NEWBERG v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL J. NEWBERG and DANIEL NEWBERG
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, SUPT. JAMES SORBER, STEPHEN WIENER, M.D., SCI CORRECTIONAL OFF JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, WELLPATH, INC, NURSES JANE AND JOHN DOE #S 1-15, DR. JANE AND JOHN DOE''s 1-5, MHM SERVICES, INC. incorrectly identified as CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS also known as MHM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, LLC also known as MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES LLC doing business as CENTURION HEALTH, JAMIE SORBER, SCI PHOENIX CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS/WELLPATH, INC. NURSES JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS/WELLPATH, INC. DR. JANE AND JOHN DOE #s 1-5, MHM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, LLC, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES LLC, SCI PHOENIX PROVIDER JENNIFER WARD, SCI PHOENIX PROVIDER CHRISTINE STICKNEY, SCI PHOENIC PROVIDER YUEHENG HAN, SCI PHOENIX PROVIDER J FERNANDEZ, MHM SERVICES, INC/WELLPATH, INC NURSES JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15 and MHM SERVICES/WELLPATH, INC DR. JANE AND JOHN DOE #'s 1-5
Case Number: 2:2022cv00304
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Summons Issued as to J FERNANDEZ, YUEHENG HAN, MHM SERVICES, INC., CHRISTINE STICKNEY, JENNIFER WARD. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/22/22 (bw)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Certificate of Service against PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, SCI PHOENIX CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15, JAMIE SORBER, WELLPATH, INC, STEPHEN WIENER, MD, MHM SERVICES, INC., JENNIFER WARD, CHRISTINE STICKNEY, YUEHENG HAN, J FERNANDEZ, MHM SERVICES, INC/WELLPATH, INC NURSES JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15, MHM SERVICES/WELLPATH, INC DR. JANE AND JOHN DOE #'s 1-5, filed by DANIEL NEWBERG.(DENENBERG, ALAN)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMIE SORBER, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. JAMIE SORBER waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022; PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (DEFELICE, CHASE)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, WELLPATH, INC, STEPHEN WIENER, MD.(GOODRICH, CAITLIN)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by STEPHEN WIENER, MD Notice of Dr. Wiener's Death (GOODRICH, CAITLIN)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, STEPHEN WIENER, MD, WELLPATH, INC. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022; STEPHEN WIENER, MD waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022; WELLPATH, INC waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (GOODRICH, CAITLIN)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN J. GOODRICH on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, WELLPATH, INC, STEPHEN WIENER, MD (GOODRICH, CAITLIN)
January 25, 2022 Summons Issued as to CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JAMIE SORBER, WELLPATH, INC, STEPHEN WIENER, MD. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/25/22 (bw, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, NURSES JANE AND JOHN DOE #S 1-15, JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15, DR. JANE AND JOHN DOE''s 1-5, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JAMES SORBER, WELLPATH, INC, STEPHEN WIENER, MD ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15681800.), filed by DANIEL J. NEWBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Track Designation Form)(DENENBERG, ALAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEWBERG v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL J. NEWBERG
Represented By: ALAN E. DENENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL NEWBERG
Represented By: ALAN E. DENENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: CHASE M. DEFELICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPT. JAMES SORBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN WIENER, M.D.
Represented By: CAITLIN J. GOODRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI CORRECTIONAL OFF JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS
Represented By: CAITLIN J. GOODRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLPATH, INC
Represented By: CAITLIN J. GOODRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSES JANE AND JOHN DOE #S 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JANE AND JOHN DOE''s 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM SERVICES, INC. incorrectly identified as CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS also known as MHM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, LLC also known as MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES LLC doing business as CENTURION HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE SORBER
Represented By: CHASE M. DEFELICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI PHOENIX CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS/WELLPATH, INC. NURSES JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS/WELLPATH, INC. DR. JANE AND JOHN DOE #s 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI PHOENIX PROVIDER JENNIFER WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI PHOENIX PROVIDER CHRISTINE STICKNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI PHOENIC PROVIDER YUEHENG HAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI PHOENIX PROVIDER J FERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM SERVICES, INC/WELLPATH, INC NURSES JANE/JOHN DOE #s 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM SERVICES/WELLPATH, INC DR. JANE AND JOHN DOE #'s 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?