JOHNSON v. SHAPIRO et al
Plaintiff: TARANI ALIKE JOHNSON
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO, MARCIA FUDGE, STACY GARRITY, DIANE CORTES and MIKE SANTOMASSIMO
Case Number: 2:2022cv02768
Filed: July 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO. #12 ) IS GRANTED, IN PART. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 8/29/22. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/18/22. 8/19/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE BY CHAMBERS. (amas)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED IN PART. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 8/29/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/16/22. 8/16/22 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE BY CHAMBERS.(JL)
August 10, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PER COURT'S ORDER, FILED BY TARANI ALIKE JOHNSON.(OVER THE COUNTER FILING, NO ENVELOPE)(amas)
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by MULTIPLE PROCESS SERVERS re: served SUMMONS upon MARCIA FUDGE, JOSH SHAPIRO, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, DIANE CORTES, STACY CARRITY by PERSONAL on 7/26/22 (amas)
July 28, 2022 Filing 10 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TARANI ALIKE JOHNSON re: MULTIPLE PROCESS SERVERS served Summons and Complaint upon DIANE CORTES, MARCIA FUDGE, STACY GARRITY, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, JOSH SHAPIRO by PERSONAL. DIANE CORTES served on 7/26/2022, answer due 8/16/2022; MARCIA FUDGE served on 7/26/2022, answer due 8/16/2022; STACY GARRITY served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022; MIKE SANTOMASSIMO served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022; JOSH SHAPIRO served on 7/26/2022, answer due 8/16/2022. (amas)
July 28, 2022 DOC #9 MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS UNINTELLIGIBLE AND THE DEFENDANTS ARE NOT REQUIRED TO ANSWER IT. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #7 ) IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IF PLAINTIFF DESIRES TO SEEK A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PLAINTIFF MUST FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 7 DAYS. IF PLAINTIFF DOES NOT SEEK ANY PRELIMINARY RELIEF, HE MAY FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 14 DAYS. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/27/22.7/27/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE BY CHAMBERS. (amas)
July 27, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to DIANE CORTES, MARCIA FUDGE, STACY GARRITY, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, JOSH SHAPIRO. (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE)(amas)
July 27, 2022 Summons Issued as to MARCIA FUDGE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: US ATTY on 7/27/22 (amas)
July 26, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DIANE CORTES, MARCIA FUDGE, STACY GARRITY, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, JOSH SHAPIRO. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF on 7/26/22. (jaa, )
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE20000541 (jaa, )
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DIANE CORTES, MARCIA FUDGE, STACY GARRITY, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, JOSH SHAPIRO, filed by TARANI ALIKE JOHNSON.(amas)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITH MEMORANDUM, FILED BY TARANI ALIKE JOHNSON.(amas)
July 20, 2022 Copy of Doc. 3 mailed to Pro Se. (mas)
July 13, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
July 13, 2022 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by TARANI ALIKE JOHNSON. No Envelope. (va)
July 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIANE CORTES, MARCIA FUDGE, STACY GARRITY, MIKE SANTOMASSIMO, JOSH SHAPIRO, filed by TARANI ALIKE JOHNSON. No Envelope. FEE NOT PAID. NO IFP FILED. (va)
July 13, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TARANI ALIKE JOHNSON. (va)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. SHAPIRO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARANI ALIKE JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCIA FUDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACY GARRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE CORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE SANTOMASSIMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?