STEAD et al v. A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. et al.
Plaintiff: JAMES F. STEAD, SR. and SUSAN A. STEAD
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. et al., EXCELSIOR INC., GRINELL CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., General Electric Co., FOSTER WHEELER L.L.C., EATON CORPORATION, RSCC WIRE & CABLE LLC, ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, ATWOOD & MORRILL, AURORA PUMP, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., BBC BROWN BOVERI, YORK INTERNATIONAL, WARREN PUMPS, INC., TACO, INC., SQUARE D COMPANY, SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, RUMSEY ELECTRIC CO., ROCKBESTOS COMPANY, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC, BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., BURNHAM LLC, BW/IP, CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., CLYDE UNION PUMPS, COCHRANE ENVIRONMENTAL SYSTEMS, CONCEPT ALLOYS INC., COONEY BROTHERS, CRANE CHEMPHARMA & ENERGY, CRANE CO., EXCELSIOR LEATHER WASHER MFG. CO., FOSTER WHEELER, GARDNER DENVER, GENERAL ELECTRIC, GOODYEAR CANADA, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., GOULD PUMPS INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., ITT GRINELL, HAJOCA CORPORATION, HONEYWELL, INC., DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE COMPANY, ITT BELL GOSSET, J.A. SEXAUER, J.J. WHITE, INC., KEATS MANUFACTURING, KOHLER COMPANY, MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING, MONSEY PRODUCTS, PECORA CORPORATION, PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION and POWELL VALVES
Petitioner: ViacomCBS Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00093
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 76 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross-Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC.(DEZII, DAWN)
March 1, 2022 Filing 75 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses; Answer to Cross-Claims; and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BF GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
February 28, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES F. TATE on behalf of BURNHAM LLC with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(TATE, JAMES)
February 28, 2022 Filing 73 RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES with Certificate of Service by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(HOWARTH, JOHN) Modified on 3/1/2022 (tjd).
February 28, 2022 Filing 72 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation with Certificate of Service by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC..(HOWARTH, JOHN)
February 28, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. HOWARTH on behalf of BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(HOWARTH, JOHN)
February 24, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH A. LEWIS on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. with Certificate of Service(LEWIS, LEAH)
February 24, 2022 Filing 69 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 24, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. with Certificate of Service(VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 24, 2022 Filing 67 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 23, 2022 Filing 66 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by POWELL VALVES.(REILLY, MOLLY)
February 23, 2022 Filing 65 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Crossclaims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by POWELL VALVES.(REILLY, MOLLY)
February 23, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLY C. REILLY on behalf of POWELL VALVES with Certificate of Service(REILLY, MOLLY)
February 22, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE by BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement of Belden Wire & Cable Company, LLC Under Federal Rule 26(a)(1) (DEZII, DAWN)
February 22, 2022 Filing 62 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Belden 1993 LLC with Certificate of Service by BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC.(DEZII, DAWN)
February 22, 2022 Filing 61 Initial Disclosure with Certificate of Service by BF GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN) Modified on 2/23/2022 (tjd).
February 22, 2022 Filing 60 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BF GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
February 18, 2022 Filing 59 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM AND REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS against All Defendants by MONSEY PRODUCTS.(MCDEVITT HAGAN, TRACEY)
February 17, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of GOODYEAR CANADA with Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
February 17, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
February 16, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of KEATS MANUFACTURING with Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/15/22.2/15/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 14, 2022 Filing 54 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Reply to Crossclaims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FOSTER WHEELER.(VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 11, 2022 Filing 53 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims with Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 11, 2022 Filing 52 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims with Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
February 11, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by JAMES F. STEAD, SR..(PAUL, ROBERT)
February 4, 2022 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 4, 2022 Filing 49 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EATON CORPORATION.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 4, 2022 Filing 48 Statement Corporate Disclosure by RSCC WIRE & CABLE LLC. (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 4, 2022 Filing 47 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RSCC WIRE & CABLE LLC.(GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
February 3, 2022 CROSSCLAIM against A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, ATWOOD & MORRILL, AURORA PUMP, BBC BROWN BOVERI, BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC, BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., BURNHAM LLC, BW/IP, CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., CLYDE UNION PUMPS, COCHRANE ENVIRONMENTAL SYSTEMS, CONCEPT ALLOYS INC., COONEY BROTHERS, CRANE CHEMPHARMA & ENERGY, CRANE CO., EATON CORPORATION, EXCELSIOR INC., FOSTER WHEELER, GARDNER DENVER, GENERAL ELECTRIC, GOODYEAR CANADA, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., GOULD PUMPS INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., GRINELL CORPORATION, HAJOCA CORPORATION, HONEYWELL, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., ITT BELL GOSSET, J.A. SEXAUER, J.J. WHITE, INC., KEATS MANUFACTURING, KOHLER COMPANY, MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING, MONSEY PRODUCTS, PECORA CORPORATION, PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION, POWELL VALVES, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, ROCKBESTOS COMPANY, RUMSEY ELECTRIC CO., SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, SQUARE D COMPANY, TACO, INC., WARREN PUMPS, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL filed by BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. **(REFILED TO ADD THE CROSSCLAIM, SEE DOCUMENT #45 FOR ORIGINAL FILING AND PDF)**.(tjd)
February 3, 2022 Filing 46 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, ATWOOD & MORRILL, AURORA PUMP, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., BBC BROWN BOVERI, BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC, BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., BURNHAM LLC, BW/IP, CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., CLYDE UNION PUMPS, COCHRANE ENVIRONMENTAL SYSTEMS, CONCEPT ALLOYS INC., COONEY BROTHERS, CRANE CHEMPHARMA & ENERGY, CRANE CO., EATON CORPORATION, EXCELSIOR INC., FOSTER WHEELER, GARDNER DENVER, GENERAL ELECTRIC, GOODYEAR CANADA, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., GOULD PUMPS INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., GRINELL CORPORATION, HAJOCA CORPORATION, HONEYWELL, INC., ITT BELL GOSSET, J.A. SEXAUER, J.J. WHITE, INC., KEATS MANUFACTURING, KOHLER COMPANY, MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING, MONSEY PRODUCTS, PECORA CORPORATION, PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION, POWELL VALVES, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, ROCKBESTOS COMPANY, RUMSEY ELECTRIC CO., SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, SQUARE D COMPANY, TACO, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Reply to All Crossclaims.(FONTAK, JOSEPH) Modified on 2/4/2022 (tjd).
