KOZUCH et al v. THE BOEING COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: EUGENE G. KOZUCH and KATHRYNANN KOZUCH
Defendant: 3M COMPANY, BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., CATERPILLAR, INC., CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY, DREVER COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, HAJOCA CORPORATION, HENKEL CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, U.S. SUPPLY COMPANY, WEINSTEIN SUPPLY CO., WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION and AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY
Cross Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY
Debtor In Possession: DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03667
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Referring Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER THAT THE UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY DEADLINES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER OF DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY IS GRANTED. EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 6/1/23. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 7/3/23. NO LATER THAN THE END OF FACT DISCOVERY THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND ADVISE JUDGE HEY TO THE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS AND THEIR INTEREST IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE HEY; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 11/30/22. 12/1/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
November 30, 2022 Filing 71 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Deadlines filed by THE BOEING COMPANY.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ELIZABETH T. HEY.(COLEMAN, JAMES)
November 28, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. of Service of Expert Reports (SINGER, STEWART)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT REGARDING MILITARY SPECIFICATIONS, PLAINTIFFS' INQUIRY SHALL BE LIMITED TO HELICOPTER BLADES FOR THE CH-46 AND CH-47 HELICOPTERS REPARIED OR MAINTAINED IN MR. KOZUCH'S VICINITY FROM 1974 TO 1979 ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 11/9/22. 11/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
November 9, 2022 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY. Settlement Status Telephone Conference held on 11/9/22. (mbh)
November 2, 2022 Filing 67 Letter dated 11/22/2022 by THE BOEING COMPANY. (COLEMAN, JAMES)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY'S MOTION TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION NOTICE SERVED BY PLAINTIFFS ON BOEING'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/26/22.10/26/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
October 25, 2022 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Notices of Deposition filed by EUGENE G. KOZUCH, KATHRYNANN KOZUCH. (ROWE, MICHAEL)
October 11, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Notices of Deposition filed by THE BOEING COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ELIZABETH T. HEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COLEMAN, JAMES)
July 25, 2022 Filing 63 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by U.S. SUPPLY COMPANY.(PHILIPP, CHRISTINA)
July 25, 2022 Filing 62 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by U.S. SUPPLY COMPANY.(PHILIPP, CHRISTINA)
July 25, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA MARIE PHILIPP on behalf of U.S. SUPPLY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(PHILIPP, CHRISTINA)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY DEADLINES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER IS GRANTED. EXPERT DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS MUST BE COMPLETED BY 2/1/23. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS MUST BE FILED BY 3/1/23; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 4/22/22. 4/22/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
April 22, 2022 Filing 59 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed Motion to Extend the Discovery and Case Management Deadlines filed by EUGENE G. KOZUCH, KATHRYNANN KOZUCH.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ELIZABETH T. HEY.(ROWE, MICHAEL)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO SEAL THE RESPONSE IS GRANTED. THE MOTION TO REMAND IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/6/21.12/6/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 24, 2021 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court filed by THE BOEING COMPANY, Certificate of Service. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (fb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2021: #1 Declaration Gionta, #2 Declaration McCaffery, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C, #14 Exhibit D, #15 Exhibit E, #16 Exhibit F, #17 Exhibit G, #18 Exhibit H, #19 Exhibit I, #20 Exhibit J, #21 Exhibit K, #22 Exhibit L, #23 Exhibit M, #24 Exhibit N, #25 Exhibit O) (fb, ).
November 24, 2021 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Seal Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by THE BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1-4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1-5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1-6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1-7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1-8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 2-A, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 2-B, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 2-C, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 2-D, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 2-E, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 2-F, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 2-G, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 2-H, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 2-I, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 2-J, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 2-K, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 2-L, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 2-M, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 2-N, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 2-O)(COLEMAN, JAMES)
November 24, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION to Seal Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by THE BOEING COMPANY.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ELIZABETH T. HEY.(COLEMAN, JAMES)
November 19, 2021 Filing 54 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by HAJOCA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GONZALES, CHRISTINA)
November 19, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE by CRANE COMPANY Of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (BRUCH, G.)
