RHINO SERVICES, LLC v. DEANGELO BROTHERS, INC.
Petitioner: RHINO SERVICES, LLC
Respondent: DEANGELO BROTHERS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03840
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NOS. 5 AND 6 HAVE BEEN MAILED TO UNREP. PARTY. (bw, )
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MEGHAN E. PIELER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/10/21. 9/10/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(fdc)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHRISTOPHER S. ANULEWICZ, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/10/21. 9/10/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (fdc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RHINO SERVICES, LLC. DEANGELO BROTHERS, INC. waiver sent on 9/9/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (VOTER, WARREN)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meghan E. Pieler by RHINO SERVICES, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15393815.). (VOTER, WARREN)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher S. Anulewicz by RHINO SERVICES, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15393791.). (VOTER, WARREN)
August 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to DEANGELO BROTHERS, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/30/21 (bw, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award) against DEANGELO BROTHERS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15367380.), filed by RHINO SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form Case Management Tracking Form)(VOTER, WARREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RHINO SERVICES, LLC v. DEANGELO BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RHINO SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: WARREN E. VOTER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. ANULEWICZ
Represented By: MEGHAN E. PIELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEANGELO BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?