February 3, 2022 Filing 45 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, and Answer to Cross Claims to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC..(JASONS, CATHERINE)
February 3, 2022 Filing 44 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL)
February 2, 2022 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Bayer AG with Certificate of Service by BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC..(JASONS, CATHERINE)
February 2, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. JASONS on behalf of BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. with Certificate of Service(JASONS, CATHERINE)
February 2, 2022 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by FOSTER WHEELER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(VALINIS, SUSAN)
February 1, 2022 Filing 40 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CBS CORPORATION and GENERAL ELECTRIC. (MCSHEA, JOHN) Modified on 2/3/2022 (tjd).
February 1, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE by CBS CORPORATION and GENERAL ELECTRIC Joinder of Removal and Independent Notice of Removal; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Supplement Jury Demand)(MCSHEA, JOHN) Modified on 2/3/2022 (tjd).
January 31, 2022 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and Imo Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
January 31, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
January 31, 2022 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Babcock Power, Inc. by RILEY STOKER CORPORATION.(DEPFER, JOAN)
January 31, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by JOAN P. DEPFER on behalf of RILEY STOKER CORPORATION (DEPFER, JOAN)
January 28, 2022 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PECORA CORPORATION.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
January 28, 2022 Filing 33 Initial Disclosures with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PECORA CORPORATION.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN) Modified on 2/1/2022 (tjd).
January 28, 2022 Filing 32 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by PECORA CORPORATION.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
January 28, 2022 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
January 28, 2022 Filing 30 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants and Reply to All Crossclaims by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING. Affirmative Defenses.(DISIPIO, BASIL) Modified on 2/1/2022 (tjd).
January 28, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING with Jury Demand & Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
January 28, 2022 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 28, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES (RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 27, 2022 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION. PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION waiver sent on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (LOCKETT, MARK)
January 27, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK ALLEN LOCKETT on behalf of PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION (LOCKETT, MARK)
January 26, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL F. WEISBEIN on behalf of J.J. WHITE, INC. with Certificate of Service(WEISBEIN, PAUL)
January 26, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of BF GOODRICH COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
January 26, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
January 26, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by INGRID H. GRAFF on behalf of RSCC WIRE & CABLE LLC (GRAFF, INGRID)
January 26, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by INGRID H. GRAFF on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GRAFF, INGRID)
January 26, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SCHEETS on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, INC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
January 26, 2022 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WARREN PUMPS, INC..(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 26, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, INC. (RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 26, 2022 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 26, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY (RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by J.A. SEXAUER.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of J.A. SEXAUER (RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ATWOOD & MORRILL.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 26, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of ATWOOD & MORRILL (RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 21, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/21/22 (jaa, )
January 20, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Parties All Parties., filed by JAMES F. STEAD, SR. and SUSAN A. STEAD. (PAUL, ROBERT) Modified on 1/21/2022 (tjd).
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of RSCC WIRE & CABLE LLC (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including John Wood Group plc with Certificate of Service by FOSTER WHEELER L.L.C..(VALINIS, SUSAN)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand filed by JAMES F. STEAD, SR. Memorandum.(PAUL, ROBERT) Modified on 1/20/2022 (tjd).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.1 PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 18, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/18/22.1/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ViacomCBS Inc..(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by General Electric Co..(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ViacomCBS Inc. and filed by General Electric Co., ViacomCBS Inc..Brief, Certificate of Service.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. et al. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY TRIAL DIVISION, case number OCTOBER TERM 2021: 2110-1773. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number PPE235634) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEAD et al v. A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES F. STEAD, SR.
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN A. STEAD
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON, INC. et al.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXCELSIOR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINELL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Co.
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER L.L.C.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: INGRID H. GRAFF
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC WIRE & CABLE LLC
Represented By: INGRID H. GRAFF
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATWOOD & MORRILL
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.
Represented By: CATHERINE N. JASONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBC BROWN BOVERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUMSEY ELECTRIC CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKBESTOS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY STOKER CORPORATION
Represented By: JOAN P. DEPFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF GOODRICH COMPANY
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM LLC
Represented By: JAMES F. TATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: LEAH A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLYDE UNION PUMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COCHRANE ENVIRONMENTAL SYSTEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONCEPT ALLOYS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COONEY BROTHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CHEMPHARMA & ENERGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXCELSIOR LEATHER WASHER MFG. CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO.
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD PUMPS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT GRINELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAJOCA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT BELL GOSSET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. SEXAUER
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.J. WHITE, INC.
Represented By: PAUL F. WEISBEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEATS MANUFACTURING
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSEY PRODUCTS
Represented By: TRACEY MCDEVITT HAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PECORA CORPORATION
Represented By: KEVIN O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION
Represented By: MARK ALLEN LOCKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWELL VALVES
Represented By: MOLLY C. REILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?