MILLER v. GOGGIN et al
Plaintiff: JOHN RYAN MILLER
Defendant: THOMAS NELLING, JOSEPH ELIAS, TRACEY LAWS, MITCHELL ROCK, THOMAS GOGGIN, JOHN O'DONNELL, DAVID SASSA, ROBERT DOUGHERTY, DEBRA RYAN, ROBERT LACOURT, RICHARD FINFROCK, FRANK GALBRAITH, MARY FRIEDBERG, DELORES D'AMORE, JACK LAUFER, GERALD BOOMER, HOWARD HOLLAND, GEORGENE D'CARBO, LISA TARASCHI, WILLIAM MOSSMAN, ROBERT CLARKE, MICHELLE MAJOR, JOSEPH HEYMAN, MATT WILLIAMS, CHRIS YEAGER, JOE MILES, DIXIE STRACHNIK, CALVIN WILSON, BENJAMIN PRATT, WILLIAM HOLDSWORTH, MATTHEW GORDON, MARC PARTEE, LOUIS MARCELLI, MATTHEW DELCHERT, ANN GERY, SAMUEL IACONO, MARIA AVALA, BRIAN SHELLER, SHAREN MAITTLAND, RACHEL ZELTMAN, ANDREW LOVETTE, WILLIAM ROZIER, MELLISSA LAUGHLIN, ERIN BURLEW, KEVIN KOCHKA, SANJAY BRIDGES, BRIAN MARSHALL, DANIELLE WADE, MICHAEL HAWLEY, JOHN FRYE, KEVIN PIERCE, CHIEF SIMPSON, RYAN WHITE, TIMOTHY BROWN, MIKE BEATY, JOHN DEMARCO, SCOTT ALEXANDER, TIMOTHY PARKER, JEFF KIMES, THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL, JAMES MOREHEAD, RAYMOND STEVENSON, ERIC HUGHES, MICHAEL CARROLL, JEASSICA HARPER, SHANE CLARK, MICHAEL SWININGER, LEE BENSON, JENNIFER KELLER, YVETTE JOHNSON, BRENDA M. BERNOT, DIANE MOORE, JILL HARDY, JEFF CURTIS, BRIAN NORRIS, LISA BOWMAN, SAM GANOW, JARED ZIMMERMAN, CHARLIE KOENNECKER, BRIAN FOX, MATT HURLEY, JOHN PROPPER, MICHELLE ORNER and LISA YELOVICH
Case Number: 2:2022cv03329
Filed: August 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2023 Filing 307 RESPONSE to Motion re #300 MOTION for Leave to File filed by DEBRA RYAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PULLANO, MICHAEL)
July 18, 2023 Filing 306 RESPONSE in Opposition re #300 MOTION for Leave to File filed by LISA BOWMAN, JEFF CURTIS, BRIAN FOX, SAM GANOW, JILL HARDY, MATT HURLEY, CHARLIE KOENNECKER, BRIAN NORRIS, MICHELLE ORNER, JOHN PROPPER, LISA YELOVICH, JARED ZIMMERMAN. (CONFAIR, JASON)
July 18, 2023 Filing 305 RESPONSE to Motion re #300 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by JOHN O'DONNELL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DONATELLI, GUY)
July 12, 2023 Filing 304 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD ADDITIONAL MATERIALS TO SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBITS, #2 COVER SHEET)(sg)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER THAT upon consideration of Plaintiff John Ryan Millers Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Complaint (Doc. No. 300) it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall submit responses to the motion by July 18, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 7/11/2023. 7/11/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
July 11, 2023 Filing 302 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JOHN O'DONNELL.Brief, Certificate of Service.(DONATELLI, GUY)
July 10, 2023 Filing 301 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DEBRA RYAN.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PULLANO, MICHAEL)
June 23, 2023 Filing 300 MOTION TO FILE LEAVE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(va) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2023: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 10 A, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 23) (va). Modified on 6/26/2023 (va).
June 23, 2023 Filing 299 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (va) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2023: #2 Exhibits) (va). Modified on 6/26/2023 (va).
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER GRANTING #296 #297 MOTIONS TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. THE COURTS MAY 24, 2023 ORDER (DOC. NO. 290) SCHEDULING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR JUNE 21, 2023, AT 10:30 A.M., IS VACATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/15/23. 6/15/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va) Modified on 6/20/2023 (lisad, ).
June 13, 2023 Filing 297 First MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference filed by BRIAN FOX, JOHN O'DONNELL, MICHELLE ORNER, JOHN PROPPER..(CONFAIR, JASON)
June 12, 2023 Filing 296 MOTION FOR RESCHEDULE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER)(jaa, )
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #294 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE. PLAINTIFF MAY REFILE A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING NO LATER THAN JUNE 23, 2023, BUT HE MUST ATTACH THE SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING, DRAFTED IN ITS ENTIRETY, FOR THE COURTS CONSIDERATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/5/23. 6/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
June 5, 2023 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTIONS DUE BY 6/23/2023. (va)
June 2, 2023 Filing 294 MOTION for Leave to Submit a Supplemental Complaint by June 23, 2023, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(va)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO SUBMIT AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #292 ) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY JUNE 23, 2023. DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. #291 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/31/23. 5/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
May 31, 2023 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 6/23/2023. (va)
May 24, 2023 Filing 292 Request for Extension to Submit Amended Complaint, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(va) Modified on 5/25/2023 (lisad, ).
May 24, 2023 Filing 291 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 filed by BRIAN FOX, MICHELLE ORNER, JOHN PROPPER.Brief, Proposed Order, Statement of Undisputed Facts Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56, #2 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Facts)(CONFAIR, JASON)
May 24, 2023 Filing 290 *VACATED PER ORER #298 * ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED IN COURTROOM 16-B OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA, ON WEDNESDAY, JUNE 21, 2023, AT 10:30 A.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: LEAD COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN THE JOINT CONFERENCE CONDUCTED PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(F) AND ATTEND THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. THE COURT SHALL DEEM THE ATTORNEY WHO PARTICIPATES IN THE RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE AND WHO TAKES THE LEAD AT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AS LEAD COUNSEL FOR ALL MATTERS GOING FORWARD IN THE CASE. AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT VIA E-MAIL, IN THE FORM ATTACHED HERETO, A JOINT REPORT OF THE CONFERENCE THAT THEY CONDUCT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(F). THE PARTIES SHALL EXCHANGE INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(1) AT LEAST ONE (1) BUSINESS DAY IN ADVANCE OF THE RULE 16 ONFERENCE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/24/23. 5/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va) Modified on 6/20/2023 (lisad, ).
