STANLEY v. ARMEL
Petitioner: HAKEEM STANLEY
Respondent: SUPERINTENDENT ERIC ARMEL, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2021cv05595
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Referring Judge: MARILYN HEFFLEY
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE A SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWER, WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE PETITIONER MAY, IF HE OR SHE CHOOSES, FILE A REPLY TO THE RESPONDENTS' ANSWER WITHIN (21) DAYS FROM THE DATE THE RESPONDENTS' ANSWER IS FILED. THE PROTHONOTARY, CLERK OF COURT, OR JUDICIAL SUPPORT OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. HAKEEM STANLEY, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA, CP-51-CR-13370-2011 WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 2/7/22. 2/7/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER #6 E-MAILED TO ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, PHILADELPHIA COUNTY D.A.'S OFFICE AND FAXED TO CCP PHILADELPHIA.(fdc)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE A SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWER, WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE PETITIONER MAY, IF HE OR SHE CHOOSES, FILE A REPLY TO THE RESPONDENTS' ANSWER WITHIN (21) DAYS FROM THE DATE THE RESPONDENTS' ANSWER IS FILED. THE PROTHONOTARY, CLERK OF COURT, OR JUDICIAL SUPPORT OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. AMY BEYERS, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF DELAWARE,CP-23-CR-3683-2010 WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 1/31/22. 1/31/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 31, 2022 COPIES OF PETITION #1 , ORDER #5 AND DOCKET E-MAILED TO ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, PHILADELPHIA COUNTY D.A.'S OFFICE AND FAXED TO CCP PHILADELPHIA.(fdc)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HON. MARILYN HEFFLEY, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/18/22. 1/18/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
January 18, 2022 Petition #1 and Order #4 faxed to Phila. County D.A.'s Office and PA Office of Atty. General. (fdc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR***PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt, ) Modified on 12/29/2021 (sbt, ).
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attorney) by HAKEEM STANLEY. (HIMEBAUGH, TERI)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number BPAEDC-15627075.), filed by HAKEEM STANLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Complaint)(HIMEBAUGH, TERI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STANLEY v. ARMEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HAKEEM STANLEY
Represented By: TERI B. HIMEBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUPERINTENDENT ERIC ARMEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?