BELFI v. USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK et al
Plaintiff: ALEX BELFI
Defendant: USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, MERSCORP HOLDING, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (INC.), NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 100, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 10 and OTHER JOHN DOE ENTITIES 1 THROUGH 10
Case Number: 2:2022cv02083
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant USAA Federal Savings Banks Civ.R. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TORRICE, NOELLE)
July 18, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (INC.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BENDER, AARON)
July 10, 2022 Filing 18 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, FILED BY ALEX BELFI. (Attachments: #1 E-MAIL)(amas)
July 8, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant USAA Federal Savings Banks Civ.R. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Defendant USAA Federal Savings Banks Civ.R. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Civil Court Docket, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(TORRICE, NOELLE)
July 8, 2022 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including United Services Automobile Association with Certificate of Service by USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TORRICE, NOELLE)
July 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TORRICE, NOELLE)
July 5, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (INC.).Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certification of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certification of Aaron M. Bender, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17)(BENDER, AARON)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ADMISSION, FILED BY ALEX BELFI. (Attachments: #1 E-MAIL)(amas)
June 23, 2022 Filing 12 PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONTO DISMISS filed by ALEX BELFI. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, )
June 22, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MERSCORP HOLDING, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Brief in Support, Declaration in Support, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Michala)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, MERSCORP HOLDING, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (INC.). EMAILED To: PLAINTIFF on 6/22/22 (jaa, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 VERIFICATION by ALEX BELFI re: served AMENDED COMPLAINT upon USAA Federal Savings Bank, Sharon McGann Hortskamp of Merscorp Holdings Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration systems Inc, Maroon Holding LLC, Mr. Cooper d/b/a Nationstar Mortgage LLC, and JP Morgan & Chase by CERTIFIED MAIL on 6/21/22 (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, )
June 18, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN AND JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 100, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 10, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, MERSCORP HOLDING, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, OTHER JOHN DOE ENTITIES 1 THROUGH 10, USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (INC.), filed by ALEX BELFI. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by ALEX BELFI. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/13/2022) (jaa, ).
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by ALEX BELFI re: served Complaint upon USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, MERSCORP HOLDINGS INC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, MAROON HOLDING LLC, MR. COOPER D/B/A NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC, AND WELLS FARGO BANK by CERTIFIED MAIL; PERSONAL on 6/2/22 (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, )
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, MERSCORP HOLDING, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (INC.). EMAILED To: PLAINTIFF on 5/27/22. (jaa, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE240339 (jaa, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL filed by ALEX BELFI.(jaa, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN AND JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 100, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 10, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, MERSCORP HOLDING, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, OTHER JOHN DOE ENTITIES 1 THROUGH 10, USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (INC.) (Filing fee Paid $ 402.), filed by ALEX BELFI. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELFI v. USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX BELFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: NOELLE B. TORRICE
Represented By: Michala Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP HOLDING, INC.
Represented By: Michala Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Michala Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (INC.)
Represented By: AARON M. BENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC
Represented By: Michala Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTHER JOHN DOE ENTITIES 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?