May 22, 2023 Filing 289 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Affirmative Defenses by JOHN O'DONNELL.(DONATELLI, GUY)
May 22, 2023 Filing 288 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by DEBRA RYAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAMPHERSTEIN, JOSEPH)
May 19, 2023 Filing 287 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, and Affirmative Offenses by by BRIAN FOX, MICHELLE ORNER, JOHN PROPPER.(CONFAIR, JASON)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT RYANS MOTION (DOC. NO. #177 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFF HAS STATED A CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT RYAN IN COUNT V. COUNTS I, II, III, IV, VI, VII ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT RYAN. COUNTS VIII AND IX ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT RYAN. DEFENDANTS GOGGIN, ODONNELL, SASSA, AND DOUGHERTYS MOTION (DOC. NO. #204 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFF HAS STATED A CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT ODONNELL, ONLY, IN COUNT V. COUNT V IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS GOGGIN, SASSA, AND DOUGHERTY. COUNTS I, II, III, IV, VI, VII ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS ODONNELL, GOGGIN, SASSA, AND DOUGHERTY. COUNTS VIII AND IX ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS ODONNELL, GOGGIN, SASSA, AND DOUGHERTY. DEFENDANTS BOWMAN, FOX, GANOW, HURLEY, KOENNECKER, NORRIS, ZIMMERMAN, YELOVICH, PROPPER, ORNER, HARDY, AND CURTISS MOTION (DOC. NO. 215) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFF HAS STATED A CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOX, PROPPER, AND ORNER IN COUNT I AND COUNT II. COUNT I AND COUNT II ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BOWMAN, GANOW, HURLEY, KOENNECKER, NORRIS, ZIMMERMAN, YELOVICH, HARDY, AND CURTIS. COUNT V IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS FOX, PROPPER, AND ORNER. COUNT V IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BOWMAN, GANOW, HURLEY, KOENNECKER, NORRIS, ZIMMERMAN, YELOVICH, HARDY, AND CURTIS. COUNTS III, IV, VI, VII ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BOWMAN, FOX, GANOW, HURLEY, KOENNECKER, NORRIS, ZIMMERMAN, YELOVICH, PROPPER, ORNER, HARDY, AND CURTIS. COUNTS VIII, IX, AND X ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BOWMAN, FOX, GANOW, HURLEY, KOENNECKER, NORRIS, ZIMMERMAN, YELOVICH, PROPPER, ORNER, HARDY, AND CURTIS. DEFENDANTS RYAN, ODONNELL, FOX, PROPPER, AND ORNER SHALL ANSWER PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY MAY 19, 2023. PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY JUNE 2, 2023.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/5/23. 5/5/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
May 5, 2023 Filing 285 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/5/23. 5/5/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER GRANTING #206 #281 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/4/23. 5/4/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
May 4, 2023 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/4/23. 5/4/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANT GERALD BONMER'S MOTION TO DISMISS BY 5/3/23, OR THE COURT WILL GRANT THE MOTION AS UNCONTESTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/28/23. 4/28/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
April 11, 2023 Filing 281 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by GERALD BOOMER.Memorandum of Law In Support, Certificate of Service.(SHAH, MANSI)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER THAT For the above-stated reasons, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), the Court finds that Plaintiff has not shown good cause as to why service was not made within 90 days of the day of the filing of the Complaint. Plaintiffs request for another opportunity to serve Defendants (Doc. No. 276) is DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 4/6/2023. 4/6/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER that upon consideration of the following motions herein, and pro se Plaintiff John Ryan Millers responses in opposition (Doc. Nos. 171, 175, 230, 248, 250), it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED, and the herein-named defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/31/2023. 3/31/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
March 31, 2023 Filing 278 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/31/2023. 3/31/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
February 27, 2023 Filing 277 RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ORDER DOC 274, by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER) (sg)
February 27, 2023 Filing 276 RESPONSE TO ORDER DOC 273, by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER) (sg)
February 22, 2023 Filing 275 RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS THOMAS GOGGIN, JOHNODONNELL, DAVID SASSA AND ROBERTY DOUGHERTY, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (sg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2023: #1 COVER LETTER) (sg).
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER THAT Plaintiff must serve the Attorney General of the United States, and file proof of service on the docket, by March 8, 2023.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/22/2023. 2/23/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDERED that the matter is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as to the following defendants:Matt Williams, Sanjay Bridges and John Frye.If, within ten (10) days, good cause can be shown why service was not made within ninety (90) days of the date of the filing of the Complaint, the dismissal will be vacated. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/22/2023. 2/22/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDERED that:1. Paragraph 3 of the Courts February 8, 2023 Order (Doc. No. 255), setting Defendant Bonmers deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint as February 22, 2023, is VACATED.2. Defendant Bonmer shall respond to Plaintiffs Complaint no later than April 17, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/16/2023. 2/17/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
February 13, 2023 Filing 271 REPLY IN BRIEF IN DENIAL OF COUNSEL REQUEST OF MOTION TO DISMISS(DOCUMENT No. 253) ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS BOWMAN, CURTIS, FOX,GANOW, HARDY, HURLEY, KOENNECKER, NORRIS, ORNER, PROPPER, YELOVICHAND ZIMMERMAN, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER)(sg)
February 10, 2023 Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of LEE BENSON, YVETTE JOHNSON, JENNIFER KELLER with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 269 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of BRENDA M. BERNOT with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of SHANE CLARK with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of MATTHEW DELCHERT, ANN GERY with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of RICHARD FINFROCK with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of MATTHEW GORDON with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of MICHAEL HAWLEY with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of JEFF KIMES with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of JOSEPH HEYMAN, MICHELLE MAJOR with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of LOUIS MARCELLI with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of THOMAS NELLING with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Rintoul on behalf of RYAN WHITE with Certificate of Service(Rintoul, Douglas)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS ROBERT DOUGHERTY, THOMAS GOGGIN, JOHN ODONNELL AND DAVID SASSAS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #204 ) AND DEFENDANTS ERIN BURLEW, KEVIN KOCHKA, MELISSA LAUGHLIN, ANDREW LOVETTE, SHARON MAITLAND, WILLIAM ROZIER, RAYMOND STEVENSON, AND RACHEL ZELTMANS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #206 ) BY FEBRUARY 16, 20231 OR THE COURT WILL GRANT THE MOTIONS AS UNOPPOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/9/23. 2/9/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
February 9, 2023 Filing 256 NOTICE THAT THE COURT ADVISES PLAINTIFF THAT IT CANNOT GIVE HIM LEGAL ADVICE REGARDING THE FORM OF HIS RESPONSES AND EXHIBITS. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/9/23. 2/9/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va) Modified on 2/10/2023 (lisad, ).
