WRIGHT v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: KENYOCK WRIGHT
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA and EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL
3Rd Party Plaintiff: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. and TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
3Rd Party Defendant: Allied Security LLC d/b/a AlliedBarton Security Services (a/k/a Universal Protection Service, LLC, d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services)
Case Number: 2:2022cv00300
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman's Services for the Professional, Inc re: served Summons & Third-Party Complaint upon Allied Security LLC d/b/a AlliedBarton Security Services (a/k/a Universal Protection Service, LLC d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services), c/o CT Corporation by AFFIDAVIT OF CORPORATE SERVICE on 3/8/2022 (GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
February 18, 2022 Filing 13 Letter dated 02-18-2022 by KENYOCK WRIGHT. (RADMORE, JAMES)
February 15, 2022 Summons Issued as to Allied Security LLC d/b/a AlliedBarton Security Services (a/k/a Universal Protection Service, LLC, d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services). EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 2/15/22 (jaa, )
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Allied Security LLC d/b/a AlliedBarton Security Services (a/k/a Universal Protection Service, LLC, d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services), filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC..(GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
February 3, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(JANKOWSKI, JENNA)
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL)
January 31, 2022 Filing 9 Temple Health Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC..(GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
January 31, 2022 Filing 8 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to plff's complaint by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.. (GREENSPAN, LESLIE) Modified on 2/1/2022 (lvj).
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 Disclosure statement filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC..Certificate of Service.(GREENSPAN, LESLIE) Modified on 2/1/2022 (lvj
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 Disclosure statement filed by TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC...(GREENSPAN, LESLIE) Modified on 2/1/2022 (lvj).
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 Disclosure statement filed by EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL. Certificate of Service.(GREENSPAN, LESLIE) Modified on 2/1/2022 (lvj).
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL Consenting to Defendant City of Philadelphia's Notice of Removal (GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN on behalf of EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(GREENSPAN, LESLIE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOE H. TUCKER, JR on behalf of EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(TUCKER, JOE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15680548), filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.(JANKOWSKI, JENNA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENYOCK WRIGHT
Represented By: JAMES R. RADMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: JENNA LYNN JANKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: JOE H. TUCKER, JR.
Represented By: LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: JOE H. TUCKER, JR.
Represented By: LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: JOE H. TUCKER, JR.
Represented By: LESLIE MILLER GREENSPAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Allied Security LLC d/b/a AlliedBarton Security Services (a/k/a Universal Protection Service, LLC, d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?