RYECO, LLC et al v. CORRADO'S SPECIALTY GOODS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: RYECO, LLC and T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC.
Defendant: CORRADO'S SPECIALTY GOODS, INC., GERALD CORRADO, SR., PETER CORRADO, JOSEPH CORRADO and JAMES J. CORRADO
Case Number: 2:2021cv04149
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/15/2021. 10/15/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC. As To ALL DEFENDANTS(FASSETT, MARY)
October 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/8/2021 AT 4:00 PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by SAL COGNETTI, JR on behalf of GERALD CORRADO, SR, JAMES J. CORRADO, JOSEPH CORRADO, PETER CORRADO, CORRADO'S SPECIALTY GOODS, INC. with with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(COGNETTI, SAL)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 9/30/2021 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Michael Verchio by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC.. (FASSETT, MARY)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Monica DiMatteo by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(FASSETT, MARY)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Michele Carfagno by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, Part 1, #5 Exhibit 4, Part 2)(FASSETT, MARY)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Gary Martorana by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(FASSETT, MARY)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 Declaration re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Filindo Colace by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(FASSETT, MARY)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 Memorandum of Law re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC.. (FASSETT, MARY)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC..Certificate of Service.(FASSETT, MARY)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FASSETT, MARY)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC..(FASSETT, MARY)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RYECO, LLC.(FASSETT, MARY)
September 21, 2021 Summons Issued as to GERALD CORRADO, SR, JAMES J. CORRADO, JOSEPH CORRADO, PETER CORRADO, CORRADO'S SPECIALTY GOODS, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/21/21 (bw, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GERALD CORRADO, SR, JAMES J. CORRADO, JOSEPH CORRADO, PETER CORRADO, CORRADO'S SPECIALTY GOODS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15419399.), filed by RYECO, LLC, T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(FASSETT, MARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RYECO, LLC et al v. CORRADO'S SPECIALTY GOODS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYECO, LLC
Represented By: MARY JEAN FASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.M. KOVACEVICH - PHILADELPHIA, INC.
Represented By: MARY JEAN FASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRADO'S SPECIALTY GOODS, INC.
Represented By: SAL COGNETTI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD CORRADO, SR.
Represented By: SAL COGNETTI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER CORRADO
Represented By: SAL COGNETTI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH CORRADO
Represented By: SAL COGNETTI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES J. CORRADO
Represented By: SAL COGNETTI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?