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (DOC. NO. #209 ) IS DENIED. DEFENDANT SHALL CONFER WITH PLAINTIFF REGARDING SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT AND WHETHER THE UNITED STATES WILL CONTINUE TO REPRESENT DEFENDANT BONMER. THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT STATUS UPDATE TO THE COURT BY FEBRUARY 15, 2023. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. #1 ) NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 22, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/8/23. 2/9/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
February 8, 2023 Filing 254 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/8/23. 2/9/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
February 8, 2023 Filing 253 RESPONSE in Support re #215 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1), and 12 (b)(6) filed by LISA BOWMAN, JEFF CURTIS, BRIAN FOX, SAM GANOW, JILL HARDY, MATT HURLEY, CHARLIE KOENNECKER, BRIAN NORRIS, MICHELLE ORNER, JOHN PROPPER, LISA YELOVICH, JARED ZIMMERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
February 7, 2023 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of LISA BOWMAN, JEFF CURTIS, BRIAN FOX, SAM GANOW, JILL HARDY, MATT HURLEY, CHARLIE KOENNECKER, BRIAN NORRIS, MICHELLE ORNER, JOHN PROPPER, LISA YELOVICH, JARED ZIMMERMAN with Certificate of Service(CONFAIR, JASON)
February 5, 2023 Filing 251 RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 8, 12(B)(1) AND 12(B)(6) FOR DEFENDANTS filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 COVER LETTER)(jaa, )
January 31, 2023 Filing 250 RESPONSE to MOTION TO DISMISS for Defendants Dixie Stranchik filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Sheet)(nd)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DIXIE STRACHNIK'S MOTION TO DISMISS BY 1/30/23 OR THE COURT WILL GRANT THE MOTION AS UNOPPOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/26/23. 1/26/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
January 25, 2023 Filing 248 RESPONSE to MOTIONS TO DISMISS, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Page) (va) (Main Document 248 replaced on 1/26/2023) (va). (CASE NUMBER "2:22-cv-00329-KSM" IS INCORRECT.) Modified on 1/26/2023 (va).
January 19, 2023 Filing 247 RESPONSE in Support re #181 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MICHAEL CARROLL, ROBERT CLARKE, JOSEPH ELIAS, JEASSICA HARPER, TRACEY LAWS, KEVIN PIERCE, MITCHELL ROCK, BRIAN SHELLER. (KROLL, ROLF)
January 16, 2023 Filing 246 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of LEE BENSON, BRENDA M. BERNOT, SHANE CLARK, MATTHEW DELCHERT, RICHARD FINFROCK, ANN GERY, MATTHEW GORDON, MICHAEL HAWLEY, JOSEPH HEYMAN, YVETTE JOHNSON, JENNIFER KELLER, JEFF KIMES, MICHELLE MAJOR, LOUIS MARCELLI, THOMAS NELLING, THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL, RYAN WHITE(Murray, D. Addison)
January 11, 2023 Filing 245 RESPONSE in Support re #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ERIC HUGHES. (MONAHAN, JOSEPH)
January 11, 2023 Filing 244 REPLY to Response to Motion re #201 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Plaintiff's Complaint filed by BRENDA M. BERNOT. (BROWN, SHERYL)
January 11, 2023 Filing 243 REPLY to Response to Motion re #202 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MATTHEW DELCHERT, ANN GERY. (BROWN, SHERYL)
January 11, 2023 Filing 242 REPLY to Response to Motion re #203 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JOSEPH HEYMAN, MICHELLE MAJOR. (BROWN, SHERYL)
January 11, 2023 Filing 241 REPLY to Response to Motion re #194 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by LEE BENSON, JENNIFER KELLER. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
January 11, 2023 Filing 240 REPLY to Response to Motion re #197 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by LOUIS MARCELLI. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
January 11, 2023 Filing 239 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MATTHEW GORDON. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
January 11, 2023 Filing 238 REPLY to Response to Motion re #193 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by YVETTE JOHNSON. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
January 11, 2023 Filing 237 REPLY to Response to Motion re #195 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
January 11, 2023 Filing 236 REPLY to Response to Motion re #196 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JEFF KIMES. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
January 11, 2023 Filing 235 REPLY to Response to Motion re #198 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by RICHARD FINFROCK. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
January 11, 2023 Filing 234 REPLY to Response to Motion re #199 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by THOMAS NELLING. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
January 11, 2023 Filing 233 REPLY to Response to Motion re #189 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SHANE CLARK. (BROWN, SHERYL)
January 11, 2023 Filing 232 REPLY to Response to Motion re #188 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by RYAN WHITE. (BROWN, SHERYL)
January 11, 2023 Filing 231 REPLY to Response to Motion re #187 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MICHAEL HAWLEY. (BROWN, SHERYL)
January 5, 2023 Filing 230 RESPONSE to Motion re #215 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (sg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2023: #1 COVER LETTER) (sg).
January 5, 2023 Filing 229 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS, by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER)(sg)
January 3, 2023 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Support re #209 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) filed by GERALD BOOMER. (SHAH, MANSI)
December 30, 2022 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW J. BELLWOAR on behalf of JOHN FRYE (BELLWOAR, ANDREW) Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 226 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by JARED ZIMMERMAN.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 225 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by LISA YELOVICH.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 224 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by JOHN PROPPER.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 223 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by MICHELLE ORNER.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 222 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by BRIAN NORRIS.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 221 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by CHARLIE KOENNECKER.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 220 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by MATT HURLEY.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 219 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by JILL HARDY.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 218 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by SAM GANOW.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 217 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by BRIAN FOX.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 216 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8,12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by JEFF CURTIS.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) *DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. #215 * Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 29, 2022 Filing 215 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) filed by LISA BOWMAN, JEFF CURTIS, BRIAN FOX, SAM GANOW, JILL HARDY, MATT HURLEY, CHARLIE KOENNECKER, BRIAN NORRIS, MICHELLE ORNER, JOHN PROPPER, LISA YELOVICH, JARED ZIMMERMAN.Brief, Proposed Order, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON) Modified on 1/3/2023 (lisad, ).
December 23, 2022 Filing 214 EXHIBITS by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT, #2 EMAIL)(sg)
December 23, 2022 Filing 213 RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT DOCUMENT 209, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT, #2 EXHIBIT, #3 EMAIL)(sg)
December 22, 2022 Filing 212 NOTICE by DELORES D'AMORE, MARY FRIEDBERG, FRANK GALBRAITH re #166 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Table of Contents & Table of Authorities for Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Conplaint (MUSIAL, JAMES)
December 15, 2022 Filing 211 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ROBERT LACOURT.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(KOVATIS, STEPHEN)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO #209 MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT BY 12/27/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 12/12/22. 12/12/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
December 9, 2022 Filing 209 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) filed by GERALD BOOMER.Certificate of Counsel.(SHAH, MANSI)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER THAT upon consideration of Plaintiffs Request for Relief in Motion to Dismiss Responses (Doc. No. 190), it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for an extension is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to any motion filed on or before December 5, 2022 by January 5, 2023. For any motion filed after December 5, 2022, Plaintiff shall respond no later than February 3, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 12/7/2022.12/7/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
December 7, 2022 Filing 207 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOHN J. STANZIONE on behalf of ROBERT DOUGHERTY, THOMAS GOGGIN, JOHN O'DONNELL, DAVID SASSA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STANZIONE, JOHN)
December 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #177 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Proposed Order, #189 MOTION to Dismiss , #195 MOTION to Dismiss , #196 MOTION to Dismiss , #182 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #206 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #147 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #187 MOTION to Dismiss , #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #202 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #186 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #169 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #141 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiff's Complaint, #180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW ISO AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, #181 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #197 MOTION to Dismiss , #204 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #199 MOTION to Dismiss , #194 MOTION to Dismiss , #185 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #203 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #184 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #168 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #166 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #178 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #193 MOTION to Dismiss , #188 MOTION to Dismiss , #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #201 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #192 MOTION to Dismiss , #198 MOTION to Dismiss , #200 MOTION to Dismiss , #108 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #179 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . RESPONSES DUE BY 1/5/2023. (sg)
December 6, 2022 Filing 206 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ERIN BURLEW, KEVIN KOCHKA, MELLISSA LAUGHLIN, ANDREW LOVETTE, SHAREN MAITTLAND, WILLIAM ROZIER, RAYMOND STEVENSON, RACHEL ZELTMAN.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KOVATIS, STEPHEN)
December 6, 2022 Filing 205 Praecipe to Substitute Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by RYAN WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BROWN, SHERYL) Modified on 12/7/2022 (lisad, ).
