PYLE v. UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP et al
Plaintiff: JEREMY PYLE
Defendant: UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP, DOMINIC J VENUTI, FRED C RHODES, JR and ALLEN T REEVES, III
Case Number: 2:2022cv01715
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE A SIXTY (60) DAY EXTENSION, UNTIL TUESDAY, 8/23/22, TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/28/22. 6/28/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP. UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP waiver sent on 6/24/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
June 28, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DOMINIC J VENUTI. DOMINIC J VENUTI waiver sent on 6/24/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
June 28, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FRED C RHODES, JR. FRED C RHODES, JR waiver sent on 6/24/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
June 28, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALLEN T REEVES, III. ALLEN T REEVES, III waiver sent on 6/24/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND by ALLEN T REEVES, III, FRED C RHODES, JR, UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP, DOMINIC J VENUTI. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
June 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN CONLEY on behalf of ALLEN T REEVES, III, FRED C RHODES, JR, UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP, DOMINIC J VENUTI with certificate of service(CONLEY, BRIAN)
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of ALLEN T REEVES, III, FRED C RHODES, JR, UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP, DOMINIC J VENUTI with certificate of service(MACMAIN, DAVID)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEREMY PYLE re: Michael Damiano - Metro Filing Services, Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon ALLEN T REEVES, III, FRED C RHODES, JR, UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP, DOMINIC J VENUTI by Personal Service. ALLEN T REEVES, III served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022; FRED C RHODES, JR served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022; UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022; DOMINIC J VENUTI served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons2, #2 Summons3, #3 Summons4)(fdc)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ALLEN T REEVES, III, FRED C RHODES, JR, UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP, DOMINIC J VENUTI. Forwarded To: Robert F. Datner on 5/4/22 (fdc)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15897386.), filed by JEREMY PYLE.(DATNER, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PYLE v. UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPPER CHICHESTER TOWNSHIP
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Represented By: BRIAN CONLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMINIC J VENUTI
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Represented By: BRIAN CONLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED C RHODES, JR
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Represented By: BRIAN CONLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN T REEVES, III
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Represented By: BRIAN CONLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY PYLE
Represented By: ROBERT F. DATNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?