HATCHIGIAN et al v. ROBIN FORD et al
Plaintiff: DAVID HATCHIGIAN and JOAN RANDAZZO
Defendant: ROBIN FORD, Village Ford Parts, FORD MOTOR COMPANY and CHASE BANK
Case Number: 2:2021cv03416
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Filing 138 PLAINTIFFS' RULE 26(b) MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR TO AMEND THE JUDGMENT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/2/22. 9/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh) (nd).
September 6, 2022 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/2/22. 9/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
September 6, 2022 DOCS 136 & 137 MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 135 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #134 Transcript - PDF. 9/1/22 Entered and Copies Emailed. (mbh)
September 1, 2022 Filing 134 Transcript of Jury Selection held on 3/15/22 before Judge Chad F. Kenney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kim Haley. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2022. (mbh)
August 18, 2022 Filing 133 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #131 Transcript - PDF, #132 Transcript - PDF. 8/18/22 Entered and Copies Emailed. (mbh)
August 18, 2022 Filing 132 Transcript of Jury Trial - Day Two held on 3/16/22 before Judge Chad F. Kenney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kim Haley. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2022. (mbh)
August 18, 2022 Filing 131 Transcript of Jury Trial - Day One held on 3/15/22 before Judge Chad F. Kenney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kim Haley. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2022. (mbh)
July 6, 2022 Filing 130 Redacted Letter from The Honorable Chad F. Kenney dated 7/5/22. (mbh)
July 6, 2022 PAPER #129 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
July 5, 2022 Filing 129 NOTICE THAT IT HAS COME TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION THAT ON 6/30/22, PLAINTIFF HATCHIGIAN TRIED TO CONTACT OR CONTACTED, BY PHONE, A JUROR FROM THE 3/13/22 JURY TRIAL HELD BEFORE THE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. THE JURORS FROM THE 3/13/22 JURY TRIAL ARE NOW IRRELEVANT TO MR. HATCHIGIAN'S CASE AND HIS APPEAL. THE JUROR WHO WAS CONTACTED FELT INTIMIDATED AND DOES NOT WANT TO BE CONTACTED. PLAINTIFF HATCHIGIAN IS TO STOP CONTACTING JURORS. SIGNED BY JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY. ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND EMAILED. (mbh) Modified on 7/6/2022 (fb).
April 26, 2022 DOC. NO. #128 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 4/26/22. (amas)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE NOTICE OF APPEAL (ECF NO 118), DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM (ECF NO 120) AND PAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION (ECF NO 122) ARE STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE, BECAUSE GIVEN A NOTICE OF APPEAL HAS BEEN FILED AND THE FEES PAID, THE THIRD CIRCUIT NOW HAS JURISDICTION OVER THE PENDING APPEAL AND THIS COURT LACKS AUTHORITY TO GRANT RELIEF ON SAID MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/25/22. 4/25/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
April 23, 2022 Filing 127 Exhibits filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Email)(mbh)
April 23, 2022 Filing 126 Exhibits filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Email)(mbh)
April 23, 2022 Filing 125 Exhibits filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Email)(mbh)
April 23, 2022 Filing 124 Exhibits filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Email)(mbh)
April 23, 2022 Filing 123 Memorandum of Law Opposition to Defendants' Joint Rule 408 Motion to Strike and Brief in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Rule 59 Motion for New Trial or, in the alternative, to Amend or Alter Judgment, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Email)(mbh)
April 22, 2022 Filing 122 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Rule 408 Motion to Strike and Brief in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Rule 59 Motion for New Trial or, in the alternative, to Amend or Alter Judgment, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Email)(mbh) Modified on 4/25/2022 (mbh). (STICKEN PER ORDER #128)
April 11, 2022 Filing 121 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number PPE238968 re #116 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN, JOAN RANDAZZO (sbt)
April 8, 2022 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 Joint MOTION to Strike #116 Notice of Appeal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 408 Defendants; Joint Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial or in the Alternative to Amend Judgment (ECF NO. 116- unable to link to that document) filed by Village Ford Parts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DEANGELO, JAMES) Modified on 4/25/2022 (mbh).(STICKEN PER ORDER #128)
April 8, 2022 Filing 118 Joint MOTION to Strike #116 Notice of Appeal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 408 filed by CHASE BANK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CAROBUS, ANDREW) Modified on 4/25/2022 (mbh). (STICKEN PER ORDER #128)
April 7, 2022 Filing 119 Notice of Appeal as to #115 Order by DAVID HATCHIGIAN and JOAN RANDAZZO. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP) Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh)
March 28, 2022 Filing 117 Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #116 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN, JOAN RANDAZZO. USCA Case Number 22-1559 (mbh)
March 25, 2022 Filing 116 (MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL) Notice of Appeal as to #115 Order by DAVID HATCHIGIAN and JOAN RANDAZZO. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. (NO FEE; NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh) Modified on 3/28/2022 (ke). Modified on 8/1/2022 (mbh).