December 6, 2022 Filing 204 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ROBERT DOUGHERTY, THOMAS GOGGIN, JOHN O'DONNELL, DAVID SASSA.Brief and Certificate of Service.(STANZIONE, JOHN)
December 6, 2022 Filing 203 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JOSEPH HEYMAN, MICHELLE MAJOR.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BROWN, SHERYL)
December 6, 2022 Filing 202 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MATTHEW DELCHERT, ANN GERY.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BROWN, SHERYL)
December 6, 2022 Filing 201 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by BRENDA M. BERNOT.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BROWN, SHERYL)
December 6, 2022 Filing 200 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BRIAN MARSHALL, DANIELLE WADE.Proposed Order, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service and Brief in Support. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(AMBROSE, TRICIA)
December 6, 2022 Filing 199 MOTION to Dismiss filed by THOMAS NELLING.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
December 6, 2022 Filing 198 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RICHARD FINFROCK.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
December 6, 2022 Filing 197 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LOUIS MARCELLI.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
December 6, 2022 Filing 196 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JEFF KIMES.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
December 6, 2022 Filing 195 MOTION to Dismiss filed by THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
December 6, 2022 Filing 194 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LEE BENSON, JENNIFER KELLER.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
December 6, 2022 Filing 193 MOTION to Dismiss filed by YVETTE JOHNSON.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
December 6, 2022 Filing 192 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MATTHEW GORDON.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
December 5, 2022 Filing 191 ADDENDUM TO COMPLAINT, by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 addendum, #2 EXHIBITS, #3 EMAIL)(sg)
December 5, 2022 Filing 190 PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR RELIEF IN MOTION TO DISMISS RESPONSES, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)
December 5, 2022 Filing 189 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHANE CLARK.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(BROWN, SHERYL)
December 5, 2022 Filing 188 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RYAN WHITE.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(BROWN, SHERYL)
December 5, 2022 Filing 187 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MICHAEL HAWLEY.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support)(BROWN, SHERYL)
December 5, 2022 Filing 186 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SCOTT ALEXANDER.Brief, Certificate of Service.(FREED, MARK)
December 5, 2022 Filing 185 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CALVIN WILSON.Brief, Attorney Certification, Certificate of Service.(CUMMINS, NICHOLAS)
December 5, 2022 Filing 184 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MARIA AVALA, SAMUEL IACONO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GONZALES, JOHN)
December 5, 2022 Filing 183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LISA TARASCHI.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MOTT, TYSON)
December 5, 2022 Filing 182 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DIANE MOORE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GONZALES, JOHN)
December 2, 2022 Filing 181 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MICHAEL CARROLL, ROBERT CLARKE, JOSEPH ELIAS, JEASSICA HARPER, TRACEY LAWS, KEVIN PIERCE, MITCHELL ROCK, BRIAN SHELLER.Brief, Certificate of Service.(KROLL, ROLF)
December 2, 2022 Filing 180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW ISO AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by WILLIAM HOLDSWORTH.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service)(SHERR, ANTHONY)
December 1, 2022 Filing 179 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MARC PARTEE.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Motion to Dismiss, #3 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Certificate of Service Brief in Support)(NORFLEET, ANDREW)
November 30, 2022 Filing 178 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MIKE BEATY, TIMOTHY BROWN, JOHN DEMARCO, JOE MILES, WILLIAM MOSSMAN, CHIEF SIMPSON, MICHAEL SWININGER, CHRIS YEAGER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
November 28, 2022 Filing 177 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Proposed Order filed by DEBRA RYAN.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(KAMPHERSTEIN, JOSEPH)
November 22, 2022 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by MANSI SHAH on behalf of GERALD BOOMER with Certificate of Service(SHAH, MANSI)
November 21, 2022 Filing 175 RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT JACK LAUFER, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)
November 21, 2022 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of MATTHEW GORDON with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
November 21, 2022 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. RONGAUS on behalf of MATTHEW GORDON with Certificate of Service(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
November 18, 2022 Filing 172 EXHIBITS by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)
November 18, 2022 Filing 171 RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT BENJAMIN PRATT, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)
November 18, 2022 Filing 170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ERIC HUGHES.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(MONAHAN, JOSEPH)
November 18, 2022 Filing 169 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JAMES MOREHEAD.Memorandum and Certificate of Service/Notice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MUNION, CHRISTINE)
November 18, 2022 Filing 168 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GEORGENE D'CARBO, HOWARD HOLLAND.Memorandum and Certificate of Service/Notice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MUNION, CHRISTINE)
November 18, 2022 Filing 167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TIMOTHY PARKER.Memorandum and Certificate of Service/Notice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MUNION, CHRISTINE)
November 17, 2022 Filing 166 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by DELORES D'AMORE, MARY FRIEDBERG, FRANK GALBRAITH.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MUSIAL, JAMES)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER THAT upon consideration of Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. 163), it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion is DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/16/2022. 11/16/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
November 15, 2022 Filing 164 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ANTHONY R. SHERR on behalf of MATTHEW GORDON (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SHERR, ANTHONY)
November 15, 2022 Filing 162 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAMUEL IACONO. SAMUEL IACONO waiver sent on 11/7/2022, answer due 1/6/2023. (GONZALES, JOHN)
November 15, 2022 Filing 161 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARIA AVALA. MARIA AVALA waiver sent on 11/7/2022, answer due 1/6/2023. (GONZALES, JOHN)
November 15, 2022 Filing 159 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MATTHEW GORDON, WILLIAM HOLDSWORTH. MATTHEW GORDON waiver sent on 11/7/2022, answer due 1/6/2023; WILLIAM HOLDSWORTH waiver sent on 11/7/2022, answer due 1/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SHERR, ANTHONY)
November 14, 2022 Filing 163 Complaint and Request for Injunction filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg) Modified on 11/16/2022 (lisad, ).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING #155 MOTION FOR TRO AND #156 MOTION TO ADD DEFENDANTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/14/22. 11/15/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
November 14, 2022 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY R. SHERR on behalf of MATTHEW GORDON, WILLIAM HOLDSWORTH with JURY DEMAND and CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(SHERR, ANTHONY)
November 14, 2022 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by TYSON MATTHEW MOTT on behalf of MARIA AVALA, SAMUEL IACONO with Certificate of Service(MOTT, TYSON)
