Powell v. Black et al
Petitioner: Breon Powell
Respondent: WARDEN DUANE BLACK, PA ATTORNEY GENERAL and BUCKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Case Number: 2:2021cv05214
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Referring Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 14 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum filed by Breon Powell. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(RATASIEWICZ, JOSEPH) Modified on 1/10/2022 (nd).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE PETITIONER WITH A BLANK COPY OF THE FORM USED IN THIS DISTRICT TO APPLY FOR HABEAS CORPUS. ON OR BEFORE 1/10/22 PETITIONER SHALL COMPLETE THE FORM. HE MAY ATTACH A MEMORANDUM OF LAW. ON OR BEFORE 2/10/22 RESPONDENT SHALL ANSWER THE HABEAS PETITION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 12/9/21. 12/9/21 ENTERED AND COPIES FAXED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE BUCKS COUNTY DA'S OFFICE AND PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/1/21. 12/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (rf, )
December 1, 2021 PETITION (DOC. 1), ORDER (DOC. 12) AND DOCKET SHEET SENT TO BUCKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE AND PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL (rf, )
November 26, 2021 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR***PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt, ) Modified on 11/26/2021 (sbt, ).
November 26, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 4:21-cv-01642. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1) The Report and Recommendation #8 is ADOPTED; and2) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the USDC for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/23/21. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Breon Powell - it is RECOMMENDED that This case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 10/29/2021. (caw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
October 29, 2021 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo and referred to Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum by Breon Powell.(Ratasiewicz, Joseph) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jill M. Graziano. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 10/15/2021. (caw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jill Graziano on behalf of PA Attorney General Attorney Jill Graziano is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5724749.. (Graziano, Jill) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition As Untimely And/Or To Transfer Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Petition To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Pennsylvania by PA Attorney General.(Graziano, Jill) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Pirolli on behalf of Duane Black. (Pirolli, Catherine) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #1 Petition is now deemed filed; Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the Petition and this order on PA Attorney General, Bucks Counts District Attorney and Warden of SCI Huntingdon. Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 9/27/2021. (lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
September 27, 2021 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and h/c petition served on PA Attorney General, Bucks County District Attorney, Warden, SCI Huntingdon. (lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number APAMDC-5705374), filed by Breon Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Copy of Appeal from the Judgment of Sentence December 9, 2013 In Court of Common Pleas of Bucks County Criminal No. CP-09-CR-0003591-2012, #3 Exhibit B-Copy of Appeal from the PCRA Order April 26, 2019 In the Court of Common Pleas of Bucks County Criminal No. CP-09-CR-0003591-2012)(lp) Modified on 9/24/2021 (lp). Modified on 9/24/2021 (lp). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Black et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Breon Powell
Represented By: GERARD K. SCHROM
Represented By: JOSEPH A. RATASIEWICZ
Represented By: NICHOLAS CASAMENTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN DUANE BLACK
Represented By: Catherine Pirolli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PA ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Jill Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BUCKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Represented By: Jill Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?