AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY v. TOLL BROS., INC. et al
Plaintiff: AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: TOLL BROS., INC. and SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03659
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC..(HORNEFF, ELIZABETH)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT TOLL BROS. INC.S JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (DOCKET NO. 13), AND TOLL BROS. REPRESENTATION IN THE MOTION THAT ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO CONSOLIDATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/8/2021.10/8/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by TOLL BROS., INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KELLEY, GREGORY)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATMENT (DOC. #9 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/22/2021.9/23/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Strike or for More Definitive Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) filed by AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(MATZ, GEORGE)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, of Toll Bros., Inc. by SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC..(HORNEFF, ELIZABETH)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against TOLL BROS., INC. by SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC..(HORNEFF, ELIZABETH)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike or for More Definitive Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) filed by SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HORNEFF, ELIZABETH)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. HORNEFF on behalf of SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(HORNEFF, ELIZABETH)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC. by TOLL BROS., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(KELLEY, GREGORY)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CANDACE CAMILLE HARDY on behalf of TOLL BROS., INC. with Certificate of Service(HARDY, CANDACE)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY J. KELLEY on behalf of TOLL BROS., INC. with Certificate of Service(KELLEY, GREGORY)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by George J. Matz re: served Summons and Complaint on Defendant Toll Bros., Inc. upon Gregory J. Kelley, Esquire by Agreed-upon Acceptance of Service on 08/25/2021 (MATZ, GEORGE)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC. waiver sent on 8/17/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (MATZ, GEORGE) Modified on 8/27/2021 (tjd).
August 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC., TOLL BROS., INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 8/23/2021 (sg, )
August 17, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (JL )
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including OHIO FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY by AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY.(MATZ, GEORGE)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15341641.), filed by AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form)(MATZ, GEORGE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY v. TOLL BROS., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GEORGE J. MATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOLL BROS., INC.
Represented By: CANDACE CAMILLE HARDY
Represented By: GREGORY J. KELLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMMIT ELECTRIC CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. HORNEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?