Josaphs et al v. Lacy et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Josaphs and Bonnie Josaphs
Defendant: John E. Lacy and Ann W. Lacy
Case Number: 2:2021cv04186
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID Settlement Conference held on 11/9/21. (JL )
November 5, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Status Conference held on 11/5/21. (mbh, ) Modified on 11/5/2021 (mbh, ). (FILED IN ERROR)
November 5, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID TELEPHONE Status Conference held on 11/5/21. (JL )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/9/2021 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID, THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD VIRTUALLY THROUGH THE USE OF ZOOM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 11/4/21. 11/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ann W. Lacy, John E. Lacy. (SINGH, BALDEV)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 2/11/22. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 2/25/22. DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 3/4/22. NO LATER THAN 3/25/22 EACH PARTY SHALL FILE PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 4/1/22. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/19/22 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 4/21/22 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/19/21. 10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/9/2021 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 10/20/21. 10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Pretrial Conference held on 10/19/21 (mbh, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Case Management Plan Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting by Vincent Josaphs. (FLITTER, EDWARD)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Vincent Josaphs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FLITTER, EDWARD)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures by BALDEV SINGH on behalf of Ann W. Lacy, John E. Lacy(SINGH, BALDEV)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Service re Initial Disclosures by EDWARD M. FLITTER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (FLITTER, EDWARD)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT, #2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, #3 EXHIBIT, #4 EXHIBIT, #5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(jaa, )
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SUBMIT THE RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/1/21. 10/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ann W. Lacy, John E. Lacy.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SINGH, BALDEV)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN DOOLEY KENT on behalf of Ann W. Lacy, John E. Lacy (KENT, KEVIN)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 10/19/2021 AT 8:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/23/21. 9/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John E. Lacy, Ann W. Lacy (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15425780), filed by John E. Lacy, Ann W. Lacy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit EOA, #5 Exhibit Sheriff Form, #6 Exhibit Notice of Intent, #7 Exhibit Lacy, John Declaration, #8 Exhibit Lacy, Ann Declaration)(SINGH, BALDEV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Josaphs et al v. Lacy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Josaphs
Represented By: EDWARD M. FLITTER
Represented By: MARK F. HIMSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Josaphs
Represented By: EDWARD M. FLITTER
Represented By: MARK F. HIMSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Lacy
Represented By: BALDEV SINGH
Represented By: KEVIN DOOLEY KENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann W. Lacy
Represented By: BALDEV SINGH
Represented By: KEVIN DOOLEY KENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?