BM CONSULTING SERVICES, INC. v. MASCIARELLI et al
Plaintiff: BM CONSULTING SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: RICHARD MASCIARELLI, TYLER GIAMPA, CHARLES GALLAGHER, III and BRADLEY COHEN
Case Number: 2:2021cv04990
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BM CONSULTING SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORCHIA, MICHAEL)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dana Judge re: served Summons and Complaint upon Tyler Giampa by Personal Service on 11/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Service)(TORCHIA, MICHAEL)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BRADLEY COHEN, CHARLES GALLAGHER, III, TYLER GIAMPA, RICHARD MASCIARELLI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GEREN, LANCE)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT, #2 ATTACHMENT, #3 ATTACHMENT, #4 ATTACHMENT, #5 ATTACHMENT, #6 ATTACHMENT, #7 ATTACHMENT, #8 ATTACHMENT)(sg, )
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 11/30/21. 11/30/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order #3 faxed to CCP Montgomery County. (fdc)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BM CONSULTING SERVICES, INC..Brief in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A: Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORCHIA, MICHAEL)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHARLES GALLAGHER, TYLER GIAMPA, RICHARD MASCIARELLI, BRADLEY COHEN (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15544226), filed by CHARLES GALLAGHER, TYLER GIAMPA, RICHARD MASCIARELLI, BRADLEY COHEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(GEREN, LANCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BM CONSULTING SERVICES, INC. v. MASCIARELLI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BM CONSULTING SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH WENDELL FLUEHR
Represented By: MICHAEL J TORCHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD MASCIARELLI
Represented By: LANCE GEREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER GIAMPA
Represented By: LANCE GEREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES GALLAGHER, III
Represented By: LANCE GEREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY COHEN
Represented By: LANCE GEREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?