March 18, 2022 DOC. NO. #115 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 3/18/22. (amas)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/16/22. 3/17/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
March 16, 2022 Filing 114 VERDICT SLIP. (mbh)
March 16, 2022 Filing 113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY Civil Jury Trial Day 2 held on 3/17/2022. (mbh)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: THAT THE JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXHIBITS (ECF NO. 108) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/16/2022. 3/16/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA BE AND SHE IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FURNISH LUNCH FOR JURORS ENGAGED IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/16/22. 3/16/22 ENTERED (JL)
March 16, 2022 Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY Civil Jury Trial Day 1 held on 3/15/2022. (rf, )
March 14, 2022 Filing 109 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Powerpoint Presentation and Untimely Exhibits, Cerificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh)
March 11, 2022 Filing 108 Joint MOTION to Exclude PowerPoint and Untimely Exhibits filed by Village Ford Parts.Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of their Joint Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' PowerPoint Presentation and Untimely Exhibits/Certificate of Service.(DEANGELO, JAMES)
March 11, 2022 COPY OF DOC. NOS. 104 AND 106 HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
March 10, 2022 Filing 107 Exhibits filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Invoices), #2 Exhibit (Towing Receipts), #3 Email)(mbh)
March 10, 2022 Filing 106 NOTICE THAT THE JURY TRIAL WILL NOW START ON 3/15/2022 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY IN COURTROOM 11B.(mbh)
March 9, 2022 Notice (#105) mailed to Randazzo. (fdc)
March 8, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE THAT THE TRIAL IN THIS CASE SCHEDULED FOR 3/14/22 MAY BE RESCHEDULED TO 3/15/22 IF MORE JURY PANEL MEMBERS DO NOT BECOME AVAILABLE. THE COURT WILL NOTICE THE PARTIES BY THE END OF THE WEEK IF THE TRIAL IS RESCHEDULED TO 3/15/22. 3/8/22 ENTERED AND SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. (mbh)
March 8, 2022 DOC #103 MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CHASE BANK'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PRESENT WITNESS TESTIMONY REMOTELY IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT MAY PRESENT ITS WITNESS AT TRIAL VIA VIDEOCONFERENCING EQUIPMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/7/22. /8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING HIS CELL PHONE TO THE COURTROOM IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/7/22.3/7/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL)
March 5, 2022 Filing 102 Plaintiffs' Amended Proposed Points for Charge. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh)
March 5, 2022 Filing 101 Amended Objections to Defendant Chase's Proposed Jury Instructions Nos. 4,16,17 and 20 filedf by DAVID HATCHIGIAN and JOAN RANDAZZO. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 100 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO BRING CELL PHONE INTO COURT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 99 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank's Motion for Leave to Present Witness Testimony Remotely at Trial, Certificate of Service. (mbh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 98 Plaintiffs' Proposed Verdict Form.(mbh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 97 Plaintiffs' Proposed Voir Dire. (mbh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 96 Plaintiffs' Proposed Points for Charge.(mbh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 95 Plaintiffs' Pretrial Memorandum. (mbh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 94 Proposed Verdict Sheet by Village Ford Parts.. Certificate of Service (DEANGELO, JAMES)
March 4, 2022 Filing 93 Proposed Jury Instructions by Village Ford Parts. Certificate of Service (DEANGELO, JAMES)
March 4, 2022 Filing 92 Proposed Verdict Sheet by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.. Certificate of Service (PETERSON, JAMES)
March 4, 2022 Filing 91 Proposed Verdict Sheet by CHASE BANK.. Certificate of Service (PERKINS, JENNY)
March 4, 2022 Filing 90 Proposed Verdict Sheet by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.. Certificate of Service (DEANGELO, JAMES)
March 4, 2022 Filing 89 Proposed Jury Instructions by CHASE BANK. Certificate of Service (PERKINS, JENNY)
March 4, 2022 Filing 88 Proposed Voir Dire by CHASE BANK, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ROBIN FORD, Village Ford Parts. Certificate of Service (PERKINS, JENNY)
March 4, 2022 Filing 87 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by CHASE BANK, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ROBIN FORD, Village Ford Parts Certificate of Service. (PERKINS, JENNY)
March 4, 2022 Filing 86 Proposed Jury Instructions by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ROBIN FORD, Village Ford Parts. (COATSWORTH, JENNIFER)
March 4, 2022 Filing 85 Proposed Verdict Sheet by ROBIN FORD.. (COATSWORTH, JENNIFER)
March 3, 2022 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Present Witness Testimony Remotely at Trial filed by CHASE BANK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum)(PERKINS, JENNY)
