JOHN FYNES, ET AL v. BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., et al
Plaintiff: JOHN FYNES and MARYANN FYNES
Defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., Bayer Cropscience, INc. (f/k/a Aventis CropScience USA Inc., f/k/a Rhone-Poulenc Ag Company Inc., a/k/a Amchem Products, Inc.) unknown Aventis Cropscience USA Inc. unknown Am, CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS, INC., GRINNELL LLC D/B/A GRINNELL CORPORATION; C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEMS, H.B. FULLER COMPANY, HONEYWELL, INTERNATIONAL, INC., HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., ITT CORPORATION, J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIERS CO., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PECORA CORPORATION, PFIZER, INC., SUNOCO, INC. (R&M), THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, TRANE US INC., THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS, INC., BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., and HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Cross Defendant: BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.,, CONWED CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER LLC, GARDNER DENVER, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO., GOODYEAR CANADA, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION and CBS CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2022cv03398
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 PAPER #27 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/18/22. 10/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas)
October 14, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SUNOCO, INC. (R&M).(BRUCH, G.)
October 6, 2022 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (NEESON, PETER)
October 5, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand (filed by General Electric Co. and) filed by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(MCSHEA, JOHN)
October 5, 2022 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
September 26, 2022 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SUNOCO, INC. (R&M).(BRUCH, G.)
September 26, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of SUNOCO, INC. (R&M) with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.)
September 22, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY COLIN CONNOR on behalf of FLOWSERVE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(CONNOR, TIMOTHY)
September 21, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Linsenbach on behalf of JOHN FYNES, MARYANN FYNES with Certificate of Service(Linsenbach, Lauren)
September 21, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand filed by JOHN FYNES.Brief and certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(DUNCAN, JASON)
September 21, 2022 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
September 21, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of FLOWSERVE CORPORATION (RAU, TIMOTHY)
September 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SCHEETS on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, INC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
September 21, 2022 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WARREN PUMPS, INC..(RAU, TIMOTHY)
September 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, INC. (RAU, TIMOTHY)
September 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD E. KUENY, III on behalf of THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KUENY, BERNARD)
September 9, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including SPX Corporation with Certificate of Service by THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY.(PETTIT, JEFFREY)
September 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY L. PETTIT on behalf of THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY with Certificate of Service(PETTIT, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2022 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER)
September 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. NEESON on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(NEESON, PETER)
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ke)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by General Electric Co. and filed by CBS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MCSHEA, JOHN)
August 29, 2022 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ESAB Corporation by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
August 25, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16129958), filed by CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/25/2022) (sbt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/25/2022) (sbt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/25/2022) (sbt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHN FYNES, ET AL v. BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN FYNES
Represented By: GREGORY N. BUNITSKY
Represented By: JASON B. DUNCAN
Represented By: Lauren Linsenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARYANN FYNES
Represented By: GREGORY N. BUNITSKY
Represented By: Lauren Linsenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., Bayer Cropscience, INc. (f/k/a Aventis CropScience USA Inc., f/k/a Rhone-Poulenc Ag Company Inc., a/k/a Amchem Products, Inc.) unknown Aventis Cropscience USA Inc. unknown Am
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC D/B/A GRINNELL CORPORATION; C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. FULLER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL, INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. FRANCE REFRACTORIERS CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PECORA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNOCO, INC. (R&M)
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE US INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY
Represented By: BERNARD E. KUENY, III
Represented By: JEFFREY L. PETTIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: PETER J. NEESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CONWED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION
Represented By: TIMOTHY COLIN CONNOR
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?