Brennan, Jr. et al v. FSD Pharma Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Brennan, Jr. and Huma Qamar
Defendant: FSD Pharma Inc. and FSD BioSciences Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03771
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by FSD BioSciences Inc., FSD Pharma Inc.. (WIXTED, JOHN)
October 1, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Edward Brennan, Jr., Huma Qamar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(GREY, STEPHANIE)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 Praecipe to Attach Exhibit A to ECF 15 Motion to Dismiss by FSD BioSciences Inc., FSD Pharma Inc.. (WIXTED, JOHN) Modified on 9/20/2021 (md, ).
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FSD BioSciences Inc., FSD Pharma Inc..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6))(WIXTED, JOHN)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS FSD PHARMA INC. AND FSD BIOSCIENCES, INC. SHALL HAVE UNTIL 9/17/21 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/7/21. 9/7/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON TO HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/3/21. 9/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Telephone Conference held on 9/1/21 (rf, )
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JONATHAN A. KESELENKO IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/1/21. 9/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JAMES FULLMER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/1/21. 9/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan A. Keselenko ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15376840.) filed by FSD BioSciences Inc., FSD Pharma Inc..Certificate of Service.(WIXTED, JOHN)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of James Fuller ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15376804.) filed by FSD BioSciences Inc., FSD Pharma Inc..Certificate of Service.(WIXTED, JOHN)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE M. GREY on behalf of Edward Brennan, Jr., Huma Qamar (GREY, STEPHANIE)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON E. REISMAN on behalf of FSD Pharma Inc., FSD BioSciences Inc. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REISMAN, JASON) Modified on 9/8/2021 (md, ).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS FSD BioSciences Inc. AND FSD Pharma Inc. SHALL HAVE UNTIL SEPTEMBER 9, 2021 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 08/31/2021. 08/31/2021 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of BUCKS County. (JL)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including FSD Pharma Inc. by FSD BioSciences Inc..(WIXTED, JOHN)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FSD Pharma Inc..(WIXTED, JOHN)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FSD BioSciences Inc., FSD Pharma Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15357670), filed by FSD BioSciences Inc., FSD Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form)(WIXTED, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennan, Jr. et al v. FSD Pharma Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Brennan, Jr.
Represented By: JONATHAN S. KRAUSE
Represented By: STEPHANIE M. GREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huma Qamar
Represented By: JONATHAN S. KRAUSE
Represented By: STEPHANIE M. GREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FSD Pharma Inc.
Represented By: JOHN P. WIXTED
Represented By: JAMES Samuel FULLMER
Represented By: JASON E. REISMAN
Represented By: JONANTHAN A KESELENKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FSD BioSciences Inc.
Represented By: JOHN P. WIXTED
Represented By: JAMES Samuel FULLMER
Represented By: JASON E. REISMAN
Represented By: JONANTHAN A KESELENKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?