February 23, 2022 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #83 TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF ON 2/23/22. (jaa, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS (ECF NOS. 75-81) ARE DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (ECF NO. 82) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/22/22. 2/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
February 21, 2022 Filing 82 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ELEVEN DAY EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 3/10/22 TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEVEN MOTIONS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh)
February 21, 2022 Filing 81 Joint MOTION in Limine to Strike Plaintiffs' Claims for Attorneys' Fees, Punitive Damages and Treble Damages filed by ROBIN FORD.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(COATSWORTH, JENNIFER)
February 21, 2022 Filing 80 Joint MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Offering any Evidence of Testimony Regarding their Speculative and Unsupported Calculation of Damages filed by ROBIN FORD.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibits 1-6, #4 Exhibits C-E)(COATSWORTH, JENNIFER)
February 21, 2022 Filing 79 Joint MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff David Hatchigian from Engaging in the Unauthorized Practice of Law filed by CHASE BANK.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(MULHERN, ELANOR)
February 21, 2022 Filing 78 Joint MOTION in Limine of Defendants to Preclude Evidence and Testimony Regarding Confidential Settlement Communications, Pleadings or the Vacated Default Judgment filed by CHASE BANK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum)(PERKINS, JENNY)
February 21, 2022 Filing 77 Joint MOTION in Limine of Defendants to Preclude the Introduction of Evidence and Testimony by Plaintiffs Pertaining to the Claims of Plaintiff Joan Randazzo filed by CHASE BANK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 1)(PERKINS, JENNY)
February 18, 2022 Filing 76 Joint MOTION to Strike Jury Demand and Bifurcate Trial filed by CHASE BANK.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MULHERN, ELANOR)
February 18, 2022 Filing 75 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Communications Between Plaintiffs and Village Ford at Trial filed by Village Ford Parts.Memorandum with Exhibit A, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law with Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WENTZEL, COURTNEY)
February 8, 2022 Document #74 mailed to JOAN RANDAZZO. (mac)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ADJOURN TRIAL IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/7/22.2/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
February 5, 2022 Filing 73 PRO SE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ADJOURN TRIAL DATE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh, )
January 31, 2022 DOC. #72 MAILED TO PRO SE JOAN RANDAZZO. (tomg)
January 28, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE: A DATE CERTAIN JURY TRIAL WILL COMMENCE ON 3/14/2022 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE DUE ON 2/21/22. ALL PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 3/4/22.(mbh)
January 28, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 2/21/2022. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/4/2022. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/4/2022. (mbh)
January 27, 2022 Filing 71 Request for Trial De Novo by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 70 ARBITRATION AWARD. ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(sah) Modified on 1/24/2022 (sah).
January 20, 2022 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint by ROBIN FORD.(COATSWORTH, JENNIFER)
January 12, 2022 DOC. NO. #68 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 1/12/22. (amas)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED. PAGE 7 FROM EXHIBIT A [ECF 60-1 AT 7] AND PAGE 7 FROM EXHIBIT E [ECF 64-2 AT 7] ARE STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO REPLACE THE PDFS FOR ECF NO. 60-1 AND ECF NO. 64-2 WITH THE ATTACHED PDFS WHICH HAVE PAGE 7 REMOVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/10/22.1/11/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
January 10, 2022 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #66 TO PLAINTIFF ON 1/10/22. (jaa, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 67 Joint MOTION to Strike #64 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit filed by CHASE BANK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum)(PERKINS, JENNY)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RESPONSES IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/7/21. 1/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
December 31, 2021 Filing 65 Exhibit G to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh, )
December 31, 2021 Filing 64 Exhibit C-2, D, E and F to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Email)(mbh, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/11/2022) (mbh).
December 31, 2021 Filing 63 Exhibit C-1 to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh, )
December 31, 2021 Filing 62 Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh, )
December 31, 2021 Filing 61 Exhibit A 33-93 to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh, )
December 31, 2021 Filing 60 Brief in Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN and JOAN RANDAZZO, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1-32, #2 Email) (mbh, ) . (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/11/2022) (mbh).
