PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC. v. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC.
Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC., MR3 LOGISTICS, LLC, ORBIT FREIGHT LINES, LLC and SHAMIKH KAZMI
Case Number: 2:2021cv04711
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jeffrey Nugent re: served Summons and Complaint upon Orbit Freight Lines LLC by Personal Service on 12/3/2021 (SANTARELLI, FREDERICK)
December 13, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jeffrey Nugent re: served Summons and Complaint upon MR3 Logistics LLC by Personal Service on 12/3/2021 (SANTARELLI, FREDERICK)
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 Letter by MR3 LOGISTICS, LLC, ORBIT FREIGHT LINES, LLC, ENVELOPE ATTACHED (rf, )
December 8, 2021 Filing 14 Letter by ORBIT FREIGHT LINES, LLC, Envelope Attached (rf, ) Modified on 12/13/2021 (rf, ). *FILED IN ERROR, REFILED AT #15*
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL PROPERLY SERVE DEFENDANTS WITH ITS COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/25/22. FURTHER ORDERED THAT CLERK OF COURT SHALL STRIKE PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR DEFAULT (DOCS. 9, 10, 11 AND 12). SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/2/21. 12/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Default by PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC. against ORBIT FREIGHT LINES, LLC. (KUMER, AIMEE) Modified on 12/3/2021 (rf, ).*STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER OF 12/2/21, DOC. 13*
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Default by PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC. against MR3 LOGISTICS, LLC. (KUMER, AIMEE) Modified on 12/3/2021 (rf, ). *STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER OF 12/2/21, DOC. 13*
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Default by PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC. against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.. (KUMER, AIMEE) Modified on 12/3/2021 (rf, ). *STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER OF 12/2/21, DOC. 13*
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Default by PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC. against SHAMIKH KAZMI. (KUMER, AIMEE) Modified on 12/3/2021 (rf, ). *STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER OF 12/2/21, DOC. 13*
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Universal Property Services by Certified First Class Mail on November 2, 2021 (SANTARELLI, FREDERICK)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Orbit Freight Lines, LLC by Certified First Class Mail on November 1, 2021 (SANTARELLI, FREDERICK)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Universal Property Services, Inc. by Certified First Class Mail on November 2, 2021 (SANTARELLI, FREDERICK) Modified on 11/12/2021 (rf, ). *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, REFILED CORRECTLY AT DOC. 8*
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon MR3 Logistics, LLC by Certified First Class Mail on November 1, 2021 (SANTARELLI, FREDERICK)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Shamikh Kazmi by Certified First Class Mail on November 2, 2021 (SANTARELLI, FREDERICK)
October 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to SHAMIKH KAZMI, MR3 LOGISTICS, LLC, ORBIT FREIGHT LINES, LLC, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/27/21 (bw, )
October 26, 2021 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC. *FOR PDF SEE DOC. #3 * (lisad, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 Declaration by PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC.. (KUMER, AIMEE)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by AIMEE L. KUMER on behalf of PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC. (KUMER, AIMEE)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15503986.), filed by PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SANTARELLI, FREDERICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC. v. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETROLEUM MARKETING GROUP, INC.
Represented By: AIMEE L. KUMER
Represented By: FREDERICK P. SANTARELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR3 LOGISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORBIT FREIGHT LINES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAMIKH KAZMI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?