November 10, 2022 Filing 156 MOTION TO ADD DEFENDANTS, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)
November 10, 2022 Filing 155 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)
November 10, 2022 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GONZALES on behalf of MARIA AVALA, SAMUEL IACONO with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(GONZALES, JOHN)
November 10, 2022 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GONZALES on behalf of DIANE MOORE with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(GONZALES, JOHN)
November 9, 2022 Filing 152 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIC HUGHES. ERIC HUGHES waiver sent on 11/2/2022, answer due 1/1/2023. (MONAHAN, JOSEPH)
November 9, 2022 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER NEMIROFF on behalf of ERIC HUGHES with Certificate of Service(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
November 9, 2022 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH COLEMAN MONAHAN on behalf of ERIC HUGHES with Certificate of Service(MONAHAN, JOSEPH)
November 9, 2022 Filing 149 EXHIBITS by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBITS, #2 EXHIBITS, #3 EMAIL)(sg)
November 8, 2022 Filing 148 NOTICE OF DEFANDANTS DENIAL TO FILE WAIVER OF SERVICE/ NOTICE TO APPEAR, by JOHN RYAN MILLER (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)
November 7, 2022 Filing 147 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JACK LAUFER.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(SALZER, WILLIAM)
November 7, 2022 Filing 146 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MELLISSA LAUGHLIN, RACHEL ZELTMAN, ERIN BURLEW, SHAREN MAITTLAND, ANDREW LOVETTE, KEVIN KOCHKA, WILLIAM ROZIER. MELLISSA LAUGHLIN waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022; RACHEL ZELTMAN waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022; ERIN BURLEW waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022; SHAREN MAITTLAND waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022; ANDREW LOVETTE waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022; KEVIN KOCHKA waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022; WILLIAM ROZIER waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (KOVATIS, STEPHEN)
November 7, 2022 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. KOVATIS on behalf of ERIN BURLEW, KEVIN KOCHKA, MELLISSA LAUGHLIN, ANDREW LOVETTE, SHAREN MAITTLAND, WILLIAM ROZIER, RACHEL ZELTMAN with Certificate of Service(KOVATIS, STEPHEN)
November 4, 2022 Filing 144 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CALVIN WILSON. (Lengeman, Daniel)
November 4, 2022 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Lengeman on behalf of CALVIN WILSON (Lengeman, Daniel)
November 4, 2022 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS A. CUMMINS on behalf of CALVIN WILSON (CUMMINS, NICHOLAS)
November 4, 2022 Filing 141 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by DIXIE STRACHNIK.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(MCDONOUGH, SUZANNE)
November 3, 2022 Filing 140 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LISA TARASCHI. LISA TARASCHI waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (MOTT, TYSON)
November 3, 2022 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by TYSON MATTHEW MOTT on behalf of LISA TARASCHI with Certificate of Service(MOTT, TYSON)
November 3, 2022 Filing 138 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRENDA M. BERNOT. BRENDA M. BERNOT waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, SHERYL)
November 3, 2022 Filing 137 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANE CLARK. SHANE CLARK waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, SHERYL)
November 3, 2022 Filing 136 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RYAN WHITE. RYAN WHITE waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, SHERYL)
November 3, 2022 Filing 135 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANN GERY. ANN GERY waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, SHERYL)
November 3, 2022 Filing 134 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MATTHEW DELCHERT. MATTHEW DELCHERT waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, SHERYL)
November 3, 2022 Filing 133 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHELLE MAJOR. MICHELLE MAJOR waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, SHERYL)
November 3, 2022 Filing 132 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH HEYMAN. JOSEPH HEYMAN waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BROWN, SHERYL)
November 3, 2022 Filing 131 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by YVETTE JOHNSON. YVETTE JOHNSON waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
November 3, 2022 Filing 130 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JENNIFER KELLER. JENNIFER KELLER waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
November 3, 2022 Filing 129 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL HAWLEY. MICHAEL HAWLEY waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (BROWN, SHERYL)
November 3, 2022 Filing 128 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEE BENSON. LEE BENSON waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
November 3, 2022 Filing 127 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL. THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
November 3, 2022 Filing 126 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEFF KIMES. JEFF KIMES waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
November 3, 2022 Filing 125 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LOUIS MARCELLI. LOUIS MARCELLI waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
November 3, 2022 Filing 124 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD FINFROCK. RICHARD FINFROCK waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
November 3, 2022 Filing 123 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS NELLING. THOMAS NELLING waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
November 2, 2022 Filing 122 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MATT HURLEY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 121 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRIAN FOX. BRIAN FOX waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 120 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRIAN NORRIS. BRIAN NORRIS waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 119 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLIE KOENNECKER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 118 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JARED ZIMMERMAN. JARED ZIMMERMAN waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 117 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEFF CURTIS. JEFF CURTIS waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 116 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JILL HARDY. JILL HARDY waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 115 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN PROPPER. JOHN PROPPER waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 114 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LISA BOWMAN. LISA BOWMAN waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 113 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LISA YELOVICH. LISA YELOVICH waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 112 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHELLE ORNER. MICHELLE ORNER waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 111 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAM GANOW. SAM GANOW waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 110 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MATT HURLEY. MATT HURLEY waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 109 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLIE KOENNECKER. CHARLIE KOENNECKER waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 2, 2022 Filing 108 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by BENJAMIN PRATT.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant Benjamin L. Pratt's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
November 1, 2022 Filing 107 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID SASSA. DAVID SASSA waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (DONATELLI, GUY)
November 1, 2022 Filing 106 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN O'DONNELL. JOHN O'DONNELL waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (DONATELLI, GUY)
November 1, 2022 Filing 105 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS GOGGIN. THOMAS GOGGIN waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (DONATELLI, GUY)
November 1, 2022 Filing 104 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT DOUGHERTY. ROBERT DOUGHERTY waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (DONATELLI, GUY)
