TEXAS MEDICAL SUPPLY, LLC et al v. LUBIN
Plaintiff: TEXAS MEDICAL SUPPLY, LLC, JAD SHRAIM, OMARI SHAFRAN and DIMITRI MENIN
Defendant: AVRUMI LUBIN
Case Number: 2:2022cv00059
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MATTHEW J. MORRIS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 3/25/22.3/25/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID A. PICON, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 3/25/22.3/25/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti)
March 15, 2022 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by AVRUMI LUBIN. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number APAEDC-15788549). (CHUK, STEPHEN)
March 15, 2022 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by AVRUMI LUBIN. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number APAEDC-15788563). (CHUK, STEPHEN)
March 14, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AVRUMI LUBIN.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of A. Lubin, #3 Exhibit 1 to Lubin Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Lubin Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(CHUK, STEPHEN)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew J. Morris filed by AVRUMI LUBIN.Certificate of Service.(CHUK, STEPHEN)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for David A. Picon filed by AVRUMI LUBIN.Certificate of Service.(CHUK, STEPHEN)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION SHALL BE UP TO AND INCLUDING MARCH 14, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 3/1/22. 3/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION - Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by AVRUMI LUBIN. (CHUK, STEPHEN)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. CHUK on behalf of AVRUMI LUBIN with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHUK, STEPHEN)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Benito Acevedo, Sr. re: served Summons and Complaint and Exhibits upon Mrs. Lubin wife of Defendant, Avrumi Lubin by Hand Delivery on February 7, 2022 (HESKIN, SHANE)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by DIMITRI MENIN, OMARI SHAFRAN, JAD SHRAIM, TEXAS MEDICAL SUPPLY, LLC.. (HESKIN, SHANE)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Designation Form by DIMITRI MENIN, OMARI SHAFRAN, JAD SHRAIM, TEXAS MEDICAL SUPPLY, LLC.. (HESKIN, SHANE)
January 10, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt)
January 10, 2022 Summons Issued as to AVRUMI LUBIN. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 1/10/2022 (sg, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AVRUMI LUBIN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15648598.), filed by TEXAS MEDICAL SUPPLY, LLC, DIMITRI MENIN, OMARI SHAFRAN, JAD SHRAIM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(HESKIN, SHANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEXAS MEDICAL SUPPLY, LLC et al v. LUBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEXAS MEDICAL SUPPLY, LLC
Represented By: SHANE R. HESKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAD SHRAIM
Represented By: SHANE R. HESKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMARI SHAFRAN
Represented By: SHANE R. HESKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIMITRI MENIN
Represented By: SHANE R. HESKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVRUMI LUBIN
Represented By: STEPHEN R. CHUK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?