HATCHIGIAN et al v. MATTHEWS PAOLI FORD et al
Plaintiff: DAVID HATCHIGIAN and JOAN RANDAZZO
Defendant: MATTHEWS PAOLI FORD and FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv04643
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS ARE GRANTED. 3 THIS MATTER IS DISMISSED, AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/27/22. 1/27/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTY AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Pretrial Conference held on 1/25/22 (jaa, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 EMAIL)(jaa, )
January 10, 2022 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #15 TO PRO SE PARTY ON 1/10/22. (jaa, )
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, JANUARY 25, 2022, AT 11:00 A.M. AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/5/22. 1/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND PRO SE PARTY. (jaa, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 E-MAIL)(bw, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 13 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6), WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY DAVID HATCHIGIAN, JOAN RANDAZZO. (Attachments: #1 E-MAIL)(amas, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MATTHEWS PAOLI FORD.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LADOV, JOSHUA)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA B. LADOV on behalf of MATTHEWS PAOLI FORD (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LADOV, JOSHUA)
December 16, 2021 Document 9 Mailed to Unrep Party Matthew Ford Paoli. (DT)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRAECIPE TO ENTER JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, PER RULE 237.5 by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, )
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED THAT IF DEFENDANT FAIL TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS BY DECEMBER 23, 2021, PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AGAINST THAT DEFENDANT WITH THE CLERK OF COURT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 55. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO FILE A REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AGAINST A NON-RESPONSIVE DEFENDANT BY DECEMBER 29, 2021, THE COURT MAY ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST THAT DEFENDANT FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 12/15/21. 12/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (jaa, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Memorandum in support of motion to dismiss, #3 Exhibit A-PA Municipal Ct Complaint, #4 Exhibit B-Order of Judgment for Defendant, #5 Certificate of Service Service)(PETERSON, JAMES)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED RE: GUARANTEED SUBPOENA SERVICE INC. SERVED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON FORD MOTOR COMPANY BY PERSONAL. SERVICE ON 11/23/2021, ANSWER DUE 12/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, ) Modified on 12/7/2021 (tjd). Modified on 12/8/2021 (jaa, ).
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed re: Guaranteed Subpoena Service Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon MATTHEWS PAOLI FORD by Personal Service on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Email)(mbh, ) Modified on 11/30/2021 (mbh, ).
November 5, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 5 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, HATCHIGIAN. (bw, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PRO SE PLAINTIFF DAVID HATCHIGIAN'S REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE IN THE ABOVE CASE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/4/21. 11/4/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 Letter request for permission to electronically file dated 11/1/21 by DAVID HATCHIGIAN (mbh, ) Modified on 11/4/2021 (afm, ).
October 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MATTHEWS PAOLI FORD. MAILED To: PRO SE on 10/29/21 (bw, ) Modified on 10/29/2021 (bw, ).
October 29, 2021 SUMMONS HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, HATCHIGIAN. (bw, )
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY, TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE KAREN SPENCER MARSTON. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/27/21. 10/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, )
October 26, 2021 NOTICE OF PRO SE GUIDELINES HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, HATCHIGIAN. (bw, )
October 20, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE233352 (sbt, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MATTHEWS PAOLI FORD, filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN, JOAN RANDAZZO. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bw, )
October 20, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DAVID HATCHIGIAN, JOAN RANDAZZO. (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HATCHIGIAN et al v. MATTHEWS PAOLI FORD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HATCHIGIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN RANDAZZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEWS PAOLI FORD
Represented By: JOSHUA B. LADOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES P. PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?