on behalf of HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C., MARGARET W. MUNGAI, CRNP, CAMI Z. WHITE, GREGORY T. WHITE, JR with Jury Demand(GOLDBERG, JOSEPH)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION by HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C., MARGARET W. MUNGAI, CRNP, CAMI Z. WHITE, GREGORY T. WHITE, JR. (FARMAKIS, GEORGIOS)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL O. PITT on behalf of CHRISTIAN ACHARTE, HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C., HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C., HUAGUANG QU, M.D., HUAGUANG QU, M.D. with Certificate of Service(PITT, MICHAEL)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHEENA ROGALSKI re: Kendra Day served Summons and Complaint upon MARGARET W. MUNGAI, CRNP by Personal Service. MARGARET W. MUNGAI, CRNP served on 7/17/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (JOKELSON, DEREK)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED AS FOLLOWS THAT TEN (10) DAYS PRIOR TO ANY MOTION BEING FILED (INCLUDING A MOTION UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 12 OR 56, 28 U.S.C. 1441, OR 28 U.S.C. 1404), COUNSEL MUST NOTIFY OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE POTENTIAL MOTION, AND THE POSSIBLE RESOLUTION OF SAME. THESE DISCUSSIONS SHALL BE SUBSTANTIVE AND NOT PERFUNCTORY. TO THIS END, COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE THE OPPOSING PARTY WITH AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED DEFECTS PRIOR TO FILING A MOTION; IN THE EVENT THE PARTIES ARE UNABLE TO PRELIMINARILY NEGATE THE NEED FOR THE FILING OF A MOTION AFTER ENGAGING IN SUBSTANTIVE DISCUSSIONS, THE MOVING PARTY SHALL SO SPECIFY IN A CERTIFICATION ATTACHED AND FILED WITH THE MOTION. SAID CERTIFICATION SHALL INDICATE THE DATE(S) OF DISCUSSION(S) AND SHALL INFORM THE COURT OF THE PARTIES INABILITY TO REACH A RESOLUTION; AND, FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER SHALL RESULT IN DENIAL OF THE MOTION WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/19/21. 7/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPS.(jaa, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHEENA ROGALSKI re: James G. Robinson served Summons and Complaint upon HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C. by Personal Service. HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (JOKELSON, DEREK)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHEENA ROGALSKI re: James G. Robinson served Summons and Complaint upon CHRISTIAN ACHARTE, M.D. by Personal Service. CHRISTIAN ACHARTE, M.D. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (JOKELSON, DEREK)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHEENA ROGALSKI re: James G. Robinson served Summons and Complaint upon HUAGUANG QU, M.D. by Personal Service. HUAGUANG QU, M.D. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (JOKELSON, DEREK)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHEENA ROGALSKI re: James G. Robinson served Summons and Complaint upon HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C. by Personal Service. HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (JOKELSON, DEREK)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHEENA ROGALSKI re: James G. Robinson served Summons and Complaint upon CAMI Z. WHITE by Personal Service. CAMI Z. WHITE served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (JOKELSON, DEREK)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHEENA ROGALSKI re: James G. Robinson served Summons and Complaint upon GREGORY T. WHITE, JR by Personal Service. GREGORY T. WHITE, JR served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (JOKELSON, DEREK)
July 14, 2021 Summons Issued as to CHRISTIAN ACHARTE, M.D., HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C., HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C., HUAGUANG QU, M.D., MARGARET W. MUNGAI, CRNP, CAMI Z. WHITE, GREGORY T. WHITE, JR. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/14/21 (bw, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15249296.), filed by SHEENA ROGALSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Designation Form)(JOKELSON, DEREK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROGALSKI v. WHITE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUAGUANG QU, M.D.
Represented By: MARIE C. PLYTER
Represented By: MICHAEL O. PITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY T. WHITE, JR.
Represented By: JOSEPH GOLDBERG
Represented By: GEORGIOS FARMAKIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMI Z. WHITE
Represented By: JOSEPH GOLDBERG
Represented By: GEORGIOS FARMAKIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALING PLACE MEDICAL, P.C.
Represented By: JOSEPH GOLDBERG
Represented By: GEORGIOS FARMAKIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Qu, M.D.
Represented By: MARIE C. PLYTER
Represented By: MICHAEL O. PITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN ACHARTE, M.D.
Represented By: MICHAEL O. PITT
Represented By: MARIE C. PLYTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHPOINT PAIN & REHABILITATION PHYSICIANS, P.C. doing business as Pennsylvania Pain & Spine Institute
Represented By: MARIE C. PLYTER
Represented By: MICHAEL O. PITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET W. MUNGAI, CRNP
Represented By: JOSEPH GOLDBERG
Represented By: GEORGIOS FARMAKIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEENA ROGALSKI
Represented By: DAVID E. JOKELSON
Represented By: DEREK JOKELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?