VONBERGEN v. BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC
Plaintiff: BRITTANY VONBERGEN
Defendant: BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv04724
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KELLEY BRISBON HODGE
Referring Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2511 Wiretapping
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Filing 54 DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OFRENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC. (bw)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 52) AND GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION #52 IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL DOCKET DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED TO THE MOTION AS EXHIBIT A (ECF NO. 52-2). SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 11/1/23.11/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
October 30, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 50) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Reply Brief)(ABAY, JEREMY)
October 25, 2023 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by BRITTANY VONBERGEN. (KANEE, JOSEPH)
October 11, 2023 Filing 50 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Steven R. Watts, #3 Declaration of Matthew Q. Verdin, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(ABAY, JEREMY)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT IS PERMITTED TO REFILE THEIR MOTION ON OR BEFORE 10/11/23. PLAINTIFF IS PERMITTED TO FILE ANY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION ON OR BEFORE 10/25/23; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 9/27/23.9/28/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
September 27, 2023 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTION TO DISMISS DUE BY 10/11/2023. (JL)
September 27, 2023 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE Status Conference held on 9/27/23. (bw)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT A VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/27/2023 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 9/20/23. 9/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
September 20, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE by BRITTANY VONBERGEN Sixth Notice of Supplement Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(KANEE, JOSEPH)
September 20, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE by BRITTANY VONBERGEN Fifth Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(KANEE, JOSEPH)
September 20, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE by BRITTANY VONBERGEN Fourth Notice of Supplement Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(KANEE, JOSEPH)
September 20, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curd v. Papa Johns)(ABAY, JEREMY)
August 30, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schnur v. Papa Johns, #2 Exhibit B - Cook v. GameStop)(ABAY, JEREMY)
August 22, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE by BRITTANY VONBERGEN Plaintiff's Third Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(KANEE, JOSEPH)
August 21, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE by BRITTANY VONBERGEN re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(KANEE, JOSEPH)
August 18, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC re #38 Notice (Other), Response to Plaintiffs Notice of Supplemental Authority (Herbal Brands) (ABAY, JEREMY)
August 16, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE by BRITTANY VONBERGEN re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Herbal Brands v Photoplaza)(KANEE, JOSEPH)
August 15, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rosenthal v. Bloomingdales)(ABAY, JEREMY)
August 3, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE by BRITTANY VONBERGEN re #35 Notice (Other), in Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority (KANEE, JOSEPH)
July 26, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hasson v. FullStory, #2 Exhibit B - Alves v. Goodyear)(ABAY, JEREMY)
July 24, 2023 Filing 34 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by BRITTANY VONBERGEN. (KANEE, JOSEPH)
July 20, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mikulsky v. Noom Inc)(ABAY, JEREMY)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT, WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE PARTIES SHALL SHOW CAUSEAS TO WHETHER THIS CASE IS A TAG-ALONG OR RELATED ACTION APPROPRIATE FOR INCLUSION IN THE MDL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE APPLICABLE LOCAL RULES SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 7/14/23. 7/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
May 30, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by STEPHEN F. RAIOLA on behalf of BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC(RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC ADMISSION OF, ATTORNEY JOSEPH KANEE for BRITTANY VONBERGEN, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 5/16/23. 5/16/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
May 16, 2023 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Kanee by BRITTANY VONBERGEN. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16691864.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(MARCUS, ARI)
May 15, 2023 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC. (RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
April 24, 2023 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BRITTANY VONBERGEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Huber v Expedia Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(MARCUS, ARI)
April 10, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC.Brief, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
March 14, 2023 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC, filed by BRITTANY VONBERGEN.(bw)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF BRITTANY VONBERGENS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT #22 IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL DOCKET THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO THE MOTION AS EXHIBIT A; DEFENDANT BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT #19 , AND DEFENDANT BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLCS MOTION TO GRANT ITS MOTION TO DISMISS AS UNCONTESTED #21 , ARE DENIED AS MOOT; AND PLAINTIFFS CONSENT MOTION FOR RELIEF #23 IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AND SERVE ITS RESPONSE TO THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE APRIL 10, 2023. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AND SERVE A RESPONSE TO ANY MOTION TO DISMISS ON OR BEFORE MAY 1, 2023. DEFENDANT SHALL SUBMIT ANY REPLY IN SUPPORT TO ANY MOTION TO DISMISS ON OR BEFORE MAY 15, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/13/23.3/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
March 10, 2023 Filing 23 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, Consent MOTION set schedule to respond to Amended Complaint filed by BRITTANY VONBERGEN.Consent Motion. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARCUS, ARI)
March 8, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by BRITTANY VONBERGEN.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MARCUS, ARI)
March 8, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION Grant Motion to Dismiss (DE 19) as Uncontested filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION IS APPROVED. ANY RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE MARCH 3, 2023. ANY REPLY TO THE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE MARCH 17, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 2/24/23. 2/24/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
February 10, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE #17 TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 2/8/23.2/8/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
February 7, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Verdin ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16485682.) filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC..(RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH TO HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/2/23. 2/2/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE #11 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/13/22.12/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE #10 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/13/22.12/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE #9 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/13/22.12/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
December 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY E. ABAY on behalf of BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC (ABAY, JEREMY)
December 12, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Ziwei Song ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16367851.) filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC..(RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
December 12, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Eric C. Bosset ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16367840.) filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC..(RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
December 12, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Emily Johnson Henn ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16367814.) filed by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC..(RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONDING TO THE COMPLAINT #1 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS GRANTED. CONSISTENT WITH THIS ORDER, DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE MOVE TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12, SHALL BE EXTENDED TO FEBRUARY 10, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/8/22. 12/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
December 8, 2022 Filing 7 Stipulation (bw)
December 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER ST. TIENNE WOLFF on behalf of BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC (WOLFF, PETER)
December 8, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRITTANY VONBERGEN re: Joe Vallone served Summons and Complaint upon BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC by Personal. BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. (MARCUS, ARI)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Bloomingdales, LLC, which has a sole member of Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC, which has a sole member of Macy's, Inc. by BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC.(RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
December 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN F. RAIOLA on behalf of BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC (RAIOLA, STEPHEN)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/28/22 (bw)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16335601.), filed by BRITTANY VONBERGEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Summons)(MARCUS, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VONBERGEN v. BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY VONBERGEN
Represented By: ARI H. MARCUS
Represented By: JOSEPH KANEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMINGDALES.COM, LLC
Represented By: EMILY JOHNSON HENN
Represented By: JEREMY E. ABAY
Represented By: STEPHEN F. RAIOLA
Represented By: ERIC C. BOSSET
Represented By: PETER ST. TIENNE WOLFF
Represented By: ZIWEI SONG
Represented By: MATTHEW Q. VERDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?