FUTCHIK,ET AL. v. AFIOS, INC., ET AL.
Plaintiff: DENNIS FUTCHIK, LM ENTERPRISES LLC and SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC
Defendant: AFIOS, INC, THOMAS J. KOZLOWSKI, JR., BRIAN C. KOZLOWSKI, MARK D. KOZLOWSKI and SCOTT M. KOZLOWSKI
Case Number: 2:2021cv03646
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DENNIS FUTCHIK, LM ENTERPRISES LLC, SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(TURET, CRAIG)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT A FRCP 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/22/2021 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. COUNSEL SHALL APPEAR BY VIDEO AND WILL BE NOTIFIED BY CHAMBERS STAFF VIA E-MAIL OF THE CONFERENCE LINK INSTRUCTIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/1/21. 10/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AFIOS, INC, BRIAN C. KOZLOWSKI, MARK D. KOZLOWSKI, SCOTT M. KOZLOWSKI, THOMAS J. KOZLOWSKI, JR.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Defendants in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BEIDEL, JENNIFER)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELLA N. MIDDLETON on behalf of AFIOS, INC, BRIAN C. KOZLOWSKI, MARK D. KOZLOWSKI, SCOTT M. KOZLOWSKI, THOMAS J. KOZLOWSKI, JR with Certificate of Service(MIDDLETON, ANGELLA)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER L. BEIDEL on behalf of AFIOS, INC, BRIAN C. KOZLOWSKI, MARK D. KOZLOWSKI, SCOTT M. KOZLOWSKI, THOMAS J. KOZLOWSKI, JR with Certificate of Service(BEIDEL, JENNIFER)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS FUTCHIK, LM ENTERPRISES LLC, SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC. upon BRIAN KOZLOWSKI on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (TURET, CRAIG) Modified on 9/7/2021 (tjd).
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS FUTCHIK, LM ENTERPRISES LLC, SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC. upon SCOTT KOZLOWSKI on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021.(TURET, CRAIG) Modified on 9/7/2021 (tjd).
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS FUTCHIK, LM ENTERPRISES LLC, SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC. upon MARK KOZLOWSKI on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (TURET, CRAIG) Modified on 9/7/2021 (tjd).
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS FUTCHIK, LM ENTERPRISES LLC, SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC. upon THOMAS KOZLOWSKI on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (TURET, CRAIG) Modified on 9/7/2021 (tjd).
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS FUTCHIK, LM ENTERPRISES LLC, SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC upon AFIOS, INC. on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (TURET, CRAIG) Modified on 9/7/2021 (tjd).
August 23, 2021 DOC. 6 MAILED TO UNREP. (sg, )
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF JOHN JEREMY TRUITT, ESQ TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT (ECF NO 5) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION (ECF NO 4) IS DENIED AS DUPLICATIVE OF THE APPLICATION GRANTED BY THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 8/19/21. 8/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 19, 2021 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC.. (SEE PAPER #3 FOR ATTACHMENT).(fb)
August 19, 2021 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LM ENTERPRISES LLC.. (SEE PAPER #2 FOR ATTACHMENT).(fb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Jeremy Truitt by DENNIS FUTCHIK, LM ENTERPRISES LLC, SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15346923.). (TURET, CRAIG)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Jeremy Truitt by DENNIS FUTCHIK, LM ENTERPRISES LLC, SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC.. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE PAPER #5 FOR CORRECTED VERSION). (TURET, CRAIG) Modified on 8/20/2021 (fb).
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 Statement of Disclosure by SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC. (TURET, CRAIG)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Disclosure by LM ENTERPRISES LLC. (TURET, CRAIG)
August 18, 2021 Summons Issued as to AFIOS, INC, BRIAN C. KOZLOWSKI, MARK D. KOZLOWSKI, SCOTT M. KOZLOWSKI, THOMAS J. KOZLOWSKI, JR. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/18/21 (bw, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENNIS FUTCHIK ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15341786.), filed by DENNIS FUTCHIK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit)(TURET, CRAIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FUTCHIK,ET AL. v. AFIOS, INC., ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS FUTCHIK
Represented By: CRAIG FOSTER TURET
Represented By: JOHN JEREMY TRUITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: CRAIG FOSTER TURET
Represented By: JOHN JEREMY TRUITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIOUX RESOURCES, LLC
Represented By: CRAIG FOSTER TURET
Represented By: JOHN JEREMY TRUITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFIOS, INC
Represented By: JENNIFER L. BEIDEL
Represented By: ANGELLA N. MIDDLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. KOZLOWSKI, JR.
Represented By: JENNIFER L. BEIDEL
Represented By: ANGELLA N. MIDDLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN C. KOZLOWSKI
Represented By: JENNIFER L. BEIDEL
Represented By: ANGELLA N. MIDDLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK D. KOZLOWSKI
Represented By: JENNIFER L. BEIDEL
Represented By: ANGELLA N. MIDDLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT M. KOZLOWSKI
Represented By: JENNIFER L. BEIDEL
Represented By: ANGELLA N. MIDDLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?