November 1, 2022 Filing 103 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DIXIE STRACHNIK. DIXIE STRACHNIK waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (MCDONOUGH, SUZANNE)
November 1, 2022 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by SUZANNE MCDONOUGH on behalf of DIXIE STRACHNIK with jury demand, certificate of service(MCDONOUGH, SUZANNE)
October 31, 2022 Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MITCHELL ROCK. MITCHELL ROCK waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (KROLL, ROLF)
October 31, 2022 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRACEY LAWS. TRACEY LAWS waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (KROLL, ROLF)
October 31, 2022 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSEPH ELIAS. JOSEPH ELIAS waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (KROLL, ROLF)
October 31, 2022 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by ROLF E. KROLL on behalf of JOSEPH ELIAS, TRACEY LAWS, MITCHELL ROCK with Certificate of Service(KROLL, ROLF)
October 31, 2022 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT CLARKE. ROBERT CLARKE waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (KROLL, ROLF)
October 31, 2022 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by ROLF E. KROLL on behalf of ROBERT CLARKE with Certificate of Service(KROLL, ROLF)
October 28, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of JARED ZIMMERMAN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of LISA YELOVICH (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of BRIAN NORRIS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of JOHN PROPPER (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of BENJAMIN PRATT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of MICHELLE ORNER (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of CHARLIE KOENNECKER (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of MATT HURLEY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of JILL HARDY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of SAM GANOW (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of BRIAN FOX (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of LISA BOWMAN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON CONFAIR on behalf of JEFF CURTIS (CONFAIR, JASON)
October 28, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH F. KAMPHERSTEIN, III on behalf of DEBRA RYAN with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(KAMPHERSTEIN, JOSEPH)
October 28, 2022 Filing 81 Communication regarding Digital Service of Federal Complaint. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)
October 28, 2022 Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEBRA RYAN. DEBRA RYAN waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (PULLANO, MICHAEL)
October 28, 2022 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL B. PULLANO on behalf of DEBRA RYAN with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(PULLANO, MICHAEL)
October 28, 2022 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARC PARTEE. MARC PARTEE waiver sent on 10/4/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (LAVERY, FRANK)
October 28, 2022 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK J. LAVERY, JR on behalf of MARC PARTEE with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(LAVERY, FRANK)
October 28, 2022 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW W. NORFLEET on behalf of MARC PARTEE with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(NORFLEET, ANDREW)
October 26, 2022 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOWARD HOLLAND, GEORGENE D'CARBO. HOWARD HOLLAND waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022; GEORGENE D'CARBO waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (MUNION, CHRISTINE)
October 26, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. MUNION on behalf of GEORGENE D'CARBO, HOWARD HOLLAND with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MUNION, CHRISTINE)
October 26, 2022 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIMOTHY PARKER. TIMOTHY PARKER waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (MUNION, CHRISTINE)
October 26, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. MUNION on behalf of TIMOTHY PARKER with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MUNION, CHRISTINE)
October 26, 2022 Filing 71 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCOTT ALEXANDER. SCOTT ALEXANDER waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (FREED, MARK)
October 25, 2022 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES MOREHEAD. JAMES MOREHEAD waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (MUNION, CHRISTINE)
October 25, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. MUNION on behalf of JAMES MOREHEAD with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MUNION, CHRISTINE)
October 25, 2022 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KEVIN PIERCE. KEVIN PIERCE waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (KROLL, ROLF)
October 25, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by ROLF E. KROLL on behalf of MICHAEL CARROLL, JEASSICA HARPER, KEVIN PIERCE. (KROLL, ROLF) Modified on 10/26/2022 (lisad, ).
October 24, 2022 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRENDA M. BERNOT, SHANE CLARK, MATTHEW DELCHERT, ANN GERY, MICHAEL HAWLEY, JOSEPH HEYMAN, MICHELLE MAJOR, RYAN WHITE re #19 Notice of Appearance, #23 Notice of Appearance, #24 Notice of Appearance, #22 Notice of Appearance, #17 Notice of Appearance, #21 Notice of Appearance CORRECTED (BROWN, SHERYL)
October 24, 2022 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LEE BENSON, BRENDA M. BERNOT, SHANE CLARK, MATTHEW DELCHERT, RICHARD FINFROCK, ANN GERY, MICHAEL HAWLEY, JOSEPH HEYMAN, YVETTE JOHNSON, JENNIFER KELLER, JEFF KIMES, MICHELLE MAJOR, LOUIS MARCELLI, THOMAS NELLING, THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL, RYAN WHITE re #32 Notice of Appearance, #39 Notice of Appearance, #43 Notice of Appearance, #40 Notice of Appearance, #35 Notice of Appearance, #34 Notice of Appearance, #31 Notice of Appearance, #42 Notice of Appearance, #36 Notice of Appearance, #33 Notice of Appearance, #37 Notice of Appearance, #38 Notice of Appearance, #41 Notice of Appearance CORRECTED (Murray, D. Addison)
October 24, 2022 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LEE BENSON, RICHARD FINFROCK, YVETTE JOHNSON, JENNIFER KELLER, JEFF KIMES, LOUIS MARCELLI, THOMAS NELLING, THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL re #30 Notice of Appearance, #29 Notice of Appearance, #28 Notice of Appearance, #27 Notice of Appearance, #26 Notice of Appearance, #25 Notice of Appearance CORRECTED (RONGAUS, ANDREW)
October 24, 2022 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JACK LAUFER. JACK LAUFER waiver sent on 10/11/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (SALZER, WILLIAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. SALZER on behalf of JACK LAUFER with Certificate of Service(SALZER, WILLIAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by TRICIA M. AMBROSE on behalf of BRIAN MARSHALL, DANIELLE WADE with Certificate of Service(AMBROSE, TRICIA)
October 22, 2022 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEASSICA HARPER. JEASSICA HARPER waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (KROLL, ROLF)
October 22, 2022 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL CARROLL. MICHAEL CARROLL waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (KROLL, ROLF)
October 22, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by ROLF E. KROLL on behalf of MICHAEL CARROLL, JEASSICA HARPER with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(KROLL, ROLF)
October 21, 2022 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DELORES D'AMORE, MARY FRIEDBERG, FRANK GALBRAITH -CORRECTED (LEVIN, JULIA)
October 21, 2022 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DELORES D'AMORE, MARY FRIEDBERG, FRANK GALBRAITH - CORRECTED (LEVIN, MICHAEL)
October 21, 2022 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DELORES D'AMORE, MARY FRIEDBERG, FRANK GALBRAITH re #52 Notice of Appearance -CORRECTED (MUSIAL, JAMES)
October 21, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL I. LEVIN on behalf of DELORES D'AMORE, MARY FRIEDBERG, FRANK GALBRAITH with Certificate of Service(LEVIN, MICHAEL)
October 21, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA A. LEVIN on behalf of DELORES D'AMORE, MARY FRIEDBERG, FRANK GALBRAITH with Certificate of Service(LEVIN, JULIA)
October 21, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. MUSIAL on behalf of DELORES D'AMORE, MARY FRIEDBERG, FRANK GALBRAITH with Certificate of Service(MUSIAL, JAMES)
