MERRADO v. RANSOM et al
Petitioner: JOSE MERRADO
Respondent: SUPT. KEVIN J. RANSOM, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2022cv02916
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 Letter dated 8/17/22 by JOSE MERRADO (mbh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 Copy of Order/Notice dated 8/9/22 (Document # 3) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to JOSE MERRADO for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (JL)
August 25, 2022 PAPER #2, #3 REMAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
August 10, 2022 PAPER #3 PLUS FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE (JL) REMAILED WITH UPDATED ADDRESS. Modified on 8/15/2022 (sg).
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FURNISH MR. MERRADO WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (SHORT FORM) BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF MR. MERRADO SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY THE REQUIRED $5 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR COMPLETE AND RETURN THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS INCLUDING THE REQUIRED CERTIFICATION OF PRISON ASSETS SIGNED BY A PRISON OFFICIAL TO THE CLERK OF COURT. IF MR. MERRADO FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/9/22. 8/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
July 28, 2022 DOC. 2 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mbh)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED BY JOSE MERRADO. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERRADO v. RANSOM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE MERRADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUPT. KEVIN J. RANSOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?