November 19, 2021 Filing 52 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL AS OUTLINED HEREIN;ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/19/21. 11/19/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
November 19, 2021 Filing 51 STIPULATION Protective Order for Good Cause by THE BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(COLEMAN, JAMES)
November 18, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (JASONS, CATHERINE)
November 18, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE by DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE, LLC Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (JASONS, CATHERINE)
November 18, 2021 Filing 48 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by EUGENE G. KOZUCH, KATHRYNANN KOZUCH.(ROWE, MICHAEL) Modified on 11/19/2021 (md, ).
November 18, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE by 3M COMPANY Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (DISIPIO, BASIL)
November 18, 2021 Filing 46 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
November 18, 2021 Filing 45 Disclosure by THE BOEING COMPANY.(COLEMAN, JAMES)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT EXPERT DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS MUST BE COMPLETED BY 11/14/22. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS MUST BE FILED BY 12/14/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 11/4/21. 11/4/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY'S AGREED UPON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND IS GRANTED, AND THE BOEING COMPANY HAS UNTIL 11/24/21 TO FILE A RESPONSE BRIEF; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/28/21. 10/28/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
October 27, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by THE BOEING COMPANY.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to ELIZABETH T. HEY.(COLEMAN, JAMES)
October 25, 2021 Filing 41 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by EUGENE G. KOZUCH, KATHRYNANN KOZUCH.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(ROWE, MICHAEL)
October 21, 2021 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including FLSmidth Inc. with Certificate of Service by KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO..(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
October 21, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY on behalf of KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO. (MCGARRITY, JENNIFER)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL CONFER WITH OPPOSING COUNSEL, AND WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 10/21/21. 10/21/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. (JL )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY TO CONDUCT PRETRIAL PROCEDURES, SUPERVISION OF DISCOVERY, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND PREPARATION OF TRIAL; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/20/21. 10/21/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
September 29, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. ROWE on behalf of EUGENE G. KOZUCH, KATHRYNANN KOZUCH with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ROWE, MICHAEL)
September 21, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Cross-Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
September 17, 2021 Filing 34 Disclosure with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CATERPILLAR, INC..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
September 17, 2021 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CATERPILLAR, INC..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
September 17, 2021 Filing 32 Hajoca Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HAJOCA CORPORATION.(GONZALES, CHRISTINA)
September 17, 2021 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HAJOCA CORPORATION.(GONZALES, CHRISTINA)
September 17, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA ANN GONZALES on behalf of HAJOCA CORPORATION with Jury Demand(GONZALES, CHRISTINA)
September 17, 2021 Filing 29 Disclosure with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WEINSTEIN SUPPLY CO..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
September 17, 2021 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WEINSTEIN SUPPLY CO..(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
September 17, 2021 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Amended Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
September 3, 2021 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by 3M COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
September 3, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by 3M COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
September 3, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of 3M COMPANY with Jury Demand & Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
September 3, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims to Plaintiffs Complaint and Jury Demand by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
September 3, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims to Plaintiffs Complaint and Jury Demand by DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE, LLC.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 31, 2021 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE, LLC.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 31, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE, LLC with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 Drever Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by DREVER COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(SINGER, STEWART)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. with Certificate of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL )
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DREVER COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of DREVER COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY (RAU, TIMOTHY)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. NEESON on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(NEESON, PETER)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE BOEING COMPANY.(COLEMAN, JAMES)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE BOEING COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BPAEDC-15343273), filed by THE BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(COLEMAN, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOZUCH et al v. THE BOEING COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE G. KOZUCH
Represented By: CASEY R COBURN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYNANN KOZUCH
Represented By: CASEY R COBURN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES F. COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREVER COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAJOCA CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTINA ANN GONZALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENKEL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: PETER J. NEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEELER/DORR-OLIVER BOILER CO.
Represented By: JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: STEWART R. SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTINA MARIE PHILIPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEINSTEIN SUPPLY CO.
Represented By: KEVIN O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?