October 20, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by GUY A. DONATELLI on behalf of ROBERT DOUGHERTY, THOMAS GOGGIN, JOHN O'DONNELL, DAVID SASSA with Certificate of Service(DONATELLI, GUY)
October 20, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK L. FREED on behalf of SCOTT ALEXANDER with Certificate of Service(FREED, MARK)
October 19, 2022 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRIAN SHELLER. BRIAN SHELLER waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (KROLL, ROLF)
October 19, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by ROLF E. KROLL on behalf of BRIAN SHELLER with Jury Demand(KROLL, ROLF)
October 18, 2022 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DANIELLE WADE. DANIELLE WADE waiver sent on 10/18/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
October 18, 2022 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRIAN MARSHALL. BRIAN MARSHALL waiver sent on 10/18/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
October 18, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of BRIAN MARSHALL, DANIELLE WADE with certificate of service(MACMAIN, DAVID)
October 14, 2022 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DIANE MOORE. DIANE MOORE waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (LADOW, KATHERINE)
October 14, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of RYAN WHITE with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of THOMAS NELLING with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of LOUIS MARCELLI with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of MICHELLE MAJOR with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of JOSEPH HEYMAN with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of JEFF KIMES with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of MICHAEL HAWLEY with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of RICHARD FINFROCK with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of MATTHEW DELCHERT, ANN GERY with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of SHANE CLARK with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of BRENDA M. BERNOT with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of LEE BENSON, YVETTE JOHNSON, JENNIFER KELLER with Certificate of Service(Murray, D. Addison)
October 14, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. RONGAUS on behalf of THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL with Certificate of Service(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
October 14, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. RONGAUS on behalf of THOMAS NELLING with Certificate of Service(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
October 14, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. RONGAUS on behalf of LOUIS MARCELLI with Certificate of Service(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
October 14, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. RONGAUS on behalf of JEFF KIMES with Certificate of Service(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
October 14, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. RONGAUS on behalf of RICHARD FINFROCK with Certificate of Service(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
October 14, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. RONGAUS on behalf of LEE BENSON, YVETTE JOHNSON, JENNIFER KELLER with Certificate of Service(RONGAUS, ANDREW)
October 14, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERYL LYNN BROWN on behalf of MATTHEW DELCHERT, ANN GERY with Certificate of Service(BROWN, SHERYL)
October 14, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERYL LYNN BROWN on behalf of RYAN WHITE with Certificate of Service(BROWN, SHERYL)
October 14, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERYL LYNN BROWN on behalf of JOSEPH HEYMAN, MICHELLE MAJOR with Certificate of Service(BROWN, SHERYL)
October 14, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERYL LYNN BROWN on behalf of MICHAEL HAWLEY with Certificate of Service(BROWN, SHERYL)
October 14, 2022 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN DEMARCO. JOHN DEMARCO waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 14, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERYL LYNN BROWN on behalf of SHANE CLARK with Certificate of Service(BROWN, SHERYL)
October 14, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHIEF SIMPSON. CHIEF SIMPSON waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERYL LYNN BROWN on behalf of BRENDA M. BERNOT with Certificate of Service(BROWN, SHERYL)
October 14, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRIS YEAGER. CHRIS YEAGER waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 14, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL SWININGER. MICHAEL SWININGER waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 14, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOE MILES. JOE MILES waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 14, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM MOSSMAN. WILLIAM MOSSMAN waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 14, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIMOTHY BROWN. TIMOTHY BROWN waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 14, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MIKE BEATY. MIKE BEATY waiver sent on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE E. LADOW on behalf of DIANE MOORE with Certificate of Service(LADOW, KATHERINE)
October 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR on behalf of MICHAEL SWININGER with Certificate of Service(SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 12, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR on behalf of MIKE BEATY, TIMOTHY BROWN, JOHN DEMARCO, JOE MILES, WILLIAM MOSSMAN, CHIEF SIMPSON, CHRIS YEAGER with Certificate of Service(SANTARONE, JOSEPH)
October 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE CONFIRMATION OF SENDING SUMMONS, by JOHN RYAN MILLER (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Possibility that Plaintiff May Request Extension of Time for Service filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER.. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg) Modified on 9/26/2022 (nd).
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SCOTT ALEXANDER, MARIA AVALA, MIKE BEATY, LEE BENSON, BRENDA M. BERNOT, GERALD BOOMER, LISA BOWMAN, SANJAY BRIDGES, TIMOTHY BROWN, ERIN BURLEW, MICHAEL CARROLL, SHANE CLARK, ROBERT CLARKE, JEFF CURTIS, DELORES D'AMORE, GEORGENE D'CARBO, MATTHEW DELCHERT, JOHN DEMARCO, ROBERT DOUGHERTY, JOSEPH ELIAS, RICHARD FINFROCK, BRIAN FOX, MARY FRIEDBERG, JOHN FRYE, FRANK GALBRAITH, SAM GANOW, ANN GERY, THOMAS GOGGIN, MATTHEW GORDON, JILL HARDY, JEASSICA HARPER, MICHAEL HAWLEY, JOSEPH HEYMAN, WILLIAM HOLDSWORTH, HOWARD HOLLAND, ERIC HUGHES, MATT HURLEY, SAMUEL IACONO, YVETTE JOHNSON, JENNIFER KELLER, JEFF KIMES, KEVIN KOCHKA, CHARLIE KOENNECKER, ROBERT LACOURT, JACK LAUFER, MELLISSA LAUGHLIN, TRACEY LAWS, ANDREW LOVETTE, SHAREN MAITTLAND, MICHELLE MAJOR, LOUIS MARCELLI, BRIAN MARSHALL, JOE MILES, DIANE MOORE, JAMES MOREHEAD, WILLIAM MOSSMAN, THOMAS NELLING, BRIAN NORRIS, JOHN O'DONNELL, MICHELLE ORNER, TIMOTHY PARKER, MARC PARTEE, KEVIN PIERCE, BENJAMIN PRATT, JOHN PROPPER, MITCHELL ROCK, WILLIAM ROZIER, DEBRA RYAN, DAVID SASSA, BRIAN SHELLER, THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL, CHIEF SIMPSON, RAYMOND STEVENSON, DIXIE STRACHNIK, MICHAEL SWININGER, LISA TARASCHI, DANIELLE WADE, RYAN WHITE, MATT WILLIAMS, CALVIN WILSON, CHRIS YEAGER, LISA YELOVICH, RACHEL ZELTMAN, JARED ZIMMERMAN. Forwarded To: Pro Se Plaintiff on 9/8/22. (va)
September 7, 2022 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #3 WITH DECLARATION AND IFP FORMS TO PLAINTIFF ON 9/7/22. (jaa, )