December 2, 2021 DOC. NO. #59 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 12/2/21. (amas, )
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ARBITRATION AND APPOINTING NEIL PHILLIP GREENBERG, ESQ., NANCY CAMPBELL, ESQ. AND RONALD GRAHAM, ESQ. AS CERTIFIED ARBITRATORS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/1/21. 12/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 1/24/2022 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 5D.(sah) Mailed to Pro Se Plaintiffs 12/1/21. Modified on 12/1/2021 (sah, ).
November 30, 2021 Filing 57 Summons Returned Executed re: Guaranteed Subpoena Service Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon FORD MOTOR COMPANY by Personal Service on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CHASE BANK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAROBUS, ANDREW)
November 8, 2021 Document 53,55 mailed to J. Randazzo. (mac, )
November 4, 2021 Filing 55 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #54 Transcript - PDF. 11/4/21 Entered and Copy not mailed to pro se and Emailed. (mbh, )
November 4, 2021 Filing 54 Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/23/21 before Judge Chad F. Kenney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lawrence Court Transcription & Video, LLC. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2022. (mbh, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 53 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #52 Transcript - PDF. 10/19/21 Entered and copy not mailed to pro se and Emailed. (mbh, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 52 Transcript of Pretrial Rule 16 Conference held on 10/19/21 before Judge Chad F. Kenney. Court Reporter/Transcriber Foothill Transcription Company, Inc. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2022. (mbh, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 51 (Proposed) First Amended Complaint against CHASE BANK, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ROBIN FORD and VILLAGE FORD PARTS filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN, JOAN RANDAZZO.(mbh, )
October 25, 2021 DOC. 50 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg, )
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED, THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS VACATED, AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND (ECF NOS. 13,14) ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/22/21.10/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 22, 2021 Document 48 Mailed to David Hatchigian and Joan Randazzo. (DT)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION TO REMAND IS NOT CONSIDERED BY THE COURT BECAUSE IT IS A NULLITY BECAUSE THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WAS STRICKEN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REMOVE THE GAVEL FROM ECF NO. 46. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/21/21. 10/21/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEREBY STRICKEN BECAUSE PLAINTIFFS DID NOT FOLLOW THE RULES REGARDING COURT APPROVAL OR COUNSEL CONSENT BEFORE IT WAS FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/21/21. 10/21/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE Settlement Conference VIA TELECONFERENCE held on 10/21/21. (JL )
October 21, 2021 Filing 46 PLAINTIFFS' SECOND MOTION TO REMAND. (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, )
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Orders 40 thru 43 mailed to pro se plaintiffs. (fdc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 45 First Amended Complaint against CHASE BANK, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ROBIN FORD and VILLAGE FORD PARTS filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN and JOAN RANDAZZO. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh, ) Modified on 10/21/2021 (mbh, ). (STRICKEN PER ORDER #48)
October 20, 2021 Filing 44 Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(cjh, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO ABITRATION. THE ARBITRATION CLERK SHALL SCHEDUL AN ARBITRATION HEARING ON OR AFTER 1/17/22. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICE FOR THE SCHEDULING OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/19/21. 10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT ALL PARTIES WHO HAVE NOT ANSWERED THE COMPLAINT MUST NOW DO SO ON OR BEFORE 11/19/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/19/21. 10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/19/21.10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ROBIN FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AND DEFENDANT CHASE BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/19/21.10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY RULE 16 Pretrial Conference held on 10/19/21. Court Reporter: ESR. (JL )
October 15, 2021 Filing 38 Amended Response to Court Order 8/6/21 filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (mbh, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION TO STAY FILED BY DAVID HATCHIGIAN.(mbh, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 36 Proposed Case Management Plan Submitted by the Parties in the Form of the Report of the Rule 26(f) Meeting as filed by CHASE BANK. (CAROBUS, ANDREW)
October 12, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ROBIN FORD. (COATSWORTH, JENNIFER)
October 7, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand Plaintiffs' Amended Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by CHASE BANK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAROBUS, ANDREW)
October 7, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and under Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 of Claims of Plaintiff Joan Randazzo filed by CHASE BANK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAROBUS, ANDREW)
September 29, 2021 Filing 32 Amended Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Dropped off after hours, no envelope) (mbh, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY in Courtroom 6A. Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/23/21. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment filed by CHASE BANK. (PERKINS, JENNY)
September 22, 2021 Filing 29 Letter dated 9/20/21 by DAVID HATCHIGIAN (mbh, )
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #25 IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION IS ADMITTED. PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ROBIN FORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 17) IS DEEMED FILED AND IS FOUND AT PAGES 2-15 OF ECF NO. 25. PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW (ECF NO. 26) IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHASE'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. 20) IS ADMITTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/22/2021. 9/22/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO DAVID HATCHIGIAN AND JOAN RANDAZZO. (sme, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 27 Pro se Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Vacate Default Judgment. (mbh, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 26 Plaintiff JOAN RANDAZZO'S Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ("CHASE")'s Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff JOAN RANDAZZO, Certificate of Service. (mbh, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADMIT OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS ONE WEEK LATE FILED BY DAVID HATCHIGIAN AND JOAN RANDAZZO, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DROPPED IN AFTER HOURS BOX, NO ENVELOPE INCLUDED)(mbh, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL R. HADRICK on behalf of Village Ford Parts with Certificate of Service(HADRICK, RACHEL)
September 7, 2021 DOC # 23 MAILED TO PRO SES (rf, )
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY 9/17/21 AT 12:00 PM. AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING IS SCHEDULED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (ECF NOS. 13 AND 14) AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE (ECF NO. 5) ON 9/23/21 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 6A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/3/21. 9/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ).
