WHITE v. PAGOTTO et al
Plaintiff: TYRONE K. WHITE
Defendant: MS. TINA PAGOTTO, BETHESDA PROJECT INC., KE SMITH and PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY
Case Number: 2:2022cv03668
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Referring Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR THE REASONS IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. THE MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL IS DENIED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/18/22. 11/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas)
November 18, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/18/22. 11/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas)
November 18, 2022 Copy of order #16 and #17 mailed to pro se TYRONE K. WHITE. (afm)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS (DOC. NOS. #11 AND #12 ) ARE DENIED BECAUSE THE COURT CANNOT DISCERN ANY RELIEF REQUESTED BY THE MOTIONS TO WHICH WHITE WOULD BE ENTITLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/15/22.11/15/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas)
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by TYRONE K. WHITE.(NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED)(amas)
November 14, 2022 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF CLAIM, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY TYRONE K. WHITE. (NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (amas)
November 7, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY TYRONE K. WHITE.(amas)
November 7, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY TYRONE K. WHITE.(amas)
October 17, 2022 DOC. 10 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO. #9 ) IS GRANTED. WHITE MUST FILE HIS AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 11/17/22, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/14/22.10/14/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas)
October 14, 2022 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 11/17/2022. (amas)
October 11, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY TYRONE K. WHITE.(amas)
October 4, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. WHITE MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND WHITE A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION. WHITE'S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/4/22. 10/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH COMPLAINT FORMS.(amas)
October 4, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/4/22. 10/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY TYRONE K. WHITE.(amas)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II TO HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/23/22. 9/23/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas)
September 23, 2022 Mailed Copy of order #5 to pro se TYRONE K. WHITE. (afm)
September 22, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE)(amas)
September 22, 2022 Notice of Pro Se Guidelines (#4) mailed to White. (fdc)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by TYRONE K. WHITE.(amas)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BETHESDA PROJECT INC., TINA PAGOTTO, PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, KE SMITH, filed by TYRONE K. WHITE.(IFP PENDING) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(amas)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TYRONE K. WHITE..(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. PAGOTTO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONE K. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. TINA PAGOTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETHESDA PROJECT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?