BARBER v. DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PHILIP BARBER
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC, SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-15
Case Number: 2:2021cv03260
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC, SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC. (O'DONNELL, LAUREN)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Letter dated September 14, 2021 by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC, SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC. (O'DONNELL, LAUREN)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Letter dated September 13, 2021 to Hon Timothy J Savage by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC, SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC. (O'DONNELL, LAUREN)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THATA FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 5/10/22 AT 10:00 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/7/22. DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 3/25/22. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 4/2/22. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/18/22. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/15/22. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/15/22. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 5/12/22 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/17/21. 8/17/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Re: A Pretrial Conference was held on 8/17/21. (fdc)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Discovery Plan by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC, SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC.(O'DONNELL, LAUREN)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/17/21 AT 8:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/26/21. 7/26/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:21-cv-00923. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court however ORDERS the transfer of the case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/21/2021. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/21/2021. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATEMENT OF NO LITIGATION FUNDING by PHILIP BARBER. (CASTALDI, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATEMENT OF NO LITIGATION FUNDING PER LOCAL RULE 7.1.1 by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC. (O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/6/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER : The telephone status conference scheduled for August 4, 2021 at 10:30 am will now be held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on the same date and time. All parties shall dial 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061# to connect to the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/24/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio no longer assigned to case. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Support filed by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/4/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/16/2021. (slc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, and for good cause shown, Defendants' oral application on 2/16/2021 [D.I. 9] for a stay of discovery until a decision has been rendered on the pending motion to dismiss shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED, without prejudice to any party's right to move to dissolve the stay by way of letter application. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/16/2021. (slc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendants' oral application on 2/16/2021 for a stay of discovery until resolution of the pending motion to dismiss. (slc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 2/16/2021. (sb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PHILIP BARBER re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(CASTALDI, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1st Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC. Responses due by 3/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 2/16/2021 at 12:00 Noon shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket or, alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/25/2021. (slc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent.. (O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by TERRY M. HENRY on behalf of DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC (HENRY, TERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 2/16/2021 12:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/20/2021. (pr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC, DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Atlantic County, case number ATL L 003902 20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12004852), filed by DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC, DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-C)(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (pr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARBER v. DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP BARBER
Represented By: DAVID CASTALDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Represented By: LAUREN E. O'DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Represented By: LAUREN E. O'DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNTHES USA PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: TERRY MATTHEW HENRY
Represented By: LAUREN E. O'DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?