September 3, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 22 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. (bw, )
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE LETTER MOTION FOR ACCESS TO EMAIL IS GRANTED. THE PRO SE PLAINTIFF DAVID HATCHIGIAN MAY REGISTER AS AN ECF FILING USER IN THE ECF SYSTEM, SOLELY FOR THE PURPOSE OF LITIGATING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FORWARD A COPY OF THE ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (ECF) ACCOUNT REGISTRATION FORM TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF DAVID HATCHIGIAN AT 2414 TOWNSHIP LINE ROAD, HAVERTOWN, PA 19083. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/2/21. 9/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 21 Letter dated 8/25/21 by DAVID HATCHIGIAN (mbh, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and under Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 of Claims of Plaintiff Joan Randazzo filed by CHASE BANK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A: Hatchigian CCP Dockets, #3 Exhibit B: Hatchigian EDPA Dockets, #4 Exhibit C: Hatchigian I Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D: Hatchigian I Docket, #6 Exhibit E: Hatchigian I Appellate Dockets, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(PERKINS, JENNY)
August 30, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CHASE BANK. Amendment to #18 Response in Opposition to Motion, Corrected Text of Proposed Order. (MULHERN, ELANOR)
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand with Certificate of Service filed by CHASE BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Praecipe to Enter Default, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Time Stamped Receipt, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MULHERN, ELANOR)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ROBIN FORD.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents/Table of Authorities, #2 Brief, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A)(COATSWORTH, JENNIFER)
August 19, 2021 Filing 16 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ELANOR A. MULHERN on behalf of CHASE BANK with Certificate of Service(MULHERN, ELANOR)
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 PLAINTIFFS DAVID HATCHIGIAN AND JOAN RANDAZZO'S AMENDED MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(mbh, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/10/21.8/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. DEANGELO on behalf of Village Ford Parts with Certificate of Service(DEANGELO, JAMES)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. PETERSON on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (PETERSON, JAMES)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/10/21. 8/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SES; E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 10, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 8 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, HATCHIGIAN AND RANDAZZO. (bw, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 DAVID HATCHIGIAN MOTION FOR THIRTY DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF REMOVAL, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(JL )
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER SEGAL COATSWORTH on behalf of ROBIN FORD (COATSWORTH, JENNIFER)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. CAROBUS on behalf of CHASE BANK with Certificate of Service(CAROBUS, ANDREW)
August 9, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #4 TO PRO SE PARTIES ON 8/9/21. (jaa, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment filed by CHASE BANK.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(PERKINS, JENNY)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE REMOVING DEFENDANT AND ALL PRO SE DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE, ON ECF, A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 8/30/21. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT AN ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/21 AT 8:30 AM IN COURTROOM 6A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/6/21. 8/6/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by COURTNEY M. WENTZEL on behalf of Village Ford Parts with Certificate of Service(WENTZEL, COURTNEY)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including JPMorgan Chase & Co. with Certificate of Service by CHASE BANK.(PERKINS, JENNY)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHASE BANK (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15305344), filed by CHASE BANK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit A - Part I, #5 Exhibit A - Part II, #6 Exhibit B - Part I, #7 Exhibit B - Part II, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E)(PERKINS, JENNY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HATCHIGIAN et al v. ROBIN FORD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HATCHIGIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN RANDAZZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN FORD
Represented By: JENNIFER SEGAL COATSWORTH
Represented By: JOHN A. LIVINGOOD, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Ford Parts
Represented By: JAMES P. DEANGELO
Represented By: RACHEL R. HADRICK
Represented By: COURTNEY M. WENTZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK
Represented By: JENNY PERKINS
Represented By: ANDREW M. CAROBUS
Represented By: ELANOR A. MULHERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?