ESTATE OF JOHNSON v. SHAPIRO et al
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOHNSON
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO, MARCIA FUDGE, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, DIANE CORTES, HARRY B. REESE, CRAIG A. HIRNEISEN, SARAH E. POWERS, SARAH K. MCCAFFERY, JILL MANUEL-COUGHLIN, AMANDA L. RAUER, JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO FORMER TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF TARANI A. JOHNSON doing business as INTERLOPER, CRAIG A. HIRNEISEN doing business as INTERLOPER doing business as CRAIG A. HIRNEISEN, SARAH K. MCCAFFERY doing business as INTERLOPER doing business as SARAH K. MCCAFFERY, JILL MANUEL-COUGHLIN doing business as INTERLOPER, AMANDA L. RAUER doing business as AMANDA L. RAUER and JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA doing business as JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00895
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert-Kenji Laurie, Tarani-Alike re: served (document not listed) upon Amanda L. Rauer, Diane Cortes, Harry B. Reese, Jill Manuel-Coughlin, Jolanta M. Pekalska, Josh Shapiro, Sara E. Powers, Sarah K. McCaffery by Personal Service on 3/25/22. Mike Santomassimo by Personal Service on 3/30/22. (fdc)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' #7 MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED. THIS CASE IS HEREBY REMANDED TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #9 IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/31/22.3/31/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
March 31, 2022 Copy of Order #10 E-mailed to CCP Philadelphia. (fdc)
March 30, 2022 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ESTATE OF JOHNSON, Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(fdc)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE and Demand to Correct the Name on the Record by ESTATE OF JOHNSON (fdc)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JILL MANUEL-COUGHLIN, JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA, SARAH E. POWERS, HARRY B. REESE.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit A - Foreclosure Docket Report, #4 Exhibit B - Foreclosure Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Trial Verdict Worksheet, #6 Exhibit D - Appellate Docket Reports, #7 Exhibit E - Notice of Removal, #8 Certificate of Service)(REESE, HARRY)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Termination of Trustee by Tarani Alike Johnson. (No envelope) (fdc)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ESTATE OF JOHNSON. (fdc) Modified on 3/24/2022 (tjd).
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 Bill in Equity - Notice of Express Trust by Tarani Alike Johnson Estate Living Trust. No Envelope Attached. (fdc)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (rf, ) Modified on 3/22/2022 (rf, ).
March 14, 2022 11 SUMMONS MAILED TO PRO SE AS TO DIANE CORTES, MARCIA FUDGE, CRAIG A. HIRNEISEN, JILL MANUEL-COUGHLIN, SARAH K. MCCAFFERY, JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA, SARAH E. POWERS, AMANDA L. RAUER, HARRY B. REESE, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, JOSH SHAPIRO (tomg)
March 11, 2022 Summons Issued as to DIANE CORTES, MARCIA FUDGE, CRAIG A. HIRNEISEN, JILL MANUEL-COUGHLIN, SARAH K. MCCAFFERY, JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA, SARAH E. POWERS, AMANDA L. RAUER, HARRY B. REESE, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, JOSH SHAPIRO. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (fdc)
March 7, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE237584 (sbt)
March 7, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. MAILED TO JOHNSON. (fdc)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL/COMPLAINT against DIANE CORTES, MARCIA FUDGE, CRAIG A. HIRNEISEN, JILL MANUEL-COUGHLIN, SARAH K. MCCAFFERY, JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA, SARAH E. POWERS, AMANDA L. RAUER, HARRY B. REESE, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, JOSH SHAPIRO ( Filing fee $ 402 Temporary Receipt #291.), filed by ESTATE OF JOHNSON.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF JOHNSON v. SHAPIRO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCIA FUDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE SANTOMASSIMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE CORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY B. REESE
Represented By: HARRY B. REESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG A. HIRNEISEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH E. POWERS
Represented By: HARRY B. REESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH K. MCCAFFERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL MANUEL-COUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA L. RAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE SANTOMASSIMO FORMER TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF TARANI A. JOHNSON doing business as INTERLOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG A. HIRNEISEN doing business as INTERLOPER doing business as CRAIG A. HIRNEISEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH K. MCCAFFERY doing business as INTERLOPER doing business as SARAH K. MCCAFFERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL MANUEL-COUGHLIN doing business as INTERLOPER
Represented By: HARRY B. REESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA L. RAUER doing business as AMANDA L. RAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA doing business as JOLANTA M. PEKALSKA
Represented By: HARRY B. REESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?