September 6, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 20001783 (sbt)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT MILLER IS DIRECTED TO COMPLETE AND RETURN THE DECLARATION FORM ATTACHED TO THIS ORDER, WITH HIS ORIGINAL SIGNATURE, TO THE COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO CURE THIS DEFICIENCY WITH THE COMPLAINT. 2. IF MILLER SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE IS FURTHER DIRECTED TO, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY $402 (COMPRISING THE $350 FILING FEE AND $52 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. 3. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO MILLER ALONG WITH A COPY OF THE ATTACHED DECLARATION FORM AND NOTE THE MAILING ON THE DOCKET. NO SUMMONS SHALL ISSUE AT THIS TIME AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 9/1/22. 9/2/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCOTT ALEXANDER, MARIA AVALA, MIKE BEATY, LEE BENSON, BRENDA M. BERNOT, GERALD BOOMER, LISA BOWMAN, SANJAY BRIDGES, TIMOTHY BROWN, ERIN BURLEW, MICHAEL CARROLL, SHANE CLARK, ROBERT CLARKE, JEFF CURTIS, DELORES D'AMORE, GEORGENE D'CARBO, MATTHEW DELCHERT, JOHN DEMARCO, ROBERT DOUGHERTY, JOSEPH ELIAS, RICHARD FINFROCK, BRIAN FOX, MARY FRIEDBERG, JOHN FRYE, FRANK GALBRAITH, SAM GANOW, ANN GERY, THOMAS GOGGIN, MATTHEW GORDON, JILL HARDY, JEASSICA HARPER, MICHAEL HAWLEY, JOSEPH HEYMAN, WILLIAM HOLDSWORTH, HOWARD HOLLAND, ERIC HUGHES, MATT HURLEY, SAMUEL IACONO, YVETTE JOHNSON, JENNIFER KELLER, JEFF KIMES, KEVIN KOCHKA, CHARLIE KOENNECKER, ROBERT LACOURT, JACK LAUFER, MELLISSA LAUGHLIN, TRACEY LAWS, ANDREW LOVETTE, SHAREN MAITTLAND, MICHELLE MAJOR, LOUIS MARCELLI, BRIAN MARSHALL, JOE MILES, DIANE MOORE, JAMES MOREHEAD, WILLIAM MOSSMAN, THOMAS NELLING, BRIAN NORRIS, JOHN O'DONNELL, MICHELLE ORNER, TIMOTHY PARKER, MARC PARTEE, KEVIN PIERCE, BENJAMIN PRATT, JOHN PROPPER, MITCHELL ROCK, WILLIAM ROZIER, DEBRA RYAN, DAVID SASSA, BRIAN SHELLER, THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL, CHIEF SIMPSON, RAYMOND STEVENSON, DIXIE STRACHNIK, MICHAEL SWININGER, LISA TARASCHI, DANIELLE WADE, RYAN WHITE, MATT WILLIAMS, CALVIN WILSON, CHRIS YEAGER, LISA YELOVICH, RACHEL ZELTMAN, JARED ZIMMERMAN, filed by JOHN RYAN MILLER.NO IFP, NO FILING FEE. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. GOGGIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN RYAN MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS NELLING
Represented By: ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH ELIAS
Represented By: ROLF E. KROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACEY LAWS
Represented By: ROLF E. KROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHELL ROCK
Represented By: ROLF E. KROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS GOGGIN
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Represented By: JOHN J. STANZIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN O'DONNELL
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Represented By: JOHN J. STANZIONE
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SASSA
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Represented By: JOHN J. STANZIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT DOUGHERTY
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Represented By: JOHN J. STANZIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA RYAN
Represented By: JOSEPH F. KAMPHERSTEIN, III
Represented By: MICHAEL B. PULLANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT LACOURT
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD FINFROCK
Represented By: ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK GALBRAITH
Represented By: JAMES J. MUSIAL
Represented By: JULIA A. LEVIN
Represented By: MICHAEL I. LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY FRIEDBERG
Represented By: MICHAEL I. LEVIN
Represented By: JAMES J. MUSIAL
Represented By: JULIA A. LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELORES D'AMORE
Represented By: MICHAEL I. LEVIN
Represented By: JAMES J. MUSIAL
Represented By: JULIA A. LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK LAUFER
Represented By: WILLIAM T. SALZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD BOOMER
Represented By: MANSI SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD HOLLAND
Represented By: CHRISTINE E. MUNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGENE D'CARBO
Represented By: CHRISTINE E. MUNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA TARASCHI
Represented By: TYSON MATTHEW MOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM MOSSMAN
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CLARKE
Represented By: ROLF E. KROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE MAJOR
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH HEYMAN
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS YEAGER
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE MILES
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIXIE STRACHNIK
Represented By: SUZANNE MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALVIN WILSON
Represented By: NICHOLAS A. CUMMINS
Represented By: Daniel Lengeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN PRATT
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM HOLDSWORTH
Represented By: ANTHONY R. SHERR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW GORDON
Represented By: ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Represented By: ANTHONY R. SHERR
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC PARTEE
Represented By: ANDREW W. NORFLEET
Represented By: FRANK J. LAVERY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS MARCELLI
Represented By: ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW DELCHERT
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN GERY
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL IACONO
Represented By: JOHN P. GONZALES
Represented By: TYSON MATTHEW MOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA AVALA
Represented By: JOHN P. GONZALES
Represented By: TYSON MATTHEW MOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN SHELLER
Represented By: ROLF E. KROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAREN MAITTLAND
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RACHEL ZELTMAN
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW LOVETTE
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM ROZIER
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELLISSA LAUGHLIN
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIN BURLEW
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN KOCHKA
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANJAY BRIDGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN MARSHALL
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Represented By: TRICIA M. AMBROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE WADE
Represented By: DAVID J. MACMAIN
Represented By: TRICIA M. AMBROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL HAWLEY
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN FRYE
Represented By: ANDREW J. BELLWOAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN PIERCE
Represented By: ROLF E. KROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF SIMPSON
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN WHITE
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY BROWN
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE BEATY
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DEMARCO
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT ALEXANDER
Represented By: MARK L. FREED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY PARKER
Represented By: CHRISTINE E. MUNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF KIMES
Represented By: ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS SIEDENBUEHL
Represented By: ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MOREHEAD
Represented By: CHRISTINE E. MUNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND STEVENSON
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KOVATIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HUGHES
Represented By: ALEXANDER NEMIROFF
Represented By: JOSEPH COLEMAN MONAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CARROLL
Represented By: ROLF E. KROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEASSICA HARPER
Represented By: ROLF E. KROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANE CLARK
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SWININGER
Represented By: JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE BENSON
Represented By: ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER KELLER
Represented By: ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YVETTE JOHNSON
Represented By: ANDREW M. RONGAUS
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA M. BERNOT
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Represented By: SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Represented By: Douglas Rintoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE MOORE
Represented By: KATHERINE E. LADOW
Represented By: JOHN P. GONZALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL HARDY
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF CURTIS
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN NORRIS
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA BOWMAN
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM GANOW
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARED ZIMMERMAN
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLIE KOENNECKER
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN FOX
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT HURLEY
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN PROPPER
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE ORNER
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA YELOVICH
Represented By: JASON CONFAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?