INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 126 v. AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION, LLC
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 126
Defendant: AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv04446
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Filing 13 Cross MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 126.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MCCARTHY, RYAN)
January 3, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court filed by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 126. (MCCARTHY, RYAN)
December 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION, LLC.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(PINKSTONE, WAYNE)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, DEFENDANT MAY FILE THE PROPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS. PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE MAY INCLUDE A CROSS-MOTION TO REMAND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/5/22. 12/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
November 29, 2022 Filing 9 Letter dated November 29, 2022 by INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 126. (MCCARTHY, RYAN)
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 Letter dated 11/23/22 by AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION, LLC. (PINKSTONE, WAYNE)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT HAS A 21-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME UP TO AND INCLUDING 12/5/22 WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/14/22. 11/14/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION, LLC. (PINKSTONE, WAYNE)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN P. MCCARTHY on behalf of INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 126 (MCCARTHY, RYAN)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ke)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), Attorney Required Forms, Designation Form (PINKSTONE, WAYNE)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Lighting and signalization, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16296774), filed by American Lighting and signalization, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(PINKSTONE, WAYNE)
November 7, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 126 v. AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 126
Represented By: James E. Goodley
Represented By: RYAN P. MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION, LLC
Represented By: WAYNE E. PINKSTONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?