RECONSTRUCTIVE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES II D/B/A THE ROTHMAN INSTITUTE v. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: RECONSTRUCTIVE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES II, LLC doing business as THE ROTHMAN INSTITUTE
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv04003
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL MENAPACE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/1/21. 11/1/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Menapace filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.declaration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Menapace, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Pro hac vice))(KENNEDY, SUSAN)
October 29, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 12 (b)(1) filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Andrew Goffron, #3 Exhibit 1 and 1a, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(KENNEDY, SUSAN)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THAT THIS AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER SHALL SUPERSEDE ALL PREVIOUSLY ENTERED SCHEDULING ORDERS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/8/21. 10/12/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED AS FOLLOWS THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS MOTION TO DISMISS NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 29, 2021. 2. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 8, 2021. 3. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS REPLY, IF ANY, NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 12, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/5/21. 10/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Pretrial Conference held on 10/5/21 (jaa, )
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/30/21.9/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Kyle D. Black ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15442999.) filed by RECONSTRUCTIVE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES II, LLC.Certificate of Service.(TEPPER, H.)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by RECONSTRUCTIVE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES II, LLC. (TEPPER, H.)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION AND MOTION FOR PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER AS TO EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 10/15/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/17/21.9/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 15, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/17/21.9/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Or To Move For Dismissal Submitted for Court's Approval as Order filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of service.(KENNEDY, SUSAN)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jaa, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, OCTOBER 5, 2021, AT 8:30 A.M., IN ROOM 9614, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/9/21. 9/9/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Notice Of Removal against ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15388662.), filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form)(KENNEDY, SUSAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RECONSTRUCTIVE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES II D/B/A THE ROTHMAN INSTITUTE v. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RECONSTRUCTIVE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES II, LLC doing business as THE ROTHMAN INSTITUTE
Represented By: H. MARC TEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SUSAN M. KENNEDY
Represented By: MICHAEL MENAPACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?